blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1331872 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1331872



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 124
30.07.2009 Closing of application Search / examination 1
07.05.2009 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
09.04.2009 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
05.01.2009 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
23.12.2008 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
17.12.2008 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
26.08.2008 Annex to the communication Search / examination 7
26.08.2008 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
01.08.2008 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
29.07.2008 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
29.07.2008 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
29.07.2008 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
24.07.2008 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
07.07.2008 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
07.07.2008 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
04.05.2007 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
19.12.2003 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 17
18.12.2003 Reply by International Bureau Search / examination 1
03.12.2003 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 1
31.10.2003 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
25.06.2003 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
29.05.2003 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
29.05.2003 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 2
23.12.2002 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
20.12.2002 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 1
06.12.2002 Annex Search / examination 2
06.12.2002 Annex Search / examination 1
06.12.2002 Annex Search / examination 32
06.12.2002 Drawings Search / examination 6
06.12.2002 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
06.12.2002 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
06.12.2002 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
10.10.2002 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 24