blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1331872


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
31.07.2009 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  02.09.2009  [2009/36]
29.04.2009 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
07.04.2009 Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
07.04.2009 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
06.04.2009 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
23.12.2008 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
22.08.2008 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
22.08.2008 First examination report
04.07.2008 Supplementary search report published on  06.08.2008  [2008/32]
08.04.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.05.2007 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee
08.05.2007 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.05.2007 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
08.03.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.03.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.05.2004 Deletion: Fee payment for extension state
29.05.2004 Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state
25.02.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.06.2003 Change - classification published on  13.08.2003  [2003/33]
20.06.2003 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  06.08.2003  [2003/32]
20.06.2003 Request for examination filed published on  06.08.2003  [2003/32]
19.06.2003 PCT data prior to European publication
03.06.2003 PCT data prior to European publication
04.01.2003 PCT data prior to European publication
13.12.2002 PCT data prior to European publication
11.12.2002 PCT data prior to European publication
11.10.2002 PCT data prior to European publication
10.07.2002 PCT data prior to European publication