blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1331872
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1331872Global Dossier 06.08.2008A4
EP1331872 06.08.2003A2
Priority number Date
US0209746 28.03.2002
US27939501 28.03.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2002257097B 21.09.2006B2
Priority number Date
US0209746 28.03.2002
US27939501 28.03.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2447034 02.05.2006C
CA2447034 10.10.2002A1
Priority number Date
US0209746 28.03.2002
US27939501 28.03.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6729205 04.05.2004B2
US2002152833 24.10.2002A1
Priority number Date
US11366302 28.03.2002
US27939501 28.03.2001
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO02078525Global Dossier 30.05.2003A3
WO02078525 10.10.2002A2
Priority number Date
US27939501 28.03.2001