Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1331872

EP1331872 - MULTI-POSITION RATCHET MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  31.07.2009
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip31.07.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.09.2009  [2009/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Boss Instruments, Ltd.
Suite 119, 1838 Elm Hill Pike
Nashville, TN 37210 / US
[N/P]
Former [2003/32]For all designated states
Boss Instruments, Ltd.
Suite 119, 1838 Elm Hill Pike
Nashville, TN 37210 / US
Inventor(s)01 / PHILLIPS, Burns P.
Suite 119, 1838 Elm Hill Pike
Nashville, TN 37210 / US
 [2003/32]
Representative(s)Gilmour, David Cedric Franklyn , et al
Forresters
15 Hamilton Square
Birkenhead
Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/32]Gilmour, David Cedric Franklyn , et al
POTTS, KERR & CO. 15 Hamilton Square
Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB
Application number, filing date02726681.628.03.2002
[2003/32]
WO2002US09746
Priority number, dateUS20010279395P28.03.2001         Original published format: US 279395 P
[2003/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO02078525
Date:10.10.2002
Language:EN
[2002/41]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1331872
Date:06.08.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.10.2002
[2003/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US30.05.2003
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.07.2008
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/02
[2003/33]
Former International [2003/32]A61B1/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/32]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:MULTIPOSITIONSRATSCHENMECHANISMUS[2003/32]
English:MULTI-POSITION RATCHET MECHANISM[2003/32]
French:MECANISME D'ENCLIQUETAGE MULTI-POSITIONS[2003/32]
Entry into regional phase06.12.2002National basic fee paid 
06.12.2002Search fee paid 
06.12.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
06.12.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.12.2002Examination requested  [2003/32]
26.08.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.03.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/36]
09.04.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2009/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
18.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
25.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
27.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200706   M06   Fee paid on   27.04.2007
31.03.200908   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]GB2107990  (CODMAN & SHURTLEFF) [X] 1-3,6-8,12-15,25 * page 1, lines 1-9; figure 2 * [Y] 4,5,9-11,16-24;
 [Y]EP0803228  (UNITED STATES SURGICAL CORP [US]) [Y] 4,5,24 * figures 1-4 *;
 [Y]US6200263  (PERSON WAYNE C [US]) [Y] 9-11 * figures 1-3 *;
 [Y]GB1283429  (GAUTHIER WILLIAM KOHLMANN [US]) [Y] 16-23 * page 3, line 28 - page 4, line 64; figures 1,2 *
International search[X]US4424724  (BOOKWALTER JOHN R [US], et al);
 [A]US4421108  (CABRERA RENE J [US], et al);
 [A]US5967972  (SANTILLI ALBERT N [US], et al);
 [X]US6241659  (BOOKWALTER JOHN R [US], et al);
 [A]US4254763  (MCCREADY JAMES F, et al)