blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1374028 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1374028



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 5944
19.04.2018 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
13.04.2018 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
04.04.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
04.04.2018 Description Opposition 6
04.04.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
04.04.2018 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
25.01.2018 Communication concerning surcharge and failure to observe time limit Opposition 2
15.12.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
15.12.2017 French translation of claims Opposition 5
15.12.2017 German translation of the claims Opposition 4
15.12.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
05.09.2017 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 2
05.09.2017 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
05.09.2017 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 3
11.08.2017 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
06.06.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
06.06.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
06.06.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
01.06.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
31.05.2017 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 20
31.05.2017 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 20
31.05.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
31.05.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
16.09.2016 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
16.09.2016 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
12.09.2016 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
12.09.2016 Letter which had not been notified Appeal 1
12.09.2016 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 24
09.09.2016 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 53
09.09.2016 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 57
09.09.2016 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 57
07.09.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
07.09.2016 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
07.09.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 24
07.09.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 30
07.09.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
07.09.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
07.09.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
07.09.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
07.09.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 14
07.09.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
07.09.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
07.09.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 56
07.09.2016 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
02.09.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.09.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
01.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
01.09.2016 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 24
01.09.2016 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 6
01.09.2016 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 11
01.09.2016 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 15
01.09.2016 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 56
01.09.2016 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 113
01.09.2016 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 13
01.09.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
01.09.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
30.08.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
30.08.2016 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 24
30.08.2016 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 24
29.08.2016 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 30
25.08.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 30
16.08.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.08.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
09.08.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.08.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
09.08.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 20
03.08.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
26.07.2016 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
26.07.2016 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
21.07.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
14.06.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
11.06.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
11.06.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
10.06.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
09.06.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
09.06.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
09.06.2016 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 7
06.06.2016 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
06.06.2016 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
22.01.2016 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
18.02.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.02.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
10.02.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 1
29.01.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) Opposition 1
08.04.2013 Request for change of address - applicant Search / examination 1
08.07.2010 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
08.07.2010 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
13.10.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.10.2009 Annex Appeal 40
05.10.2009 Annex Appeal 42
05.10.2009 Reply to appeal Appeal 12
07.07.2009 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
07.07.2009 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
25.06.2009 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
23.06.2009 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
23.06.2009 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
12.06.2009 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Appeal 16
12.06.2009 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Appeal 22
12.06.2009 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Appeal 46
12.06.2009 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Appeal 50
12.06.2009 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Appeal 6
12.06.2009 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Appeal 36
12.06.2009 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Appeal 42
12.06.2009 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Appeal 30
12.06.2009 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Appeal 30
12.06.2009 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Appeal 24
12.06.2009 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Appeal 6
12.06.2009 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Appeal 70
12.06.2009 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Appeal 80
12.06.2009 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Appeal 26
12.06.2009 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Appeal 28
12.06.2009 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Appeal 32
12.06.2009 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Appeal 120
12.06.2009 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Appeal 110
12.06.2009 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Appeal 50
12.06.2009 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Appeal 6
12.06.2009 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Appeal 6
12.06.2009 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Appeal 10
12.06.2009 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Appeal 4
12.06.2009 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Appeal 50
12.06.2009 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Appeal 60
12.06.2009 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 26
08.06.2009 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 27
06.04.2009 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
01.04.2009 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
27.03.2009 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
27.03.2009 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
27.02.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.02.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.02.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.02.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.02.2009 Annex to a communication Opposition 13
10.02.2009 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
10.02.2009 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 13
10.02.2009 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
10.02.2009 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
10.02.2009 OPPODREX with handwritten amendments Opposition 13
30.01.2009 Annex to a communication Opposition 15
30.01.2009 Annex to a communication Opposition 39
30.01.2009 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 18
30.01.2009 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
30.01.2009 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
30.01.2009 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
30.01.2009 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
30.01.2009 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
08.09.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.09.2008 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
01.09.2008 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
29.08.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.08.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.08.2008 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
28.08.2008 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
18.08.2008 Claims Opposition 4
18.08.2008 Claims Opposition 4
18.08.2008 Claims Opposition 4
18.08.2008 Claims Opposition 4
18.08.2008 Claims Opposition 4
18.08.2008 Claims Opposition 4
18.08.2008 Claims Opposition 4
18.08.2008 Claims Opposition 4
18.08.2008 Claims Opposition 3
18.08.2008 Claims Opposition 4
18.08.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 11
18.08.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
18.08.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
18.08.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
12.08.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
12.08.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
12.08.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
12.08.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 64
07.08.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
07.08.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 64
07.08.2008 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
30.07.2008 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
04.07.2008 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
29.05.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.05.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.05.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.05.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
27.05.2008 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.05.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.05.2008 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 20
20.05.2008 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
20.05.2008 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.05.2008 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.04.2008 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
07.08.2007 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
06.08.2007 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
01.08.2007 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
25.07.2007 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
16.07.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
16.07.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
16.07.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 119
16.07.2007 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 16
31.05.2007 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
31.05.2007 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
16.05.2007 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
26.03.2007 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
26.03.2007 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
16.03.2007 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
12.01.2007 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.01.2007 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
04.01.2007 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
01.12.2006 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
23.11.2006 Request concerning the applicant/representative Opposition 3
09.10.2006 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
29.09.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
29.09.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
29.09.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
29.09.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
29.09.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
27.09.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
21.09.2006 Request for documents Opposition 1
07.09.2006 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
07.09.2006 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
23.08.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
23.08.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 358
21.07.2006 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
20.07.2006 N/A Opposition 1
06.07.2006 Letter concerning fees and payments Opposition 1
06.07.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 704
06.07.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 368
06.07.2006 Notice of opposition Opposition 20
06.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
06.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
06.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 58
06.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 234
06.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 142
06.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 46
06.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 38
06.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 30
06.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 522
06.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 38
06.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
06.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 110
06.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 122
06.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
06.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
06.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
06.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 34
06.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 44
06.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
06.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
06.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
06.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
06.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
03.07.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 21
25.08.2005 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
06.08.2005 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
06.08.2005 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
06.08.2005 German translation of the claims Search / examination 5
03.08.2005 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
03.08.2005 German translation of the claims Search / examination 5
28.07.2005 Communication of amended entries Search / examination 2
28.07.2005 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
12.07.2005 Request for change of representative Search / examination 1
11.07.2005 Request for change of representative Search / examination 1
08.07.2005 Request for change of representative Search / examination 1
14.04.2005 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
14.04.2005 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
14.04.2005 Text intended for grant Search / examination 20
15.12.2004 Claims Search / examination 4
15.12.2004 Description Search / examination 1
15.12.2004 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 1
15.11.2004 Annex to a communication Search / examination 4
15.11.2004 Annex to a communication Search / examination 4
15.11.2004 Annex to a communication Search / examination 6
15.11.2004 Annex to a communication Search / examination 5
15.11.2004 Annex to a communication Search / examination 6
15.11.2004 Annex to a communication Search / examination 5
15.11.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
15.11.2004 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
15.11.2004 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
15.11.2004 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
15.11.2004 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
15.11.2004 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
15.11.2004 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
03.11.2004 Claims Search / examination 5
03.11.2004 Claims Search / examination 1
03.11.2004 Description Search / examination 4
03.11.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
21.09.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
20.09.2004 Claims Search / examination 5
20.09.2004 Claims Search / examination 1
20.09.2004 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 16
16.09.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
09.09.2004 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 2
01.09.2004 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
01.09.2004 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
01.09.2004 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
01.09.2004 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
31.08.2004 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
30.08.2004 Annex Search / examination 1
30.08.2004 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Search / examination 1
27.08.2004 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Search / examination 2
24.08.2004 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Search / examination 1
16.08.2004 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Search / examination 1
11.08.2004 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
30.07.2004 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
26.07.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
26.07.2004 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 2
19.07.2004 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
27.04.2004 Annex Search / examination 6
27.04.2004 Claims Search / examination 5
27.04.2004 Description Search / examination 1
27.04.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
04.02.2004 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
18.12.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
18.12.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
08.12.2003 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 2
08.12.2003 Reply by International Bureau Search / examination 1
26.11.2003 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 1
19.11.2003 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
13.11.2003 Notice on debiting of fees Search / examination 2
12.11.2003 Reply by International Bureau Search / examination 2
07.11.2003 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 2
23.10.2003 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
23.10.2003 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 1
10.10.2003 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
10.10.2003 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 1
30.09.2003 Claims Search / examination 5
26.09.2003 International preliminary examination report - Automated PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
26.09.2003 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
26.09.2003 Refund of fees PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
26.09.2003 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
21.08.2003 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
13.08.2003 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
08.08.2003 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.08.2003 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.07.2003 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
27.06.2003 Written opinion - Automated PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
18.11.2002 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
31.10.2002 Document concerning representation PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
31.10.2002 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
09.10.2002 Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
09.09.2002 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
09.08.2002 Invitation to correct defects in demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
09.08.2002 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
09.08.2002 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
01.08.2002 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
19.07.2002 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
16.07.2002 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 6
11.07.2002 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 21
29.04.2002 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
18.03.2002 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 2
19.02.2002 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
19.02.2002 Claims International Searching Authority 4
19.02.2002 Description International Searching Authority 12
19.02.2002 Drawings International Searching Authority 3