Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1554699

EP1554699 - AUTHENTICATION OF DOCUMENTS AND VALUABLE ARTICLES BY USING MOIRE INTENSITY PROFILES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.01.2010
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ecole Polytechnique Fédérale de Lausanne (EPFL)
1015 Lausanne / CH
[2005/29]
Inventor(s)01 / AMIDROR, Isaac
Avenue Ruchonnet 43
CH-1003 Lausanne / CH
02 / HERSCH, Roger, D.
Chemin des Planches 39
CH-1066 Epalinges / CH
 [2005/29]
Representative(s)Zinsinger, Norbert
Louis, Pöhlau, Lohrentz
Patentanwälte
Postfach 30 55
90014 Nürnberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/29]Zinsinger, Norbert
Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz, P.O. Box 30 55
90014 Nürnberg / DE
Application number, filing date02727897.714.05.2002
[2005/29]
WO2002IB01657
Priority number, dateUS2001090244511.06.2001         Original published format: US 902445
[2005/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO02101669
Date:19.12.2002
Language:EN
[2002/51]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1554699
Date:20.07.2005
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.2002
[2005/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1554699
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.05.2005
ClassificationInternational:G07D7/12
[2005/29]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2005/29]
TitleGerman:AUTHENTIFIZIERUNG VON DOKUMENTEN UND WERTSACHEN DURCH ANWENDUNG DES INTENSITÄTSPROFILS VON MOIREMUSTER[2008/33]
English:AUTHENTICATION OF DOCUMENTS AND VALUABLE ARTICLES BY USING MOIRE INTENSITY PROFILES[2005/29]
French:AUTHENTIFICATION DE DOCUMENTS ET D'ARTICLES DE VALEUR PAR L'UTILISATION DE PROFILS D'INTENSITE A MOIRE[2005/29]
Former [2005/29]AUTHENTIFIZIERUNG VON DOKUMENTEN UND WERTSACHEN
Entry into regional phase22.04.2004National basic fee paid 
22.04.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
22.04.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.02.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time
22.04.2004Examination requested  [2005/29]
18.08.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.02.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.09.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.01.2009Fee for grant paid
07.01.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
09.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
16.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
14.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
18.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
TR25.02.2009
IE14.05.2009
LU14.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
MC31.05.2009
PT12.08.2009
[2011/44]
Former [2011/21]FI25.02.2009
IE14.05.2009
LU14.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
MC31.05.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2010/47]FI25.02.2009
IE14.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
MC31.05.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2010/21]FI25.02.2009
IE14.05.2009
MC31.05.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2010/04]FI25.02.2009
MC31.05.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2009/49]FI25.02.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2009/38]FI25.02.2009
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO0139138  (ECOLE POLYTECH [CH]) [X] 1-22,32-38,41-44,50-55,57-65 * abstract * * page 3, paragraph 3 - page 5, paragraph 4 * * page 25, paragraph 1 - page 50, paragraph 1 * [Y] 23-31,39,40,45-49,56;
 [XD]US5995638  (AMIDROR ISAAC [CH], et al) [XD] 1,38,50,63 * abstract *;
 [A]US6062604  (TAYLOR JOHN CHARLES [AU], et al) [A] 1-65 * abstract *;
 [A]US5193853  (WICKER RALPH C [US]) [A] 1-65 * abstract * * column 6, line 39 - line 51 *;
 [A]DE3208204  (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [A] 1-65 * abstract * * page 3, paragraph L - page 4, paragraph L *
 [YD]  - I. AMIDROR AND R.D. HERSCH, "Fourier-based analysis and synthesis of moirés in the superposition of geometrically transformed periodic structures", JOURNAL OF THE OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, vol. 15, no. 5, pages 1100 - 1113, URL: http://diwww.epfl.ch/w3lsp/publications/moire/faasomitsogtps.pdf, (20030827), XP002252665 [YD] 23-31,39,40,45-49,56 * abstract * * page 1101, column L, paragraph 2 * * page 1113, column L, paragraph 4 - paragraph 5 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/JOSAA.15.001100