Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1417554

EP1417554 - A SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MANAGING A PROCEDURE IN A BLOOD COMPONENT COLLECTION FACILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.07.2016
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.11.2018New entry: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fenwal, Inc.
Three Corporate Drive
Lake Zurich, IL 60047 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/15]For all designated states
Fenwal, Inc.
Three Corporate Drive
Lake Zurich IL 60047 / US
Former [2007/29]For all designated states
Fenwal, Inc.
25212 West Illinois Route 120, RLP-30
Round Lake, IL 60073 / US
Former [2004/20]For all designated states
BAXTER INTERNATIONAL INC.
One Baxter Parkway
Deerfield, Illinois 60015 / US
Inventor(s)01 / NG, Kok-Hwee
4 Oatsfield Cir
Penfield, NY 14526-9554 / US
02 / PETERSON, Grant, Alexander
2041 W. Farwell
Chicago, IL 60645 / US
03 / FORD, Ian
544-A Mulberry SE
Albuquerque, NM 87106 / US
04 / FREDERICKS, Chris, Noel
147 Sunnyside Place
Libertyville, IL 60048 / US
 [2004/20]
Representative(s)Geary, Stephen , et al
Bawden & Associates
4 The Gatehouse
2 High Street
Harpenden, Herts AL5 2TH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2007/29]Geary, Stephen , et al
Bawden & Associates 4 The Gatehouse 2 High Street
Harpenden, Herts AL5 2TH / GB
Former [2004/20]Dee, Ian Mark
Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk
Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB
Application number, filing date02729073.329.04.2002
[2004/20]
WO2002US13621
Priority number, dateUS20010287122P28.04.2001         Original published format: US 287122 P
US2001086492624.05.2001         Original published format: US 864926
[2004/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO02088897
Date:07.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/45]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1417554
Date:12.05.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.11.2002
[2004/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US11.03.2004
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:G06F1/00
[2004/20]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2004/20]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN EINER PROZEDUR IN EINER BLUTKOMPONENTENSAMMELEINRICHTUNG[2004/20]
English:A SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MANAGING A PROCEDURE IN A BLOOD COMPONENT COLLECTION FACILITY[2004/20]
French:SYSTEME ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE GERER UN PROCESSUS DANS UN MECANISME DE PRELEVEMENT DE COMPOSANTS SANGUINS[2004/20]
Entry into regional phase17.01.2003National basic fee paid 
17.01.2003Search fee paid 
17.01.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
17.01.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.01.2003Examination requested  [2004/20]
22.06.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.01.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.02.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.04.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.05.2019Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.06.2011
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
20.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
26.04.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
27.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
25.04.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
29.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
26.04.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
25.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
28.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 11
29.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 12
28.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 13
27.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 14
27.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 15
27.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 16
27.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 17
Documents cited:Search[Y]US4857716  (GOMBRICH PETER P [US], et al) [Y] 1-31 * column 3, line 21 - column 23, line 68 * * column 26, line 11 - column 29, line 40; figure -; claim - *;
 [Y]US5781442  (ENGLESON JOSEPH J [US], et al) [Y] 1-31 * column 1, line 5 - column 2, line 38 * * column 4, line 24 - column 15, line 25; figure -; claim - *;
 [Y]US4916441  (GOMBRICH PETER P [US]) [Y] 1-31 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US5272318  (GORMAN JOHN G [US]) [Y] 1-31 * the whole document *;
 [Y]JP2001104835  (HITACHI KOKI KK [JP]) [Y] 1-31 * paragraphs [0021] - [0050]; figure - *;
 [Y]EP0771569  (HAEMONETICS CORP [US]) [Y] 1-31 * page 4, line 30 - page 10, line 10; figure -; claim - *;
 [Y]WO0074731  (BAXTER INT [US], et al) [Y] 1-31 * page 10, line 1 - page 12, line 10 * * page 26, line 33 - page 40, line 23 * * page 43, line 21 - page 44, line 19; figure -; claim - *;
 [Y]WO9946657  (BAXTER INT [US]) [Y] 1-31 * pages 6-30 * * pages 40-55; figure -; claim - *;
 [Y]JPH08240589  (TERUMO CORP) [Y] 1-31 * the whole document *;
 [Y]WO0021590  (HAEMONETICS CORP [US]) [Y] 1-31 * pages 4-10 * * pages 13-16; figure -; claim - *;
 [Y]WO9904837  (SQUIBB BRISTOL MYERS CO [US]) [Y] 1-31 * the whole document *
International search[AP]US6256643  (CORK WILLIAM H [US], et al);
 [A]US5971941  (SIMONS TAD DECATUR [US], et al);
 [AP]  - ANONYMOUS, "Blood donation: donors enticed with multimedia entertainment and internet access", PROQUEST, XP002961937
    [ ] - HEALTH & MEDICINE WEEK, (20010910), pages 16 - 17
 [XE]  - ANONYMOUS, "Baxter receives FDA clearance for automated blood component collection system", PROQUEST, XP002961938
    [ ] - PR NEWSWIRE, (20020912), page 3
by applicantUS5857967
 US5891035
 WO0117584
 US5581687
 US5956023