blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1373160

EP1373160 - LOW DENSITY CALCIUM SILICATE HYDRATE STRENGTH ACCELERANT ADDITIVE FOR CEMENTITIOUS PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  12.11.2010
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip12.11.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 15.12.2010  [2010/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
James Hardie Technology Limited
Europa House, Second Floor Harcourt Centre Harcourt Street
Dublin 2 / IE
[2010/27]
Former [2005/39]For all designated states
James Hardie International Finance B.V.
Atrium Building 8th Floor Strawinskylaan 3077
1077 ZX Amsterdam / NL
Former [2005/37]For all designated states
James Hardie International Finance B.V.
Atrium Building 8th Floor Strawinskylaan 3007
1077 ZX Amsterdam / NL
Former [2005/29]For all designated states
James Hardie International Finance B.V.
Unit 04-07, Atrium Building, Strawinskylaan 3077
1077 ZX Amsterdam / NL
Former [2004/01]For all designated states
James Hardie Research Pty Limited
Level 1, Research & Product, Development Building, 10 Colquhoun Street
Rosehill, NSW 2142 / AU
Inventor(s)01 / JIANG, Chongjun
49 Waverly Street
Belmore, New South Wales 2192 / AU
 [2004/01]
Representative(s)Mallalieu, Catherine Louise, et al
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/01]Mallalieu, Catherine Louise, et al
D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Application number, filing date02730614.104.03.2002
[2004/01]
WO2002IB01833
Priority number, dateUS20010273762P05.03.2001         Original published format: US 273762 P
US20010273766P05.03.2001         Original published format: US 273766 P
US20010273764P05.03.2001         Original published format: US 273764 P
US20010273761P05.03.2001         Original published format: US 273761 P
[2004/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO02070425
Date:12.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1373160
Date:02.01.2004
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2004/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU12.09.2002
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.02.2006
ClassificationIPC:C04B22/06, C04B103/12, C04B28/02
[2006/14]
CPC:
C04B28/04 (EP,US); C04B22/06 (EP,KR,US); C04B14/043 (EP,US);
C04B22/00863 (EP,US); C04B28/02 (EP,US); C04B28/18 (EP,US);
C04B2103/12 (EP,US); Y02W30/91 (EP,US) (-)
C-Set:
C04B22/00863, C04B20/002, C04B28/18 (EP,US);
C04B28/02, C04B14/043, C04B40/0064 (US,EP);
C04B28/02, C04B18/241, C04B20/0048, C04B22/00863, C04B24/383, C04B40/0028, C04B40/0064, C04B40/024 (EP,US);
C04B28/02, C04B18/241, C04B22/00863, C04B24/383, C04B32/02, C04B40/0028, C04B40/0064, C04B40/024 (EP,US);
C04B28/02, C04B20/002, C04B40/0064 (US,EP);
C04B28/02, C04B22/06, C04B40/0064 (US,EP);
C04B28/18, C04B38/00 (US,EP)
(-)
Former IPC [2004/01]C04B22/06, // C04B103:12
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2004/01]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:CALCIUMSILICATHYDRAT NIEDRIGER DICHTE ALS VERFESTIGUNGSBESCHLEUNIGENDES ADDITIV FÜR ZEMENTPRODUKTE[2004/01]
English:LOW DENSITY CALCIUM SILICATE HYDRATE STRENGTH ACCELERANT ADDITIVE FOR CEMENTITIOUS PRODUCTS[2004/01]
French:ADDITIF ACCELERATEUR ET PROMOTEUR DE RESISTANCE A BASE D'HYDRATE DE SILICATE DE CALCIUM DE BASSE DENSITE POUR PRODUITS CIMENTAIRES[2004/01]
Entry into regional phase26.09.2003National basic fee paid 
26.09.2003Search fee paid 
26.09.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
26.09.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.10.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU
26.09.2003Examination requested  [2004/01]
16.06.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.10.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.09.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.04.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.02.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.06.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/50]
23.07.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2010/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
14.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
09.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
14.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
14.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
15.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[Y]CN1120525  ;
 [Y]JPH06144944  ;
 [Y]US4162924  (KUBO KAZUHIKO [JP], et al);
 [X]EP0417418  (DURMERSHEIM BAUSTOFFWERKE [DE]);
 [Y]US5372640  (SCHWARZ WOLFGANG [AT], et al);
 [Y]US5383967  (CHASE RAYMOND S [US]);
 [Y]US5709743  (LETURE PHILIPPE [FR], et al);
 [X]WO9845222  (JAMES HARDIE RES PTY LTD [AU], et al);
 [X]WO0021901  (JAMES HARDIE RES PTY LTD [AU], et al);
 [XP]WO0168547  (JAMES HARDIE RES PTY LTD [AU], et al);
 [Y]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1997, no. 45, Database accession no. 1997-480943, XP002998379 & CN1120525 A 19960417 (UNIV. HUMAN SCI. & ENG.)
 [Y]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1994, no. 25, Database accession no. 1994-206239, XP002998380 & JPH06144944 A 19940524 (ASAHI KASEI KOGYO KK)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.