Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP1390572 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1390572



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1152
09.07.2018 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
05.07.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.07.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
29.06.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
28.06.2018 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 6
28.06.2018 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
04.06.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
30.05.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
29.05.2018 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 2
29.05.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.05.2018 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
24.05.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
24.05.2018 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
24.05.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
24.05.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
17.05.2018 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Appeal 4
24.04.2018 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
24.04.2018 Request for change of name -opponent Appeal 1
09.03.2018 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 10
09.03.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.03.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
05.03.2018 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
05.03.2018 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
05.03.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
05.03.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
05.03.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 16
05.03.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
05.03.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 14
08.02.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.02.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
05.02.2018 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 2
05.02.2018 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 11
05.02.2018 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 8
05.02.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
05.02.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
19.12.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.12.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
14.12.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
14.12.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
24.11.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
21.11.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
20.11.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
17.11.2017 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 4
14.11.2017 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
25.10.2017 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
03.11.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
26.10.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 13
18.03.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.03.2015 Claims Appeal 5
11.03.2015 Claims Appeal 5
11.03.2015 Claims Appeal 5
11.03.2015 Claims Appeal 5
11.03.2015 Reply to appeal Appeal 6
28.11.2014 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
26.11.2014 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
25.11.2014 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
20.11.2014 Authorisation Appeal 1
20.11.2014 Reply to a deficiency communication regarding an appeal Appeal 1
19.11.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 16
19.11.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 29
19.11.2014 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 12
26.09.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
25.09.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
24.09.2014 F3060 Request to provide missing authorisation Appeal 1
24.09.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
17.09.2014 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
09.09.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
09.09.2014 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
09.09.2014 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
05.09.2014 Request concerning the applicant/representative Appeal 2
07.08.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.07.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.07.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
09.07.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
09.07.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
09.07.2014 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
09.07.2014 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
09.07.2014 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 25
09.07.2014 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 8
09.07.2014 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
09.07.2014 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
09.07.2014 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
09.07.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
09.07.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
09.07.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
09.07.2014 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
09.07.2014 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 18
09.07.2014 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 18
09.07.2014 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 5
01.07.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.06.2014 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.06.2014 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 1
25.06.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
25.06.2014 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
28.05.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.05.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.05.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
22.05.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
22.05.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
22.05.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
22.05.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
22.05.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 5
22.05.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 5
22.05.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 5
22.05.2014 Main request during Opposition procedure Opposition 5
22.05.2014 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.05.2014 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 1
21.05.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
21.05.2014 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 5
09.12.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.12.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
03.12.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
03.12.2013 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.11.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
26.11.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
26.11.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.11.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
21.11.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.11.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
13.11.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
13.11.2013 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
13.11.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 4
13.11.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 4
06.11.2013 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
01.10.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.09.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
25.09.2013 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
25.09.2013 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 5
25.09.2013 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
25.09.2013 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 5
25.09.2013 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
25.09.2013 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 5
25.09.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
25.09.2013 Main request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
25.09.2013 Main request during Opposition procedure Opposition 5
25.09.2013 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 4
28.06.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
28.06.2013 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
25.06.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
25.06.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
25.06.2013 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
15.03.2013 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
15.03.2013 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
13.02.2013 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
07.02.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
07.02.2013 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 5
07.02.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 13
07.02.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
07.02.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
07.02.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
07.02.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
07.02.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
07.02.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
07.02.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 61
07.02.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 32
07.02.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 52
13.04.2012 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
23.03.2012 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
23.03.2012 French translation of claims Search / examination 7
23.03.2012 German translation of the claims Search / examination 5
21.03.2012 Cover sheet for fax transmission Search / examination 1
21.03.2012 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
21.03.2012 French translation of claims Search / examination 7
21.03.2012 German translation of the claims Search / examination 5
21.03.2012 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
17.11.2011 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
17.11.2011 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
17.11.2011 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
17.11.2011 Text intended for grant Search / examination 23
05.10.2011 Claims Search / examination 3
05.10.2011 Description Search / examination 4
05.10.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.10.2011 Claims Search / examination 3
03.10.2011 Cover sheet for fax transmission Search / examination 1
03.10.2011 Description Search / examination 4
03.10.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
22.07.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
22.07.2011 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
04.04.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
04.04.2011 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 12
04.04.2011 Claims Search / examination 4
04.04.2011 Description Search / examination 12
04.04.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
31.03.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
31.03.2011 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 12
31.03.2011 Claims Search / examination 4
31.03.2011 Cover sheet for fax transmission Search / examination 1
31.03.2011 Description Search / examination 12
31.03.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
21.02.2011 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
21.02.2011 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
09.02.2011 Refusal of request for extension of time limit Search / examination 1
04.02.2011 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.02.2011 Cover sheet for fax transmission Search / examination 1
03.02.2011 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.11.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
23.11.2010 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
19.08.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
19.08.2010 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 1
19.08.2010 Claims Search / examination 5
19.08.2010 Description Search / examination 1
19.08.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
17.08.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
17.08.2010 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 1
17.08.2010 Claims Search / examination 5
17.08.2010 Cover sheet for fax transmission Search / examination 1
17.08.2010 Description Search / examination 1
17.08.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
25.06.2010 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
18.06.2010 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
17.06.2010 Cover sheet for fax transmission Search / examination 1
17.06.2010 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
07.04.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
07.04.2010 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
07.01.2010 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
05.01.2010 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
11.09.2009 Claims Search / examination 5
11.09.2009 Claims Search / examination 5
11.09.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
09.09.2009 Claims Search / examination 5
09.09.2009 Claims Search / examination 5
09.09.2009 Cover sheet for fax transmission Search / examination 1
09.09.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
16.07.2009 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
13.07.2009 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
09.07.2009 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
30.04.2009 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
30.04.2009 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
06.10.2008 Letter to the Legal Division Search / examination 1
12.09.2008 Deficiencies as to Rule 23 EPC Search / examination 2
08.09.2008 Rule 23 - Annex A Search / examination 1
08.09.2008 Rule 23 - Annex B Search / examination 1
18.08.2008 Annexes in respect of a client data request Search / examination 1
18.08.2008 Letter to the Legal Division Search / examination 1
02.04.2007 Claims Search / examination 5
02.04.2007 Claims Search / examination 6
02.04.2007 Description Search / examination 9
02.04.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
29.03.2007 Claims Search / examination 6
29.03.2007 Claims Search / examination 5
29.03.2007 Description Search / examination 9
29.03.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
09.02.2007 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
08.02.2007 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
06.02.2007 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
28.09.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
28.09.2006 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
19.09.2006 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
14.09.2006 General enquiry Search / examination 1
23.03.2006 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 5
12.11.2004 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
31.03.2004 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.03.2004 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
05.03.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 32
05.03.2004 Reply by International Bureau Search / examination 1
25.02.2004 Reply by International Bureau Search / examination 1
19.02.2004 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
18.02.2004 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
27.01.2004 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
14.01.2004 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
13.01.2004 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
13.01.2004 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
13.01.2004 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
12.01.2004 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 1
04.12.2003 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
04.12.2003 Claims Search / examination 5
04.12.2003 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
26.09.2003 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
02.04.2003 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
21.11.2002 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
21.11.2002 Published international application - A1 Search / examination 26
12.06.2002 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
12.06.2002 Claims International Searching Authority 5
12.06.2002 Description International Searching Authority 17
12.06.2002 Drawings International Searching Authority 2
12.06.2002 Submission concerning representation International Searching Authority 2