blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1395214 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1395214



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 490
07.11.2002 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 126
07.11.2002 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
17.03.2003 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
28.04.2003 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
12.09.2003 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
06.11.2003 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
02.12.2003 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
02.12.2003 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
21.01.2004 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 1
28.01.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 54
28.01.2004 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
28.01.2004 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
01.03.2004 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
01.03.2004 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
07.06.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 54
02.06.2006 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
01.03.2007 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 2
01.03.2007 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
01.03.2007 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 6
01.03.2007 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
26.03.2007 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
25.04.2007 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
25.04.2007 General enquiry Search / examination 1
25.04.2007 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
30.07.2007 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
13.09.2007 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 4
13.09.2007 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
02.10.2007 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
26.11.2007 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
26.11.2007 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
26.11.2007 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.12.2007 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
16.04.2009 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
16.04.2009 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
13.08.2009 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.08.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
13.08.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
19.08.2009 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
02.12.2009 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
09.02.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
09.02.2010 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 4
09.02.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
09.02.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
19.02.2010 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
20.12.2010 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
20.12.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.12.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
20.01.2011 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
25.07.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
25.07.2011 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
25.07.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
29.07.2011 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
24.08.2011 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
24.08.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
10.09.2011 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
23.12.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
23.12.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
23.12.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
19.12.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
19.12.2012 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
19.12.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
03.01.2013 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
25.01.2013 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
25.01.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
28.05.2013 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
28.05.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
28.05.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
04.06.2013 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
05.08.2013 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
05.08.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
05.08.2013 Claims Search / examination 1
05.08.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
05.08.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.09.2013 Text intended for grant Search / examination 124
12.09.2013 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
12.09.2013 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
12.09.2013 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
07.01.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
07.01.2014 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
07.01.2014 French translation of claims Search / examination 1
07.01.2014 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
07.01.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
10.01.2014 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 1
10.01.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
10.01.2014 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 3
10.01.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.01.2014 Request for printed patent specification received too late Search / examination 1
17.01.2014 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
30.01.2014 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
26.02.2014 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
08.01.2015 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1