blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1395214


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
15.07.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.08.2016  [2016/33]
10.06.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.07.2016  [2016/28]
17.04.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.05.2015  [2015/21]
27.03.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.04.2015  [2015/18]
16.01.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.02.2015  [2015/08]
02.01.2015 No opposition filed within time limit published on  04.02.2015  [2015/06]
28.11.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.12.2014  [2015/01]
21.11.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.12.2014  [2014/52]
07.11.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.12.2014  [2014/50]
24.10.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.11.2014  [2014/48]
12.09.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.10.2014  [2014/42]
22.08.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.09.2014  [2014/39]
08.08.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.09.2014  [2014/37]
24.01.2014 (Expected) grant published on  26.02.2014  [2014/09]
20.01.2014 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
20.01.2014 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
17.01.2014 Change - applicant published on  19.02.2014  [2014/08]
11.09.2013 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
30.08.2013 Change - classification published on  02.10.2013  [2013/40]
30.08.2013 Change - classification published on  02.10.2013  [2013/40]
06.08.2013 New entry: Reply to examination report
29.05.2013 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
03.05.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.01.2013 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
04.05.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.12.2011 New entry: Reply to examination report
24.08.2011 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
02.05.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.01.2011 Change - representative published on  23.02.2011  [2011/08]
30.04.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.02.2010 New entry: Receipt of request for further processing
12.02.2010 New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing
10.02.2010 New entry: Reply to examination report
25.11.2009 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
15.08.2009 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
08.05.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.04.2009 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
10.04.2009 First examination report
06.05.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.09.2007 Supplementary search report published on  17.10.2007  [2007/42]
08.05.2007 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.03.2007 Change - applicant published on  25.04.2007  [2007/17]
09.11.2006 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee
09.11.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.05.2006 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
22.03.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.06.2004 Deletion: Fee payment for extension state
29.06.2004 Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state
05.05.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.03.2004 Amendment by applicant
24.01.2004 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  10.03.2004  [2004/11]
24.01.2004 Request for examination filed published on  10.03.2004  [2004/11]
03.12.2003 PCT data prior to European publication
18.11.2003 PCT data prior to European publication
14.11.2003 PCT data prior to European publication
28.02.2003 PCT data prior to European publication
08.11.2002 PCT data prior to European publication
30.07.2002 PCT data prior to European publication