Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1395214

EP1395214 - PREVENTION OF MYOCARDIAL INFARCTION INDUCED VENTRICULAR EXPANSION AND REMODELING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.01.2015
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.07.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 17.08.2016  [2016/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cormend Technologies, LLC
24 Morses Pond Road
Wellesley, MA 02482 / US
[2014/08]
Former [2007/17]For all designated states
Satterfield, Richard
24 Morses Pond Road
Wellesley, MA 02482 / US
Former [2004/11]For all designated states
Myomend, Inc.
5 Commonwealth Road (Route 30), Suite 1C
Natick, MA 01760 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SANTAMORE, William, P.
1 Townsend Court
Medford, NJ 08055 / US
02 / LESNIAK, Jeanne, M.
6 Lodge Lane
Natick, MA 01760 / US
 [2004/11]
Representative(s)Tombling, Adrian George
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London SE1 2AU / GB
[2014/09]
Former [2011/08]Tombling, Adrian George
Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London
SE1 2HW / GB
Former [2004/11]Molnia, David , et al
Dörries Frank-Molnia Pohlman, Triftstrasse 13
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date02734033.025.04.2002
[2004/11]
WO2002US12976
Priority number, dateUS20010286521P27.04.2001         Original published format: US 286521 P
[2004/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO02087481
Date:07.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1395214
Date:10.03.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.11.2002
[2004/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1395214
Date:26.02.2014
Language:EN
[2014/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US07.11.2002
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.09.2007
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/14
[2013/40]
Former International [2004/11]A61F13/00, A61F2/00, A61K9/14, A61K9/50, A61K47/30, A61M31/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2004/11]
TitleGerman:PRÄVENTION EINER DURCH EINEN MYOKARDINFARKT AUSGELÖSTEN VENTRIKELEXPANSION UND REMODELLIERUNG[2004/11]
English:PREVENTION OF MYOCARDIAL INFARCTION INDUCED VENTRICULAR EXPANSION AND REMODELING[2004/11]
French:PREVENTION D'INFARCTUS MYOCARDIQUE INDUITE PAR UNE EXPANSION ET UN REMODELAGE VENTRICULAIRE[2004/11]
Entry into regional phase06.11.2003National basic fee paid 
06.11.2003Search fee paid 
06.11.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
06.11.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.11.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
06.11.2003Examination requested  [2004/11]
01.03.2004Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.04.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.12.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
09.02.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.08.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.12.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.01.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.08.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.09.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.01.2014Fee for grant paid
07.01.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.04.2009
Opposition(s)27.11.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2015/06]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
09.02.2010Request for further processing filed
09.02.2010Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
14.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
31.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
27.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
25.04.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
29.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
26.04.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
25.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
25.04.2012Renewal fee patent year 11
29.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 12
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200605   M06   Fee paid on   31.10.2006
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
IT26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
TR26.02.2014
IE25.04.2014
LU25.04.2014
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
GR27.05.2014
PT26.06.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/28]AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
IT26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
IE25.04.2014
LU25.04.2014
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
GR27.05.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2015/21]AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
IT26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
IE25.04.2014
LU25.04.2014
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2015/18]AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
IT26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
LU25.04.2014
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2015/08]AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
LU25.04.2014
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2015/01]AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
LU25.04.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2014/52]AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2014/50]AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2014/48]AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2014/42]AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2014/39]AT26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2014/37]AT26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
PT26.06.2014
Documents cited:Search[X]US5971993  (HUSSEIN HANY [US] ET AL) [X] 16,17,20,21,23 * column 3, line 56 - column 4, line 22; figures 1,4,5 *;
 [X]WO9921510  (KENSEY NASH CORP [US]) [X] 16,20-23 * figures 9A-9R * * figures 10A,10C *;
 [X]WO0006028  (MYOCOR INC [US]; MORTIER TODD J [US]; SCHWEICH CYRIL J JR [US]; VIDLUN) [X] 16,18,20,21,23 * figures 36,52 *;
 [X]WO9940868  (VENTRICA INC [US]) [X] 16,18,20-22 * figures 25-31 *;
 [X]US5961440  (SCHWEICH JR CYRIL J [US] ET AL) [X] 16,18,23 * figures 11,16,28-30 *;
 [A]US5086787  (GRANDJEAN PIERRE-ANDRE [BE] ET AL) [A] 16,19 * figures 3-6 *
International search[Y]US5661122
ExaminationWO0024452