blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1423159

EP1423159 - ECCENTRIC CATHETER SHAFT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.03.2008
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip11.09.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 14.10.2009  [2009/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Boston Scientific Limited
The Corporate Centre Bush Hill Bay Street
St. Michael / BB
[N/P]
Former [2007/19]For all designated states
Boston Scientific Limited
The Corporate Centre Bush Hill, Bay Street
St. Michael / BB
Former [2004/23]For all designated states
Boston Scientific Limited
The Corporate Centre, Bush Hill, Bay Street
St. Michael / BB
Inventor(s)01 / HACKETT, Steven, S.
8490 Rosewood Court North
Maple Grove, MN 55369 / US
 [2004/23]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2004/23]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date02734329.209.05.2002
[2004/23]
WO2002US14747
Priority number, dateUS2001094851707.09.2001         Original published format: US 948517
[2004/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO03037415
Date:08.05.2003
Language:EN
[2003/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1423159
Date:02.06.2004
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2004/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1423159
Date:09.05.2007
Language:EN
[2007/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.05.2003
ClassificationIPC:A61M25/00
[2004/23]
CPC:
A61M25/0043 (EP,US); A61M25/0021 (EP,US); A61M25/0032 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2004/23]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:EXZENTRISCHER KATHETERSCHAFT[2004/23]
English:ECCENTRIC CATHETER SHAFT[2004/23]
French:TIGE DE CATHETER DECALEE[2004/23]
Entry into regional phase10.03.2004National basic fee paid 
10.03.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
10.03.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.02.2003Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
10.03.2004Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.03.2004Examination requested  [2004/23]
19.04.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.08.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.11.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.03.2007Fee for grant paid
23.03.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.02.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
13.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT09.05.2007
CH09.05.2007
CY09.05.2007
DK09.05.2007
FI09.05.2007
LI09.05.2007
LU09.05.2007
TR09.05.2007
MC31.05.2007
SE09.08.2007
GR10.08.2007
PT09.10.2007
[2009/42]
Former [2009/38]AT09.05.2007
CH09.05.2007
CY09.05.2007
DK09.05.2007
FI09.05.2007
LI09.05.2007
LU09.05.2007
MC31.05.2007
SE09.08.2007
GR10.08.2007
PT09.10.2007
Former [2009/33]AT09.05.2007
CH09.05.2007
CY09.05.2007
DK09.05.2007
FI09.05.2007
LI09.05.2007
MC31.05.2007
SE09.08.2007
GR10.08.2007
PT09.10.2007
Former [2008/22]AT09.05.2007
CH09.05.2007
DK09.05.2007
FI09.05.2007
LI09.05.2007
MC31.05.2007
SE09.08.2007
GR10.08.2007
PT09.10.2007
Former [2008/10]AT09.05.2007
CH09.05.2007
DK09.05.2007
FI09.05.2007
LI09.05.2007
MC31.05.2007
SE09.08.2007
PT09.10.2007
Former [2008/09]AT09.05.2007
CH09.05.2007
DK09.05.2007
FI09.05.2007
LI09.05.2007
MC31.05.2007
SE09.08.2007
Former [2008/08]AT09.05.2007
CH09.05.2007
DK09.05.2007
FI09.05.2007
LI09.05.2007
SE09.08.2007
Former [2007/50]AT09.05.2007
CH09.05.2007
FI09.05.2007
LI09.05.2007
SE09.08.2007
Former [2007/48]CH09.05.2007
FI09.05.2007
LI09.05.2007
SE09.08.2007
Cited inInternational search[X]BE689333  (FLEURY) [X] 1,2,22,23,26* page 4, paragraph 2; figure - *;
 [X]US4601713  (FUQUA CLARK R [US]) [X] 1-7,9-18,20-29,31-34 * column 8, line 19 - line 46; figure - *;
 [X]US5968009  (SIMAN JAIME E [US]) [X] 1-3,22-24,26 * column 3, line 41 - column 4, line 32; figure - *
by applicantUS4323071
 US4782834
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.