Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1390962

EP1390962 - HIGH EFFICIENCY MULTI-COLOR ELECTRO-PHOSPHORESCENT OLEDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  14.01.2011
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.12.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
06.12.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE TRUSTEES OF PRINCETON UNIVERSITY
5th Floor, New South Building
Princeton, NJ 08544-0036 / US
For all designated states
UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA
3716 South Hope Street Suite 313
Los Angeles, CA 90007-4344 / US
[2011/07]
Former [2004/09]For all designated states
THE TRUSTEES OF PRINCETON UNIVERSITY
5th Floor, New South Building
Princeton, NJ 08544-0036 / US
For all designated states
UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA
3716 South Hope Street Suite 313
Los Angeles, CA 90007-4344 / US
Inventor(s)01 / D'ANDRADE, Brian
5Q Hibben, Faculty Road
Princeton, NJ 08540 / US
02 / THOMPSON, Mark, E.
4447 Pepper Creek Way
Anaheim, CA 92807 / US
03 / FORREST, Stephen, R.
148 Hunt Drive
Princeton, NJ 08540 / US
 [2004/09]
Representative(s)Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/11]Kopf, Korbinian Paul
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3
80335 München / DE
Former [2004/09]Wallace, Sheila Jane , et al
Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street
London WC1A 1LW / GB
Application number, filing date02734378.913.05.2002
[2004/09]
WO2002US14956
Priority number, dateUS20010291496P16.05.2001         Original published format: US 291496 P
[2004/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO02091814
Date:21.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/47]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1390962
Date:25.02.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.11.2002
[2004/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1390962
Date:16.02.2011
Language:EN
[2011/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US27.03.2003
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.11.2007
ClassificationInternational:H01J1/62, H01J63/04, C09K11/06, H01J29/32, H05B33/14, H01J1/74
[2007/52]
Former International [2004/09]H01J1/62, H01J63/04
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2004/09]
Extension statesAL01.12.2003
LT01.12.2003
LV01.12.2003
MK01.12.2003
RO01.12.2003
SI01.12.2003
TitleGerman:HOCHEFFIZIENTE MEHRFARBIGE ELEKTROPHOSPHORESZENTE OLEDS[2004/09]
English:HIGH EFFICIENCY MULTI-COLOR ELECTRO-PHOSPHORESCENT OLEDS[2004/09]
French:DIODES ORGANIQUES ELECTROLUMINESCENTES (OLED) ELECTROPHOSPHORESCENTES A COULEURS MULTIPLES HAUTE EFFICACITE[2004/09]
Entry into regional phase01.12.2003National basic fee paid 
01.12.2003Search fee paid 
01.12.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
01.12.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.12.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
01.12.2003Examination requested  [2004/09]
03.02.2004Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.07.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.12.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.08.2010Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.08.2010
18.08.2010Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
24.08.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.12.2010Fee for grant paid
21.12.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP10181013.3  / EP2259285
EP14186883.6  / EP2822019
EP18151943.0  / EP3333876
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  16.11.2011  16.01.2018  WITHDRAWN
BASF SE
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Hollah, Dorothee
Patentanwälte
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB
Eastsite One
Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4
68163 Mannheim / DE
 02  16.11.2011  27.12.2011  ADMISSIBLE
OSRAM GmbH
Marcel-Breuer-Strasse 6
80807 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Epping - Hermann - Fischer
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Schloßschmidstraße 5
80639 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2018/08]
Opponent(s)01  16.11.2011  16.01.2018  WITHDRAWN
BASF SE
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Hollah, Dorothee
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4
68163 Mannheim / DE
 02  16.11.2011  27.12.2011  ADMISSIBLE
OSRAM GmbH
Marcel-Breuer-Strasse 6
80807 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Epping - Hermann - Fischer
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Schloßschmidstraße 5
80639 München / DE
Former [2015/34]
Opponent(s)01  16.11.2011  27.12.2011  ADMISSIBLE
BASF SE
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Hollah, Dorothee
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4
68163 Mannheim / DE
 02  16.11.2011  27.12.2011  ADMISSIBLE
OSRAM GmbH
Marcel-Breuer-Strasse 6
80807 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Epping - Hermann - Fischer
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Schloßschmidstraße 5
80639 München / DE
Former [2014/05]
Opponent(s)01  16.11.2011  27.12.2011  ADMISSIBLE
BASF SE
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Hollah, Dorothee
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4
68163 Mannheim / DE
 02  16.11.2011  27.12.2011  ADMISSIBLE
OSRAM GmbH
Marcel-Breuer-Strasse 6
80807 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Worbs, Michael
Epping Hermann Fischer
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Schloßschmidstraße 5
80639 München / DE
Former [2014/02]
Opponent(s)01  16.11.2011  27.12.2011  ADMISSIBLE
BASF SE
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Leybach, Holger Hugo
BASF Schweiz AG
Klybeckstrasse 141
4057 Basel / CH
 02  16.11.2011  27.12.2011  ADMISSIBLE
OSRAM GmbH
Marcel-Breuer-Strasse 6
80807 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Worbs, Michael
Epping Hermann Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55
80339 München / DE
Former [2013/16]
Opponent(s)01  16.11.2011  27.12.2011  ADMISSIBLE
BASF SE
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Leybach, Holger Hugo
BASF Schweiz AG
Klybeckstrasse 141
4057 Basel / CH
 02  16.11.2011  27.12.2011  ADMISSIBLE
OSRAM GmbH
Marcel-Breuer-Strasse 6
80807 München / DE
Former [2013/09]
Opponent(s)01  16.11.2011  27.12.2011  ADMISSIBLE
BASF SE
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Leybach, Holger Hugo
BASF Schweiz AG
Klybeckstrasse 141
4057 Basel / CH
 02  16.11.2011  27.12.2011  ADMISSIBLE
OSRAM GmbH
Hellabrunner Strasse 1
81543 München / DE
Former [2011/52]
Opponent(s)01  16.11.2011   
BASF SE
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Leybach, Holger Hugo
BASF Schweiz AG
Klybeckstrasse 141
4057 Basel / CH
 02  16.11.2011   
Osram AG
Hellabrunner Strasse 1
81543 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Worbs, Michael
Epping Hermann Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55
80339 München / DE
30.12.2011Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
28.06.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
04.02.2014Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.02.2014
11.02.2014Date of oral proceedings
16.12.2015Date of oral proceedings
04.01.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
04.01.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition07.03.2016Appeal received No.  T0623/16
13.05.2016Statement of grounds filed
02.07.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
19.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
30.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
30.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
28.05.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
27.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
25.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT16.02.2011
BE16.02.2011
CY16.02.2011
DK16.02.2011
FI16.02.2011
IT16.02.2011
SE16.02.2011
TR16.02.2011
IE13.05.2011
LU13.05.2011
GR17.05.2011
ES27.05.2011
CH31.05.2011
LI31.05.2011
MC31.05.2011
PT16.06.2011
[2013/44]
Former [2011/47]AT16.02.2011
BE16.02.2011
CY16.02.2011
DK16.02.2011
FI16.02.2011
SE16.02.2011
GR17.05.2011
ES27.05.2011
PT16.06.2011
Former [2011/39]AT16.02.2011
BE16.02.2011
CY16.02.2011
FI16.02.2011
SE16.02.2011
GR17.05.2011
ES27.05.2011
PT16.06.2011
Former [2011/37]BE16.02.2011
CY16.02.2011
FI16.02.2011
SE16.02.2011
GR17.05.2011
ES27.05.2011
PT16.06.2011
Former [2011/36]SE16.02.2011
GR17.05.2011
ES27.05.2011
PT16.06.2011
Documents cited:Search[X]US5837391  (UTSUGI KOJI [JP]) [X] 1-11 * figure 11 * * column 3, lines 19-28 * * column 4, lines 52-63 * * column 5, lines 7-13,21-26,30-40,53-61 * * column 7, lines 46-51 * * column 8, lines 25-32,43-48 * * column 9, lines 6-8,14-50 * * column 10, lines 51-55 * * column 11, lines 7-9 *;
 [A]US5231329  (NISHIKITANI YOSHINORI [JP] ET AL) [A] 1-11 * column 1, lines 40-44 *;
 [X]US5707745  (FORREST STEPHEN ROSS [US] ET AL) [X] 1-11 * figures 2a,2c * * column 2, lines 62-65 * * column 3, lines 1-3,13-16 * * column 4, lines 20-29 * * column 5, lines 16-20,53-61 * * column 7, line 7 - column 9, line 61 * * sentences -54 *;
 [X]WO0108230  (UNIV PRINCETON [US]; UNIV SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA [US]) [X] 1-11 * page 4, lines 7-9,20-30 * * page 6, lines 19-21 * * page 7, lines 6,7 * * page 9, lines 5-9 * * page 11, line 28 - page 12, line 10 * * page 15, lines 1-15 * * page 16, line 1 - page 18, line 5 * * example 1 * * page 27, line 15 - page 30, line 5 *;
 [X]  - BALDO M A ET AL, "HIGHLY EFFICIENT PHOSPHORESCENT EMISSION FROM ORGANIC ELECTROLUMINESCENT DEVICES", NATURE, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, LONDON, GB, (19980910), vol. 395, no. 6698, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 151 - 154, XP001002103 [X] 7,8 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/25954
 [X]  - BALDO M A ET AL, "Very high-efficiency green organic light-emitting devices based on electrophosphorescence", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, AIP, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, MELVILLE, NY, US, (19990705), vol. 75, no. 1, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 4 - 6, XP012023409 [X] 7,8 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.124258
International search[X]US5837391  ;
 [A]US5707745
Examination   - LI L-D, YANG S-Z, "Room temperature phosphorescence properties of 27 coumarin derivatives on filter paper", ANALYTICA CHIMICA ACTA, (1994), vol. 296, pages 99 - 105
by applicant   - R. S. DESHPANDE; V. BULOVIC; S. R. FORREST, APPL. PHYS. LETT., (1999), vol. 75, page 888
    - F. HIDE; P. KOZODOY; S. P. DENBAARS; A. J. HEEGER, APPL. PHYS. LETT., (1997), vol. 70, page 2664
    - J. KIDO; H. SHIONOYA; K. NAGAI, APPL. PHYS. LETT., (1995), vol. 67, page 22B1
    - C. ADACHI; M. A. BALDO; M. E. THOMPSON; R. C. KWONG; M. E. THOMPSON; S. R. FORREST, APPL. PHYS. LETT., (2001), vol. 78, page 1622
    - C. ADACHI; M. A. BALDO; S. R. FORREST; M. E. THOMPSON, APPL. PHYS. LETT., (2000), vol. 77, page 904
    - M. A. BALDO; S. LAMANSKY; P. E. BURROWS; M. E. THOMPSON; S. R. FORREST, APPL. PHYS. LETT., (1999), vol. 75, page 4