Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1401404

EP1401404 - METHOD OF ENCAPSULATING AN ACTIVE SUBSTANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  14.10.2016
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip14.10.2016Revocation of patentpublished on 16.11.2016  [2016/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CSIR
Corporate Building, Scientia
Pretoria 0002 / ZA
[2008/16]
Former [2004/14]For all designated states
CSIR
Corporate Building, Scientia
Pretoria 0002 / ZA
Inventor(s)01 / MOOLMAN, Francis, Sean
Vleilorie No. 9 22 Wilkinson Street Kilner Park
0186 Pretoria / ZA
02 / ROLFES, Heidi
408 Stonewall Lane Faerie Glen Extension 8
0043 Pretoria / ZA
03 / VAN DER MERWE, Thilo, Lothar
57 Gerrit Maritz Avenue Dalview
1541 Brakpan / ZA
 [2004/14]
Representative(s)Becker & Kurig Partnerschaft Patentanwälte PartmbB
Patentanwälte
Bavariastrasse 7
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/14]Becker Kurig Straus
Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date02735680.728.05.2002
[2004/14]
WO2002IB01853
Priority number, dateZA2001000445130.05.2001         Original published format: ZA 200104451
[2004/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO03013478
Date:20.02.2003
Language:EN
[2003/08]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1401404
Date:31.03.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.2003
[2004/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1401404
Date:16.04.2008
Language:EN
[2008/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.05.2003
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/48, A61K9/50, A61K9/14, A61K9/16
[2004/14]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   GR,   IE,   LI,   LU,   MC,   PT,   SE,   TR [2004/50]
Former [2004/14]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  GB,  GR,  IE,  LI,  LU,  MC,  PT,  SE,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR VERKAPSELUNG EINES WIRKSTOFFS[2004/14]
English:METHOD OF ENCAPSULATING AN ACTIVE SUBSTANCE[2004/14]
French:PROCEDE D'ENCAPSULATION D'UNE SUBSTANCE ACTIVE[2004/14]
Entry into regional phase25.11.2003National basic fee paid 
25.11.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
25.11.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.10.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
25.11.2003Examination requested  [2004/14]
25.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.11.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.03.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.01.2007Date of oral proceedings
09.03.2007Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
02.08.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.10.2007Observations by third parties
12.12.2007Fee for grant paid
12.12.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  16.01.2009  02.02.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Critical Pharmaceuticals Limited
Blocity, Nottingham Pennyfoot Street Nottingham
NG1 1GF / GB
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson, et al
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2013/38]
Opponent(s)01  16.01.2009  02.02.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Critical Pharmaceuticals Limited
Blocity, Nottingham Pennyfoot Street Nottingham
NG1 1GF / GB
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson LLP, et al
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham
NG1 5GG / GB
Former [2010/38]
Opponent(s)01  16.01.2009  02.02.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Critical Pharmaceuticals Limited
Blocity, Nottingham Pennyfoot Street Nottingham
NG1 1GF / GB
Opponent's representative
Snodin, Michael D., et al
Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham
NG1 5DD / GB
Former [2009/09]
Opponent(s)01  16.01.2009   
Critical Pharmaceuticals Limited
Blocity, Nottingham Pennyfoot Street Nottingham
NG1 1GF / GB
Opponent's representative
Crowhurst, Charlotte Waveney, et al
Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham
NG1 5DD / GB
20.02.2009Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
18.06.2009Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
19.10.2010Date of oral proceedings
09.12.2010Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
09.12.2010Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
03.02.2015Legal effect of revocation of patent [2016/46]
Appeal following opposition08.02.2011Appeal received No.  T0301/11
06.04.2011Statement of grounds filed
03.02.2015Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
03.02.2015Date of oral proceedings
09.02.2015Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
31.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
31.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH31.05.2008
LI31.05.2008
[2016/20]
Former [2016/11]CH31.05.2008
LI31.05.2008
Former [2016/10]CH31.05.2008
LI31.05.2008
Former [2016/09]CH31.05.2008
LI31.05.2008
Former [2016/06]CH31.05.2008
LI31.05.2008
Former [2009/12]CH31.05.2008
LI31.05.2008
Cited inInternational search[X]WO0115664  (WALKER STEPHEN ERNEST ;WILKINS SIMON ANTHONY (GB); YORK PETER (GB)) [X] 1,2 * page 5, line 13 - page 8, line 28 *;
 [YD]US6221399  (TRUTER PATRICIA-ANN ET AL) [YD] 1-16 * claims 1-3,6-15 * * column 3, line 62 - column 6, line 38 * * column 7, line 29 - line 38 * * column 8, line 5 - line 31 * * column 8, line 51 - line 63 * * example 1 *;
 [Y]US5766637  (SHINE ANNETTE DUDOK ET AL) [Y] 1-16 * claims 1-6,17-22,38-46 * * column 6, line 60 - column 7, line 35 *;
 [Y]WO9925322  (CARLI FABIO ;COLOMBO ITALO (IT); ALESSI PAOLO (IT); CORTESI ANGELO) [Y] 1-16 * page 1, line 34 - page 2, line 10 * * claims 1-9 *
 [Y]  - NIEHAUS M ET AL, "COATING OF PARTICLES IN A FLUIDIZED BED USING SUPERCRITICAL CARBON DIOXIDE", PROCEEDINGS OF MEETING OF SUPERCRITICAL FLUIDS, XX, XX, (1998), pages 361 - 367, XP001020741 [Y] 1-16 * page 361, line L - page 362, line F *
 [Y]  - JUNG J ET AL, "Particle design using supercritical fluids: Literature and patent survey", JOURNAL OF SUPERCRITICAL FLUIDS, PRA PRESS, US, (200108), vol. 20, no. 3, ISSN 0896-8446, pages 179 - 219, XP004247117 [Y] 1-16 * page 180, column R, paragraph L - page 181, column L, paragraph 2 * * Part 5 (page 210- page 216) * * Part 6 (page 216- page 218) *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0896-8446(01)00064-X
otherWO9851347