Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1401404 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1401404



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1667
12.10.2016 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
30.04.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
28.04.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
27.04.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
21.04.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
20.04.2015 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
20.04.2015 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
15.04.2015 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 22
09.02.2015 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
09.02.2015 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
04.02.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.02.2015 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 2
02.02.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
02.02.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
30.01.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.01.2015 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 4
28.01.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
26.01.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
26.01.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
09.01.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.12.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
30.12.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
30.12.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
16.12.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.12.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
11.12.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
31.10.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
27.10.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
23.10.2014 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 6
23.10.2014 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 6
14.10.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
10.10.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
09.10.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
06.10.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
04.10.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
30.09.2014 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 4
25.09.2014 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
25.09.2014 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
14.08.2013 Communication of amended entries Search / examination 1
31.07.2013 Request for change of opponent's representative Search / examination 1
22.02.2013 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 2
02.01.2013 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
22.10.2012 Communication of amended entries Appeal 1
22.10.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.09.2012 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
13.05.2011 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.05.2011 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
10.05.2011 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 56
09.05.2011 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 61
15.04.2011 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
14.04.2011 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
06.04.2011 Claims Appeal 3
06.04.2011 Claims Appeal 3
06.04.2011 Claims Appeal 3
06.04.2011 Description Appeal 1
06.04.2011 Description Appeal 2
06.04.2011 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 7
15.02.2011 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
09.02.2011 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
08.02.2011 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
16.12.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
16.12.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
14.12.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
11.12.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
09.12.2010 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
09.12.2010 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 6
09.12.2010 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
09.12.2010 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 7
02.12.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.11.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
29.11.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
23.11.2010 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
19.10.2010 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
30.08.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.08.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.08.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.08.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.08.2010 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.08.2010 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.08.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.08.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.08.2010 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 6
20.08.2010 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
20.08.2010 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 3
20.08.2010 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 17
20.08.2010 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Opposition 1
20.08.2010 Communication of amended entries Opposition 1
20.08.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
20.08.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
20.08.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
20.08.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 34
20.08.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
20.08.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
20.08.2010 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 10
19.08.2010 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 3
19.08.2010 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 17
19.08.2010 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 6
19.08.2010 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
19.08.2010 Claims Opposition 3
19.08.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
19.08.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
19.08.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
19.08.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 34
19.08.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
19.08.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
19.08.2010 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 7
19.08.2010 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.08.2010 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 9
18.08.2010 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
17.08.2010 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
11.03.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
10.03.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
10.03.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.03.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.03.2010 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 7
04.03.2010 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
04.03.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.03.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.02.2010 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
28.01.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.01.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 17
20.01.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 124
20.01.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 76
20.01.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 50
26.06.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.06.2009 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 1
20.02.2009 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
20.02.2009 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
26.01.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.01.2009 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
19.01.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
19.01.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 41
19.01.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
19.01.2009 Notice of opposition Opposition 7
19.01.2009 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
19.01.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 45
19.01.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 80
19.01.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 30
19.01.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
19.01.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
16.01.2009 Letter concerning fees and payments Opposition 1
16.01.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
16.01.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 41
16.01.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
16.01.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
16.01.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
16.01.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
16.01.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
16.01.2009 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
16.01.2009 Notice of opposition Opposition 7
16.01.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 45
20.03.2008 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
12.12.2007 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
12.12.2007 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
12.12.2007 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
20.11.2007 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations Search / examination 2
02.11.2007 Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations Search / examination 1
02.11.2007 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 1
30.10.2007 Observations by third parties Search / examination 5
30.10.2007 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 45
29.10.2007 Observations by third parties Search / examination 6
29.10.2007 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 45
02.08.2007 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
02.08.2007 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
02.08.2007 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
02.08.2007 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
02.08.2007 Text intended for grant Search / examination 32
09.03.2007 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
09.03.2007 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
23.01.2007 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
23.01.2007 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 19
22.01.2007 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 2
22.01.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 18
28.12.2006 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
14.12.2006 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
12.12.2006 Claims Search / examination 5
12.12.2006 Claims Search / examination 5
12.12.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 6
02.06.2006 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
31.05.2006 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
30.05.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
30.05.2006 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
24.05.2006 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
16.03.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
02.03.2006 Claims Search / examination 5
02.03.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 8
22.12.2005 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
16.12.2005 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
05.12.2005 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
05.12.2005 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
03.11.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
03.11.2005 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
22.10.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
18.10.2004 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
13.10.2004 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
23.08.2004 Claims Search / examination 1
23.08.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 13
25.06.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
25.06.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
11.06.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 9
18.02.2004 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
16.02.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 9
13.02.2004 Reply by International Bureau Search / examination 1
22.01.2004 Refund order of filing/examination fee Search / examination 1
20.01.2004 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
16.01.2004 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
07.01.2004 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.01.2004 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.01.2004 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
05.01.2004 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 1
29.12.2003 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
25.11.2003 Annex Search / examination 2
25.11.2003 Annex Search / examination 1
25.11.2003 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
03.10.2003 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
03.10.2003 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 8
29.08.2003 Annex to International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
29.08.2003 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
29.08.2003 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
29.08.2003 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
29.08.2003 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
29.08.2003 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
29.08.2003 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
29.08.2003 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
29.08.2003 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
25.07.2003 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
25.07.2003 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
25.07.2003 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 22
23.07.2003 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
23.07.2003 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
23.07.2003 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 22
10.06.2003 Written opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
10.06.2003 Written opinion - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
10.06.2003 Written opinion - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
29.05.2003 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
29.05.2003 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 1
03.04.2003 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 1
20.02.2003 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 33
15.10.2002 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
15.10.2002 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
07.10.2002 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
07.10.2002 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
29.07.2002 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 4
14.06.2002 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
14.06.2002 Claims International Searching Authority 4
14.06.2002 Description International Searching Authority 23
14.06.2002 Drawings International Searching Authority 5