Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1389980

EP1389980 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR ARTICULAR RESURFACING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.02.2012
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip04.07.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 06.08.2014  [2014/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ConforMIS, Inc.
11 North Avenue
Burlington, MA 01803 / US
[N/P]
Former [2011/01]For all designated states
Conformis, Inc.
11 North Avenue
Burlington, MA 01803 / US
Former [2008/14]For all designated states
Conformis, Inc.
2 Fourth Avenue
Burlington, MA 01803 / US
Former [2004/45]For all designated states
Conformis, Inc.
1720 South Amphlett Boulevard, Suite 240
San Mateo, CA 94402 / US
Former [2004/25]For all designated states
Imaging Therapeutics, Inc.
1720 South Amphlett Boulevard, Suite 240
San Mateo, CA 94402 / US
Former [2004/09]For all designated states
Imaging Therapeutics
1720 South Amphlett Boulevard, Suite 240
San Mateo, CA 94402 / US
Inventor(s)01 / LANG, Philipp
7 Fair Oaks Terrace
Lexington, MA 02421 / US
02 / LINDER, Barry
29 Bluehaven Court
Danville, CA 94506 / US
03 / STEINES, Daniel
210 Lincoln Street
Lexington, MA 02421 / US
 [2011/13]
Former [2004/09]01 / LANG, Philipp
36 Fairlawn Lane
Lexington, MA 02420 / US
02 / LINDER, Barry
29 Bluehaven Court
Danville, CA 94506 / US
03 / STEINES, Daniel
3619 Park Boulevard
Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US
Representative(s)Grund, Martin
Grund Intellectual Property Group
Patentanwalt und Solicitor PartG mbB
Postfach 44 05 16
80754 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2006/08]Grund, Martin
GRUND Intellectual Property Group Postfach 44 05 16
80754 München / DE
Former [2004/09]Grund, Martin, Dr. , et al
Dr. Volker Vossius, Patentanwaltskanzlei, Geibelstrasse 6
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date02737254.928.05.2002
[2004/09]
WO2002US16945
Priority number, dateUS20010293488P25.05.2001         Original published format: US 293488 P
US20020363527P12.03.2002         Original published format: US 363527 P
US20020380695P14.05.2002         Original published format: US 380695 P
US20020380692P14.05.2002         Original published format: US 380692 P
[2004/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO02096268
Date:05.12.2002
Language:EN
[2002/49]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1389980
Date:25.02.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.2002
[2004/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1389980
Date:06.04.2011
Language:EN
[2011/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US31.07.2003
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.03.2007
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/30
[2004/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2004/09]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR REPARATUR DER OBERFLÄCHE VON GELENKEN[2004/09]
English:METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR ARTICULAR RESURFACING[2004/09]
French:METHODES ET COMPOSITIONS D'ARTHROPLASTIE[2004/09]
Entry into regional phase28.10.2003National basic fee paid 
28.10.2003Search fee paid 
28.10.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
28.10.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.12.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
28.10.2003Examination requested  [2004/09]
04.02.2004Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.08.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.12.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.07.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.01.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.01.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
11.03.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.10.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.02.2011Fee for grant paid
22.02.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.01.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
24.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
30.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
30.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
28.05.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
27.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
20.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY06.04.2011
DK06.04.2011
FI06.04.2011
IT06.04.2011
TR06.04.2011
LU28.05.2011
MC31.05.2011
GR07.07.2011
PT08.08.2011
[2014/32]
Former [2013/44]CY06.04.2011
DK06.04.2011
FI06.04.2011
TR06.04.2011
LU28.05.2011
MC31.05.2011
GR07.07.2011
PT08.08.2011
Former [2013/25]CY06.04.2011
DK06.04.2011
FI06.04.2011
LU28.05.2011
MC31.05.2011
GR07.07.2011
PT08.08.2011
Former [2012/10]CY06.04.2011
DK06.04.2011
FI06.04.2011
MC31.05.2011
GR07.07.2011
PT08.08.2011
Former [2012/05]CY06.04.2011
FI06.04.2011
MC31.05.2011
GR07.07.2011
PT08.08.2011
Former [2011/49]CY06.04.2011
FI06.04.2011
GR07.07.2011
PT08.08.2011
Former [2011/47]PT08.08.2011
Documents cited:Search[X]DE19926083  (UNIVERSITAETSKLINIKUM FREIBURG [DE]) [X] 17-20 * page 2, line 31 - page 3, line 35 *;
 [X]WO9852498  (JANSSON VOLKMAR [DE], et al) [X] 17-19 * page 7 - page 15 * * page 18 - page 19 *;
 [X]DE19803673  (MEENEN NORBERT M DR [DE], et al) [X] 17,19,20 * column 1, line 39 - column 3, line 20 * * column 6, line 55 - line 67 *;
 [X]US5067964  (RICHMOND JAMES W [US], et al) [X] 17,19 * column 3, line 25 - column 4, line 64 *;
 [X]WO9746665  (SULZER ORTHOPEDICS LTD [CH], et al) [X] 17,19,20 * page 9, line 9 - page 13, line 2 * * page 24, line 10 - page 25, line 11 * * page 27, line 29 - page 28, line 9 *
International search[X]US4055862  (FARLING GENE M);
 [X]US5067964  (RICHMOND JAMES W [US], et al);
 [X]US5306311  (STONE KEVIN R [US], et al);
 [X]US5632745  (SCHWARTZ ROBERT E [US]);
 [X]US6120541  (JOHNSON LANNY L [US])