Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1392261

EP1392261 - DELIVERY OF NONSTEROIDAL ANTIINFLAMMATORY DRUGS THROUGH AN INHALATION ROUTE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.11.2009
Database last updated on 22.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.09.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 02.11.2011  [2011/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alexza Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
1001 E. Meadow Circle
Palo Alto CA 94303 / US
[2006/01]
Former [2004/10]For all designated states
Alexza Molecular Delivery Corporation
1001 E. Meadow Circle
Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US
Inventor(s)01 / RABINOWITZ, Joshua, D. Alexza Molecular Del. Corp
1001 E. Meadow Circle
Palo Alto, California 94303 / US
02 / ZAFFARONI, Alejandro, C. c/o Alexza Molecular Delivery Corporation
1001 E. Meadow Circle
Palo Alto, California 94303 / US
 [2008/52]
Former [2004/17]01 / RABINOWITZ, Joshua, D. Alexa Molecular Del. Corp
1001 E. Meadow Circle Alexza Molecular Del. Corp.
Palo Alto, California 94303 / US
02 / ZAFFARONI, Alejandro, C.
1001 E. Meadow Circle Alexza Molecular Del. Corp.
Palo Alto, California 94303 / US
Former [2004/10]01 / RABINOWITZ, Joshua, D.
750 N. Shoreline Blvd., 50
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
02 / ZAFFARONI, Alejandro, C.
1 Faxon Forest
Atherton, CA 94027 / US
Representative(s)Clegg, Richard Ian , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2006/15]Clegg, Richard Ian , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Former [2004/10]Thomson, Paul Anthony
Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square
Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB
Application number, filing date02739410.523.05.2002
[2004/10]
WO2002US16558
Priority number, dateUS20010294203P24.05.2001         Original published format: US 294203 P
US20010317479P05.09.2001         Original published format: US 317479 P
[2004/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO02094246
Date:28.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/48]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1392261
Date:03.03.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.2002
[2004/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1392261
Date:31.12.2008
Language:EN
[2009/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.01.2003
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/72, A61K31/405
[2004/10]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2004/10]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SI21.11.2003
TitleGerman:VERABREICHUNG VON NICHTSTEROIDALEN ENTZÜNDUNGSHEMMENDEN WIRKSTOFFEN DURCH INHALATION[2004/10]
English:DELIVERY OF NONSTEROIDAL ANTIINFLAMMATORY DRUGS THROUGH AN INHALATION ROUTE[2004/10]
French:ADMINISTRATION DE MEDICAMENTS ANTI-INFLAMMATOIRES NON STEROIDIENS VIA UNE VOIE PULMONAIRE[2004/10]
Entry into regional phase21.11.2003National basic fee paid 
21.11.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
21.11.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.11.2003Examination requested  [2004/10]
18.02.2004Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.05.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.09.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.10.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.04.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
23.05.2008Fee for grant paid
23.05.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.10.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/50]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent
23.05.2008Request for further processing filed
23.05.2008Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
04.06.2008Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
19.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
23.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
14.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT31.12.2008
BE31.12.2008
CY31.12.2008
DK31.12.2008
FI31.12.2008
NL31.12.2008
TR31.12.2008
SE31.03.2009
GR01.04.2009
ES11.04.2009
IE23.05.2009
LU23.05.2009
CH31.05.2009
LI31.05.2009
MC31.05.2009
PT01.06.2009
[2011/43]
Former [2011/21]AT31.12.2008
BE31.12.2008
DK31.12.2008
FI31.12.2008
NL31.12.2008
SE31.03.2009
GR01.04.2009
ES11.04.2009
IE23.05.2009
LU23.05.2009
CH31.05.2009
LI31.05.2009
MC31.05.2009
PT01.06.2009
Former [2010/48]AT31.12.2008
BE31.12.2008
DK31.12.2008
FI31.12.2008
NL31.12.2008
SE31.03.2009
GR01.04.2009
ES11.04.2009
IE23.05.2009
CH31.05.2009
LI31.05.2009
MC31.05.2009
PT01.06.2009
Former [2010/21]AT31.12.2008
BE31.12.2008
DK31.12.2008
FI31.12.2008
NL31.12.2008
SE31.03.2009
ES11.04.2009
IE23.05.2009
CH31.05.2009
LI31.05.2009
MC31.05.2009
PT01.06.2009
Former [2010/08]AT31.12.2008
BE31.12.2008
DK31.12.2008
FI31.12.2008
NL31.12.2008
SE31.03.2009
ES11.04.2009
CH31.05.2009
LI31.05.2009
MC31.05.2009
PT01.06.2009
Former [2010/04]AT31.12.2008
BE31.12.2008
DK31.12.2008
FI31.12.2008
NL31.12.2008
SE31.03.2009
ES11.04.2009
MC31.05.2009
PT01.06.2009
Former [2009/46]AT31.12.2008
BE31.12.2008
DK31.12.2008
FI31.12.2008
NL31.12.2008
SE31.03.2009
ES11.04.2009
PT01.06.2009
Former [2009/40]AT31.12.2008
BE31.12.2008
FI31.12.2008
NL31.12.2008
SE31.03.2009
ES11.04.2009
PT01.06.2009
Former [2009/38]BE31.12.2008
FI31.12.2008
NL31.12.2008
SE31.03.2009
ES11.04.2009
PT01.06.2009
Former [2009/33]BE31.12.2008
FI31.12.2008
NL31.12.2008
ES11.04.2009
Former [2009/32]BE31.12.2008
FI31.12.2008
NL31.12.2008
Former [2009/25]FI31.12.2008
NL31.12.2008
Cited inInternational search[XA]EP0606486  (TEIJIN LTD [JP]) [X] 1-7 * page 2, line 38 - page 3, line 32 * * page 6, line 40 * * page 8, line 54 - page 9, line 35 * [A] 8-15;
 [XA]US5993805  (SUTTON ANDREW D [GB], et al) [X] 1-7 * column 3, line 43 - column 5, line 47 * * column 9, line 60 - line 67 * * example 13 * [A] 8-15;
 [XA]US6051566  (BIANCO SEBASTIANO [IT]) [X] 1-7 * column 1, line 48 - column 2, line 12 * [A] 8-15;
 [XA]WO0027363  (NANOSYSTEMS [US]) [X] 1-7 * page 7, line 23 - page 9, line 20 * * examples 3,4 * [A] 8-15;
 [PXA]WO0224158  (ADVANCED INHALATION RES INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-7 * page 7, line 12 - line 30 * * page 12, line 28 - page 13, line 9 * * example 4 * [PA] 8-15