Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1399796

EP1399796 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TRACKING STATUS OF RESOURCE IN A SYSTEM FOR MANAGING USE OF THE RESOURCES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  23.01.2015
Database last updated on 28.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip23.01.2015Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 25.02.2015  [2015/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.
103 Foulk Road, Suite 200-M
Wilmington, Delaware 19803 / US
[2006/27]
Former [2004/13]For all designated states
ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.
103 Foulk Road, Suite 200-M
Wilmington, Delaware 19803 / US
Inventor(s)01 / WANG, Xin
3005 Shrine Place, 8
Los Angeles, CA 90007 / US
02 / DEMARTINI, Thomas
6410 Green Valley Circle 130
Culver City, CA 90230 / US
03 / CHEN, Eddie
6796 Vallon Drive
Rancho Palos Verdes, CA 90275 / US
04 / GILLIAM, Charles, P.
27 Beach Drive
Darien, CT 06820 / US
05 / HAM, Manuel
10259 Pangborn Avenue
Downey, CA 90241 / US
06 / LAO, Guillermo
5531 Lorna Street
Torrance, CA 90503 / US
07 / RALEY, Michael
12834 Verdura Avenue
Downey, CA 90242 / US
08 / TA, Thahn
18694 Stratton Lane
Huntington Beach, CA 92648 / US
09 / TADAYON, Bijan
20920 Scottsbury Drive
Germantown, MD 20876 / US
 [2004/13]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/09]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Former [2004/13]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date02739695.107.06.2002
[2004/13]
WO2002US17751
Priority number, dateUS20010296113P07.06.2001         Original published format: US 296113 P
US20010296117P07.06.2001         Original published format: US 296117 P
US20010296118P07.06.2001         Original published format: US 296118 P
US20010331621P20.11.2001         Original published format: US 331621 P
US20010331623P20.11.2001         Original published format: US 331623 P
US20010331624P20.11.2001         Original published format: US 331624 P
US20010331625P20.11.2001         Original published format: US 331625 P
[2004/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO02101493
Date:19.12.2002
Language:EN
[2002/51]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1399796
Date:24.03.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.2002
[2004/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1399796
Date:05.07.2006
Language:EN
[2006/27]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1399796
Date:25.02.2015
Language:EN
[2015/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US27.03.2003
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.04.2004
ClassificationInternational:G06F1/00
[2004/13]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2004/13]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM VERFOLGEN DES STATUS EINES BETRIEBSMITTELS IN EINEM SYSTEM ZUR VERWALTUNG DER BENUTZUNG DER BETRIEBSMITTEL[2004/13]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TRACKING STATUS OF RESOURCE IN A SYSTEM FOR MANAGING USE OF THE RESOURCES[2004/13]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE SUIVI DE L'ETAT D'UNE RESSOURCE DANS UN SYSTEME POUR UNE GESTION DE L'UTILISATION DES RESSOURCES[2004/13]
Entry into regional phase05.11.2002National basic fee paid 
05.11.2002Search fee paid 
05.11.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
05.11.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.11.2002Examination requested  [2004/13]
14.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
24.01.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.11.2005Date of oral proceedings
17.01.2006Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
26.01.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.05.2006Fee for grant paid
18.05.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  05.04.2007  11.04.2013  WITHDRAWN
VODAFONE GROUP PLC
VODAFONE HOUSE THE CONNECTION
NEWBURY, BERKSHIRE RG14 2FN / GB
Opponent's representative
Hoyles, Matthew Thomas
Vodafone Group Services Ltd.
Group Legal and Corporate Secretariat
One Kingdom Street, 5th floor
Paddington Central
London W2 6BY / GB
 02  05.04.2007  30.07.2008  WITHDRAWN
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
Opponent's representative
Parnham, Kevin
Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate
Derby DE1 1GY / GB
 [2013/45]
Former [2013/21]
Opponent(s)01  05.04.2007  11.04.2013  WITHDRAWN
VODAFONE GROUP PLC
VODAFONE HOUSE THE CONNECTION
NEWBURY, BERKSHIRE RG14 2FN / GB
Opponent's representative
Sneary, Adrian Bernard
Vodafone Group Services Limited Group Legal Vodafone House The Connection Newbury
Berkshire RG14 2FN / GB
 02  05.04.2007  30.07.2008  WITHDRAWN
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
Opponent's representative
Parnham, Kevin
Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate
Derby DE1 1GY / GB
Former [2009/44]
Opponent(s)01  05.04.2007  18.04.2007  ADMISSIBLE
VODAFONE GROUP PLC
VODAFONE HOUSE THE CONNECTION
NEWBURY, BERKSHIRE RG14 2FN / GB
Opponent's representative
Sneary, Adrian Bernard
Vodafone Group Services Limited Patents Team / Group Legal Vodafone House The Connection Newbury
Berkshire RG14 2FN / GB
 02  05.04.2007  30.07.2008  WITHDRAWN
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
Opponent's representative
Parnham, Kevin
Swindell & Pearson 48 Friar Gate
Derby DE1 1GY / GB
Former [2008/38]
Opponent(s)01  05.04.2007  18.04.2007  ADMISSIBLE
VODAFONE GROUP PLC
VODAFONE HOUSE THE CONNECTION
NEWBURY, BERKSHIRE RG14 2FN / GB
Opponent's representative
Foster, Mark Charles
Mathisen, Macara & Co. The Coach House 6-8 Swakeleys Road
Ickenham, Uxbridge UB10 8BZ / GB
 02  05.04.2007  30.07.2008  WITHDRAWN
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
Opponent's representative
Parnham, Kevin
Swindell & Pearson 48 Friar Gate
Derby DE1 1GY / GB
Former [2008/37]
Opponent(s)01  05.04.2007  18.04.2007  ADMISSIBLE
VODAFONE GROUP PLC
VODAFONE HOUSE THE CONNECTION
NEWBURY, BERKSHIRE RG14 2FN / GB
Opponent's representative
Foster, Mark Charles
Mathisen, Macara & Co. The Coach House 6-8 Swakeleys Road
Ickenham, Uxbridge UB10 8BZ / GB
 02  05.04.2007  10.12.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
Opponent's representative
Parnham, Kevin
Swindell & Pearson 48 Friar Gate
Derby DE1 1GY / GB
Former [2007/20]
Opponent(s)01  05.04.2007   
VODAFONE GROUP PLC
VODAFONE HOUSE THE CONNECTION
NEWBURY, BERKSHIRE RG14 2FN / GB
Opponent's representative
Foster, Mark Charles
Mathisen, Macara & Co. The Coach House 6-8 Swakeleys Road
Ickenham, Uxbridge UB10 8BZ / GB
 02  05.04.2007   
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
Opponent's representative
Parnham, Kevin
Swindell & Pearson 48 Friar Gate
Derby DE1 1GY / GB
29.06.2007Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
20.12.2007Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
14.12.2009Date of oral proceedings
20.04.2010Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
04.07.2014Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
14.07.2014Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
19.09.2014Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
05.01.2015Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition30.06.2010Appeal received No.  T1346/10
30.08.2010Statement of grounds filed
28.03.2014Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
21.06.2010Appeal received No.  T1346/10
26.08.2010Statement of grounds filed
28.03.2014Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
28.03.2014Date of oral proceedings
04.04.2014Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
28.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
28.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT05.07.2006
CH05.07.2006
CY05.07.2006
FI05.07.2006
LI05.07.2006
NL05.07.2006
TR05.07.2006
DK05.10.2006
SE05.10.2006
GR06.10.2006
PT05.12.2006
LU07.06.2007
MC30.06.2007
[2009/42]
Former [2009/38]AT05.07.2006
CH05.07.2006
CY05.07.2006
FI05.07.2006
LI05.07.2006
NL05.07.2006
DK05.10.2006
SE05.10.2006
GR06.10.2006
PT05.12.2006
LU07.06.2007
MC30.06.2007
Former [2008/21]AT05.07.2006
CH05.07.2006
FI05.07.2006
LI05.07.2006
NL05.07.2006
DK05.10.2006
SE05.10.2006
GR06.10.2006
PT05.12.2006
MC30.06.2007
Former [2008/09]AT05.07.2006
CH05.07.2006
FI05.07.2006
LI05.07.2006
NL05.07.2006
DK05.10.2006
SE05.10.2006
PT05.12.2006
MC30.06.2007
Former [2008/04]AT05.07.2006
CH05.07.2006
FI05.07.2006
LI05.07.2006
NL05.07.2006
DK05.10.2006
SE05.10.2006
PT05.12.2006
Former [2007/38]AT05.07.2006
CH05.07.2006
FI05.07.2006
IT05.07.2006
LI05.07.2006
NL05.07.2006
DK05.10.2006
SE05.10.2006
PT05.12.2006
Former [2007/23]AT05.07.2006
CH05.07.2006
FI05.07.2006
LI05.07.2006
NL05.07.2006
DK05.10.2006
SE05.10.2006
PT05.12.2006
Former [2007/22]CH05.07.2006
FI05.07.2006
LI05.07.2006
NL05.07.2006
DK05.10.2006
SE05.10.2006
PT05.12.2006
Former [2007/19]CH05.07.2006
FI05.07.2006
LI05.07.2006
NL05.07.2006
SE05.10.2006
PT05.12.2006
Former [2007/12]CH05.07.2006
FI05.07.2006
LI05.07.2006
SE05.10.2006
PT05.12.2006
Former [2007/11]CH05.07.2006
FI05.07.2006
LI05.07.2006
SE05.10.2006
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0818748  (MURAKOSHI HIROMASA) [X] 1-15 * column 2, line 40 - column 3, line 25 * * figure 3 *;
 [X]WO0059152  (MICROSOFT CORP) [X] 1-15 * page 4, line 1 - line 10 * * page 25, line 28 - page 26, line 10 * * figure 4 *;
 [X]EP0332304  (DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORP) [X] 1-15 * column 2, line 30 - column 3, line 5 * * figure 1 *;
 [X]US5848154  (GOTOU MUNEHARU ET AL) [X] 1-15 * column 1, line 1 - line 15 * * column 2, line 24 - column 3, line 35 *;
 [A]EP0731404  (IBM) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 14 - line 49 *;
 [A]US5386369  (CHRISTIANO MATTHEW) [A] 1-15 * column 1, line 50 - column 2, line 10 *;
 [A]US4740890  (WILLIAM TOBIN) [A] 1-15 * column 1, line 55 - column 2, line 5 *
International search[Y]US5014234  ;
 [Y]US6209092  ;
 [YP]US6397333  ;
 [A]US5293422  ;
 [A]US5485577  ;
 [Y]US5708709