Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1399196

EP1399196 - PULP AND SYNTHETIC FIBER ABSORBENT COMPOSITES FOR PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  13.06.2014
Database last updated on 16.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.06.2014Revocation of patentpublished on 16.07.2014  [2014/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC.
401 North Lake Street
Neenah, WI 54956 / US
[2009/09]
Former [2008/39]For all designated states
KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC.
401 North Lake Street
Neenah WI 54956 / US
Former [2004/13]For all designated states
Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc.
401 North Lake Street
Neenah, WI 54956 / US
Inventor(s)01 / COLMAN, Charles, Wilson
2611 Shadow Woods Circle
Marietta, GA 30062 / US
02 / ABBA, Rodney, Lawrence
3645 Shangrila Point
Oshkosh, WI 54904 / US
03 / BRAVERMAN, Jaime
211 Colonial Home Drive, Apt. 2301
Atlanta, GA 30309 / US
04 / COOPER, John, Thomas
707 Timbercrest Drive
Clinton, TN 37716-2018 / US
05 / FALLS, Maureen, Myrl
1629 South Park Avenue
Neenah, WI 54956-5023 / US
06 / HUNTER, Tiffany, Marshalle, Lee
318 Mistybrook Circle
Stone Mountain, GA 30087 / US
07 / INABINET, Steven Rashad
N295 Pinecrest
Appleton, Wisconsin 54915 / US
08 / JACKSON, David, Martin
9825 Summer Oaks Drive
Roswell, GA 30076 / US
09 / KOLLIN, Nancy, Donaldson
315 Woodchuck Court
Roswell, GA 30076 / US
10 / LAI, Yen-Ling
109 Woodruff Court
Cary, North Carolina 27511 / US
11 / LITTLE, Sylvia, Bandy
3051 Intrepid Close
Marietta, GA 30062 / US
12 / MAKOLIN, Robert, John
909 Reddin Avenue
Neenah, WI 54956 / US
13 / NICKEL, David, Joseph
124 Fifth Street
Neenah, WI 54956 / US
 [2004/27]
Former [2004/24]01 / COLMAN, Charles, Wilson
2611 Shadow Woods Circle
Marietta, GA 30062 / US
02 / ABBA, Rodney, Lawrence
3645 Shangrila Point
Oshkosh, WI 54904 / US
03 / BRAVERMAN, Jaime
211 Colonial Home Drive, Apt. 2301
Atlanta, GA 30309 / US
04 / COOPER, John, Thomas
707 Timbercrest Drive
Clinton, TN 37716-2018 / US
05 / FALLS, Maureen, Myrl
1629 South Park Avenue
Neenah, WI 54956-5023 / US
06 / HUNTER, Tiffany, Marshalle, Lee
318 Mistybrook Circle
Stone Mountain, GA 30087 / US
07 / INABINET, Steven, Rashad
5800 Central Ave. Pike, Apt. 1208
Knoxville, TN 37912 / US
08 / JACKSON, David, Martin
9825 Summer Oaks Drive
Roswell, GA 30076 / US
09 / KOLLIN, Nancy, Donaldson
315 Woodchuck Court
Roswell, GA 30076 / US
10 / LAI, Yen-Ling
109 Woodruff Court
Cary, North Carolina 27511 / US
11 / LITTLE, Sylvia, Bandy
3051 Intrepid Close
Marietta, GA 30062 / US
12 / MAKOLIN, Robert, John
909 Reddin Avenue
Neenah, WI 54956 / US
13 / NICKEL, David, Joseph
124 Fifth Street
Neenah, WI 54956 / US
Former [2004/13]01 / COLMAN, Charles, Wilson
2611 Shadow Woods Circle
Marietta, GA 30062 / US
02 / ABBA, Rodney, Lawrence
3645 Shangrila Point
Oshkosh, WI 54904 / US
03 / BRAVERMAN, Jaime
211 Colonial Home Drive, Apt. 2301
Atlanta, GA 30309 / US
04 / COOPER, John, Thomas
707 Timbercrest Drive
Clinton, TN 37716-2018 / US
05 / FALLS, Maureen, Myrl
1629 South Park Avenue
Neenah, WI 54956-5023 / US
06 / HUNTER, Tiffany, Marshalle, Lee
318 Mistybrook Circle
Stone Mountain, GA 30087 / US
07 / INABINET, Steven, Rashad
5800 Central Ave. Pike, Apt. 1208
Knoxville, TN 37912 / US
08 / JACKSON, David, Martin
9825 Summer Oaks Drive
Roswell, GA 30076 / US
09 / KOLLIN, Nancy, Donaldson
315 Woodchuck Court
Roswell, GA 30076 / US
10 / LAI, Yen-Ling
11060 Glenhurst Pass
Duluth, GA 30097 / US
11 / LITTLE, Sylvia, Bandy
3051 Intrepid Close
Marietta, GA 30062 / US
12 / MAKOLIN, Robert, John
909 Reddin Avenue
Neenah, WI 54956 / US
13 / NICKEL, David, Joseph
124 Fifth Street
Neenah, WI 54956 / US
Representative(s)Mabey, Katherine Frances , et al
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[2014/07]
Former [2009/20]Davies, Christopher Robert , et al
Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
Former [2004/13]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date02739982.325.06.2002
[2004/13]
WO2002US20217
Priority number, dateUS2001089294727.06.2001         Original published format: US 892947
[2004/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO03002162
Date:09.01.2003
Language:EN
[2003/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1399196
Date:24.03.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.01.2003
[2004/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1399196
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.01.2003
ClassificationInternational:A61L15/22, B32B5/22, A61F13/15
[2004/13]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/19]
Former [2004/13]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:ABSORBIERENDES VERBUNDMATERIAL MIT PULPE UND SYNTHETISCHEN FASERN FÜR HYGIENEARTIKEL[2004/13]
English:PULP AND SYNTHETIC FIBER ABSORBENT COMPOSITES FOR PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS[2004/13]
French:COMPOSITES ABSORBANTS A BASE DE PULPE ET DE FIBRES SYNTHETIQUES DESTINES A DES PRODUITS DE SOINS PERSONNELS[2004/13]
Entry into regional phase15.12.2003National basic fee paid 
15.12.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
15.12.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.12.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
15.12.2003Examination requested  [2004/13]
26.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.10.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.04.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
06.05.2008Fee for grant paid
06.05.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  25.11.2009  13.01.2010  ADMISSIBLE
SCA Hygiene Products AB
405 03 Göteborg / SE
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 02  25.11.2009  13.01.2010  ADMISSIBLE
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnatti, Ohio 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Anderson, James Edward George, et al
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2014/08]
Opponent(s)01  25.11.2009  13.01.2010  ADMISSIBLE
SCA Hygiene Products AB
405 03 Göteborg / SE
Opponent's representative
HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
 02  25.11.2009  13.01.2010  ADMISSIBLE
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnatti, Ohio 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Anderson, James Edward George, et al
Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Former [2012/08]
Opponent(s)01  25.11.2009  13.01.2010  ADMISSIBLE
SCA Hygiene Products AB
405 03 Göteborg / SE
Opponent's representative
Mellgren, Maria Charlotta
SCA Hygiene Products AB Patent Department
S-405 03 Göteborg / SE
 02  25.11.2009  13.01.2010  ADMISSIBLE
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnatti, Ohio 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Anderson, James Edward George, et al
Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Former [2011/46]
Opponent(s)01  25.11.2009  13.01.2010  ADMISSIBLE
SCA Hygiene Products AB
405 03 Göteborg / SE
Opponent's representative
Mellgren, Maria Charlotta
SCA Hygiene Products AB Patent Department
S-405 03 Göteborg / SE
 02  25.11.2009  13.01.2010  ADMISSIBLE
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnatti, Ohio 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Kremer, Véronique Marie Joséphine, et al
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
Former [2010/01]
Opponent(s)01  25.11.2009   
SCA Hygiene Products AB
405 03 Göteborg / SE
Opponent's representative
Mellgren, Maria Charlotta
SCA Hygiene Products AB Patent Department
S-405 03 Göteborg / SE
 02  25.11.2009   
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnatti, Ohio 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Anderson, James Edward George, et al
Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
18.01.2010Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
27.08.2010Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
19.02.2014Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 20.03.2014
27.02.2014Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
09.03.2014Legal effect of revocation of patent [2014/29]
20.03.2014Date of oral proceedings
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent
06.05.2008Request for further processing filed
06.05.2008Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
29.05.2008Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
06.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
08.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[X]WO0126596  (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [X] 1-18 * claim - *;
 [X]WO9922685  (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [X] 1-18 * page 7, paragraph 2 * * claim - *;
 [A]US4699619  (BERNARDIN LEO J [US]) [A] 1-18 * example 4 * * column 6, line 46 - line 58 * * claims 1,11,13-17 *;
 [A]WO9802608  (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [A] 1-18 * page 35, line 5 - page 27 * * examples 1,2,4 *