Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1384134

EP1384134 - COMPACT DEVICE WITH RAPID RETRIEVAL USER INTERFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.03.2009
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.09.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 02.11.2011  [2011/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2008/20]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Former [2004/05]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / SAGAR, Richard, B.
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
 [2004/05]
Representative(s)Groenendaal, Antonius W. M.
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2004/05]Groenendaal, Antonius Wilhelmus Maria
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date02740051.415.01.2002
[2004/05]
WO2002IB00101
Priority number, dateUS2001078022909.02.2001         Original published format: US 780229
[2004/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO02063453
Date:15.08.2002
Language:EN
[2002/33]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1384134
Date:28.01.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2002
[2004/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1384134
Date:14.05.2008
Language:EN
[2008/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.11.2003
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/033
[2004/05]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2004/05]
TitleGerman:KOMPAKTE VORRICHTUNG MIT BENUTZERSCHNITTSTELLE ZUM SCHNELLEN WIEDERAUFFINDEN[2004/05]
English:COMPACT DEVICE WITH RAPID RETRIEVAL USER INTERFACE[2004/05]
French:DISPOSITIF COMPACT AVEC INTERFACE UTILISATEUR D'EXTRACTION RAPIDE DE DONNEES[2004/05]
Entry into regional phase09.09.2003National basic fee paid 
06.05.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
06.05.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.05.2004Examination requested  [2004/29]
30.03.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.09.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.11.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.03.2008Fee for grant paid
28.03.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.02.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
31.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
31.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
31.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT14.05.2008
BE14.05.2008
CY14.05.2008
DK14.05.2008
FI14.05.2008
IT14.05.2008
NL14.05.2008
TR14.05.2008
SE14.08.2008
GR15.08.2008
ES25.08.2008
PT14.10.2008
IE15.01.2009
LU15.01.2009
CH31.01.2009
LI31.01.2009
MC31.01.2009
[2011/43]
Former [2011/21]AT14.05.2008
BE14.05.2008
DK14.05.2008
FI14.05.2008
IT14.05.2008
NL14.05.2008
SE14.08.2008
GR15.08.2008
ES25.08.2008
PT14.10.2008
IE15.01.2009
LU15.01.2009
CH31.01.2009
LI31.01.2009
MC31.01.2009
Former [2010/48]AT14.05.2008
BE14.05.2008
DK14.05.2008
FI14.05.2008
IT14.05.2008
NL14.05.2008
SE14.08.2008
GR15.08.2008
ES25.08.2008
PT14.10.2008
IE15.01.2009
CH31.01.2009
LI31.01.2009
MC31.01.2009
Former [2010/07]AT14.05.2008
BE14.05.2008
DK14.05.2008
FI14.05.2008
IT14.05.2008
NL14.05.2008
SE14.08.2008
ES25.08.2008
PT14.10.2008
IE15.01.2009
CH31.01.2009
LI31.01.2009
MC31.01.2009
Former [2009/47]AT14.05.2008
BE14.05.2008
DK14.05.2008
FI14.05.2008
IT14.05.2008
NL14.05.2008
SE14.08.2008
ES25.08.2008
PT14.10.2008
CH31.01.2009
LI31.01.2009
MC31.01.2009
Former [2009/39]AT14.05.2008
BE14.05.2008
DK14.05.2008
FI14.05.2008
IT14.05.2008
NL14.05.2008
SE14.08.2008
ES25.08.2008
PT14.10.2008
MC31.01.2009
Former [2009/38]AT14.05.2008
BE14.05.2008
DK14.05.2008
FI14.05.2008
NL14.05.2008
SE14.08.2008
ES25.08.2008
PT14.10.2008
MC31.01.2009
Former [2009/12]AT14.05.2008
BE14.05.2008
DK14.05.2008
FI14.05.2008
NL14.05.2008
SE14.08.2008
ES25.08.2008
PT14.10.2008
Former [2009/08]AT14.05.2008
DK14.05.2008
FI14.05.2008
NL14.05.2008
SE14.08.2008
ES25.08.2008
Former [2009/07]AT14.05.2008
FI14.05.2008
NL14.05.2008
SE14.08.2008
ES25.08.2008
Former [2008/49]AT14.05.2008
FI14.05.2008
NL14.05.2008
ES25.08.2008
Former [2008/47]ES25.08.2008
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0813138  (XEROX CORP) [A] 1-15 * claim 1 *;
 [A]EP0493990  (IBM) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 41 - column 3, line 52 *