Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP1412486 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1412486



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 3843
17.10.2016 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
17.02.2016 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
09.02.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
02.02.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
30.01.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
28.01.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
28.01.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
28.01.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
27.01.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
27.01.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
26.01.2016 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 22
26.01.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 4
01.12.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
30.11.2015 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 2
26.11.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
16.11.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
12.11.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
12.11.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
12.11.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
11.11.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
11.11.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
10.11.2015 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
10.11.2015 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
10.11.2015 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
10.11.2015 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
10.11.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.11.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.11.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.11.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.11.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.11.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.11.2015 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
04.11.2015 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
02.11.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.11.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.11.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.10.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
30.10.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
30.10.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
29.10.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
27.10.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
14.10.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
14.10.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.10.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.10.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.10.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
06.10.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.10.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.10.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
01.10.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
30.09.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
30.09.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
29.09.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
22.09.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
22.09.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
21.09.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
21.09.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
18.09.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
18.09.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
18.09.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
18.09.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
15.09.2015 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
15.09.2015 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
15.09.2015 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 14
02.07.2015 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
24.02.2015 Submission concerning representation Appeal 1
22.01.2015 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
22.01.2015 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
13.06.2012 Request for change of opponent's representative Search / examination 1
13.06.2012 Request for change of opponent's representative Search / examination 1
05.06.2012 Annexes in respect of a client data request Search / examination 1
21.05.2012 Request for change of opponent's representative Search / examination 52
01.08.2011 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
29.07.2011 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
21.07.2011 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
30.05.2011 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
30.05.2011 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
06.05.2011 Reply to appeal Appeal 51
05.05.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
05.05.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
05.05.2011 Reply to appeal Appeal 22
03.05.2011 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
19.04.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
19.04.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
19.04.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
19.04.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
19.04.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 35
19.04.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
19.04.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
19.04.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
19.04.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
19.04.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
19.04.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
19.04.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
19.04.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
19.04.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
19.04.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 14
19.04.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 35
19.04.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
19.04.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
19.04.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
19.04.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 14
19.04.2011 Reply to appeal Appeal 31
10.02.2011 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 4
26.01.2011 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
27.12.2010 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 3
27.12.2010 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 3
27.12.2010 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 3
06.12.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 12
06.12.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 18
06.12.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 12
06.12.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 13
06.12.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 5
06.12.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 2
06.12.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 8
06.12.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 6
06.12.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 17
06.12.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 3
06.12.2010 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 26
06.12.2010 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 26
03.12.2010 Claims Appeal 2
03.12.2010 Claims Appeal 2
03.12.2010 Claims Appeal 2
03.12.2010 Claims Appeal 2
03.12.2010 Claims Appeal 2
03.12.2010 Claims Appeal 2
03.12.2010 Claims Appeal 2
03.12.2010 Claims Appeal 2
03.12.2010 Claims Appeal 2
03.12.2010 Claims Appeal 2
03.12.2010 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 28
02.12.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 1
02.12.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 8
02.12.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 7
02.12.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 6
02.12.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 6
02.12.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 6
02.12.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 8
02.12.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 7
02.12.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 16
02.12.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 5
02.12.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 4
02.12.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 3
02.12.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 16
02.12.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 8
02.12.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 5
02.12.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 34
02.12.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 12
02.12.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 13
02.12.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 17
02.12.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 37
02.12.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 4
02.12.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 48
02.12.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 27
02.12.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 35
02.12.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 66
02.12.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 79
02.12.2010 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 35
30.11.2010 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
13.10.2010 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 4
05.10.2010 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
29.09.2010 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 4
29.09.2010 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 4
27.09.2010 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
24.09.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
24.09.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
24.09.2010 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
24.09.2010 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
23.09.2010 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
12.08.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.08.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
02.08.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
31.07.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
30.07.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
30.07.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.07.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
28.07.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
27.07.2010 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 6
27.07.2010 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
27.07.2010 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 14
27.07.2010 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 24
27.07.2010 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
27.07.2010 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
27.07.2010 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
27.07.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
27.07.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
27.07.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
27.07.2010 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
27.07.2010 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 8
27.07.2010 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 2
27.07.2010 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 6
04.05.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.05.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.05.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.04.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.04.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.04.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.04.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 10
23.04.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
23.04.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
23.04.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
23.04.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
22.04.2010 Drawings Opposition 1
22.04.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 10
22.04.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
22.04.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
22.04.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
22.04.2010 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
22.04.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 79
21.04.2010 Claims Opposition 2
21.04.2010 Claims Opposition 2
21.04.2010 Claims Opposition 2
21.04.2010 Claims Opposition 2
21.04.2010 Claims Opposition 2
21.04.2010 Claims Opposition 2
21.04.2010 Claims Opposition 2
21.04.2010 Claims Opposition 2
21.04.2010 Claims Opposition 2
21.04.2010 Claims Opposition 2
21.04.2010 Claims Opposition 2
21.04.2010 Claims Opposition 2
21.04.2010 Claims Opposition 2
21.04.2010 Claims Opposition 2
21.04.2010 Drawings Opposition 1
21.04.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 23
21.04.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 10
21.04.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
21.04.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
21.04.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
21.04.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
21.04.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
21.04.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 79
26.03.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.03.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.03.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.03.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
03.03.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.03.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
25.02.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
25.02.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.02.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
23.02.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.02.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.02.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
19.02.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.02.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.02.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.02.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.02.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.02.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.02.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.02.2010 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.02.2010 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.02.2010 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.02.2010 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.02.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
11.02.2010 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.02.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
10.02.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
10.02.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.02.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.02.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.02.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.02.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.02.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.02.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
09.02.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
09.02.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.02.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
04.02.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
04.02.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
04.02.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
03.02.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.02.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.02.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.02.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.02.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.02.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.02.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.02.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.02.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.02.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
29.01.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 10
29.01.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
29.01.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
28.01.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.01.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
27.01.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
27.01.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
25.01.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
25.01.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
23.01.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.01.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.01.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
20.01.2010 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 6
20.01.2010 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
20.01.2010 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
20.01.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.01.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.01.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.01.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.01.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.12.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.12.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.12.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.12.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.12.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
09.12.2009 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
18.06.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.06.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.06.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.06.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.06.2009 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
09.06.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 39
08.04.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.04.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.04.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.04.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.04.2009 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
30.03.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
02.03.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.03.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.03.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.03.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.02.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
30.01.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.01.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.01.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.01.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.01.2009 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
23.01.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
19.01.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
19.01.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
19.01.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
19.01.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
19.01.2009 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Opposition 2
19.01.2009 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
16.12.2008 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
10.10.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.10.2008 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
02.10.2008 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
02.10.2008 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
02.10.2008 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
02.10.2008 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
08.09.2008 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
28.08.2008 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 81
28.08.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
28.08.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
28.08.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
28.08.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
28.08.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
28.08.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
28.08.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 33
28.08.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
28.08.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
28.08.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
28.08.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
28.08.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
28.08.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
28.08.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
28.08.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
28.08.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
28.08.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 66
28.08.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 48
27.08.2008 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 26
27.08.2008 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 40
27.08.2008 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 84
27.08.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
27.08.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
27.08.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
27.08.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
27.08.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
27.08.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
27.08.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
27.08.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
27.08.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
27.08.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
27.08.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 37
27.08.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
27.08.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
27.08.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
27.08.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
27.08.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
27.08.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
27.08.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 340
27.08.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 96
27.08.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 48
27.08.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
27.08.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
27.08.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 79
26.08.2008 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 22
26.08.2008 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 1
26.08.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
26.08.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
26.08.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
26.08.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
26.08.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
26.08.2008 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
26.08.2008 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
20.08.2008 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 19
20.08.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
20.08.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
20.08.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 34
20.08.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
20.08.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
20.08.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
20.08.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
20.08.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
20.08.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
20.08.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
20.08.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
20.08.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
20.08.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
20.08.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 62
20.08.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 48
02.11.2007 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
12.09.2007 Approval of request for amendments/corrections Search / examination 1
03.09.2007 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 1
03.09.2007 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations Search / examination 2
24.08.2007 Description Search / examination 3
24.08.2007 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
24.08.2007 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
24.08.2007 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 2
25.07.2007 Request for change of representative Search / examination 1
30.05.2007 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
30.05.2007 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
30.05.2007 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
30.05.2007 Text intended for grant Search / examination 30
25.05.2007 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
23.05.2007 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
18.05.2007 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
18.05.2007 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
20.04.2007 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 1
20.04.2007 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
04.04.2007 Description Search / examination 7
04.04.2007 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 1
10.03.2007 Claims Search / examination 3
10.03.2007 Claims Search / examination 3
10.03.2007 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 4
09.03.2007 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 1
05.02.2007 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
03.02.2007 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
01.02.2007 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
01.02.2007 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
19.01.2007 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
22.12.2006 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
07.12.2006 Claims Search / examination 3
07.12.2006 Claims Search / examination 3
07.12.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 9
07.12.2006 Request for change of representative Search / examination 1
09.08.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
09.08.2006 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
08.11.2005 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
22.02.2005 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
11.02.2005 Request for change of name Search / examination 12
17.03.2004 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
16.03.2004 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
10.03.2004 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
10.03.2004 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
03.03.2004 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
03.03.2004 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
03.03.2004 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
28.01.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 22
27.01.2004 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
21.01.2004 Reminder for payment period (examination fee/designation fees) Search / examination 1
08.01.2004 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
08.01.2004 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 2
24.12.2003 Letter concerning biological material Search / examination 1
22.12.2003 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
22.12.2003 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
22.12.2003 Annex Search / examination 5
22.12.2003 Annex Search / examination 3
22.12.2003 Certificate of deposit of biological material Search / examination 6
22.12.2003 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
19.12.2003 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
19.12.2003 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 6
09.12.2003 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
13.11.2003 Annex to International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
13.11.2003 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
13.11.2003 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
13.11.2003 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
13.11.2003 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
13.11.2003 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
13.11.2003 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
13.11.2003 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
13.11.2003 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
10.09.2003 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
10.09.2003 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
07.08.2003 Written opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
07.08.2003 Written opinion - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
07.08.2003 Written opinion - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
10.04.2003 Notification of election of EPO Search / examination 1
27.02.2003 Notification of the recording of a change International Searching Authority 1
27.02.2003 Notification of the recording of a change International Searching Authority 1
27.02.2003 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
27.02.2003 Notification of the recording of a change International Searching Authority 1
19.02.2003 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
19.02.2003 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
11.02.2003 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
11.02.2003 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
11.02.2003 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
11.02.2003 Submission concerning representation PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
30.01.2003 Published international application - A2 Search / examination 31
10.07.2002 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
10.07.2002 Claims International Searching Authority 3
10.07.2002 Description International Searching Authority 22
10.07.2002 Drawings International Searching Authority 5
02.07.2002 Authorisation Search / examination 1
02.07.2002 Authorisation Search / examination 1
02.07.2002 General authorisation Search / examination 1