Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1402327

EP1402327 - FORCE-CONTROLLING MECHANICAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  21.11.2014
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.2014Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 24.12.2014  [2014/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cambridge Enterprise Limited
The Old Schools Trinity Lane Cambridge
Cambridgeshire CB2 1TN / GB
[2010/36]
Former [2007/02]For all designated states
Cambridge Enterprise Limited
The Old Schools Trinity lane Cambridge
Cambridgeshire CB2 1TN / GB
Former [2004/14]For all designated states
CAMBRIDGE UNIVERSITY TECHNICAL SERVICES LIMITED
The Old Schools, Trinity Lane
Cambridge CB2 1TS / GB
Inventor(s)01 / SMITH, Malcolm C., The University Of Cambridge
Dept Of Engineering
Trumpington Street
Cambridge CB2 1PZ / GB
 [2014/52]
Former [2004/14]01 / SMITH, Malcolm C., The University Of Cambridge
Dept Of Engineering, Trumpington Street
Cambridge CB2 1PZ / GB
Representative(s)Haley, Stephen
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[2014/52]
Former [2004/14]Haley, Stephen
Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date02740930.903.07.2002
[2004/14]
WO2002GB03056
Priority number, dateGB2001001642404.07.2001         Original published format: GB 0116424
[2004/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO03005142
Date:16.01.2003
Language:EN
[2003/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1402327
Date:31.03.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2003
[2004/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1402327
Date:08.09.2010
Language:EN
[2010/36]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1402327
Date:24.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.01.2003
ClassificationInternational:G05D19/02, F16F15/131, F16F9/16, F16F15/02, F16F7/10
[2014/09]
Former International [2004/14]G05D19/02, F16F15/131, F16F9/16
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2004/14]
TitleGerman:KRAFTREGELNDE MECHANISCHE EINRICHTUNG[2004/14]
English:FORCE-CONTROLLING MECHANICAL DEVICE[2004/14]
French:DISPOSITIF MECANIQUE DE COMMANDE DE FORCES[2004/14]
Entry into regional phase23.01.2004National basic fee paid 
23.01.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
23.01.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.01.2004Examination requested  [2004/14]
08.11.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.12.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.09.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.12.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.03.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.07.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.02.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.05.2010Fee for grant paid
20.05.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  07.06.2011  10.06.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Centrum Badawczo-Rozwojowe "EPAR" Sp.z o.o.
Ul. Szkolna 2
58-530 Kowary / PL
 [2014/02]
Former [2013/29]
Opponent(s)01  07.06.2011  10.06.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Centrum Badawczo-Rozwojowe "EPAR" Sp.z o.o.
Ul. Szkolna 2
58-530 Kowary / PL
Opponent's representative
Pawlowski, Adam
Eupatent.PL
ul. Zeligowskiego 3/5
90-752 Lodz / PL
Former [2012/48]
Opponent(s)01  07.06.2011  10.06.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Centrum Badawczo-Rozwojowe "EPAR" Sp.z o.o.
Ul. Szkolna 2
58-530 Kowary / PL
Opponent's representative
Pawlowski, Adam
Eupatent.PL Al. Kosciuszki 23/25
90-418 Lodz / PL
Former [2011/28]
Opponent(s)01  07.06.2011   
Centrum Badawczo-Rozwojowe "EPAR" Sp.z
ul. Ogrodowa 4
58-530 Kowary / PL
Opponent's representative
Pawlowski, Adam
Eupatent.PL Al. Kosciuszki 23/25
90-418 Lodz / PL
14.07.2011Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
03.11.2011Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
17.12.2013Date of oral proceedings
11.02.2014Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
11.02.2014Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
08.08.2014Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
29.09.2014Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
04.11.2014Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition17.04.2014Appeal received No.  T0914/14
20.06.2014Statement of grounds filed
08.08.2014Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
13.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
12.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
13.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
27.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
27.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT08.09.2010
BE08.09.2010
CY08.09.2010
CZ08.09.2010
DK08.09.2010
EE08.09.2010
FI08.09.2010
NL08.09.2010
SE08.09.2010
SK08.09.2010
TR08.09.2010
BG08.12.2010
GR09.12.2010
ES19.12.2010
PT10.01.2011
IE03.07.2011
LU03.07.2011
CH31.07.2011
LI31.07.2011
MC31.07.2011
[2013/44]
Former [2013/42]AT08.09.2010
BE08.09.2010
CY08.09.2010
CZ08.09.2010
DK08.09.2010
EE08.09.2010
FI08.09.2010
NL08.09.2010
SE08.09.2010
SK08.09.2010
BG08.12.2010
GR09.12.2010
ES19.12.2010
PT10.01.2011
IE03.07.2011
LU03.07.2011
CH31.07.2011
LI31.07.2011
MC31.07.2011
Former [2011/31]AT08.09.2010
BE08.09.2010
CY08.09.2010
CZ08.09.2010
EE08.09.2010
FI08.09.2010
NL08.09.2010
SE08.09.2010
SK08.09.2010
GR09.12.2010
ES19.12.2010
PT10.01.2011
Former [2011/24]AT08.09.2010
CY08.09.2010
CZ08.09.2010
EE08.09.2010
FI08.09.2010
NL08.09.2010
SE08.09.2010
SK08.09.2010
GR09.12.2010
PT10.01.2011
Former [2011/23]AT08.09.2010
CY08.09.2010
CZ08.09.2010
EE08.09.2010
FI08.09.2010
NL08.09.2010
SE08.09.2010
SK08.09.2010
GR09.12.2010
Former [2011/17]AT08.09.2010
CY08.09.2010
FI08.09.2010
NL08.09.2010
SE08.09.2010
GR09.12.2010
Former [2011/15]AT08.09.2010
CY08.09.2010
FI08.09.2010
SE08.09.2010
GR09.12.2010
Former [2011/13]AT08.09.2010
CY08.09.2010
FI08.09.2010
Former [2011/10]AT08.09.2010
FI08.09.2010
Former [2011/08]AT08.09.2010
Cited inInternational search[XA]EP0542573  (LORD CORP [US]) [X] 1,3-6,13,14 * claim 1 * [A] 2,7;
 [X]DE19727401  (STEYR DAIMLER PUCH AG [AT]) [X] 16 * abstract *;
 [A]US4241814  (MASCLET JEAN [FR]) [A] 8-12 * the whole document *;
 [PA]US6412616  (ALLEN NOEL L [US], et al) [PA] 8,12 * abstract *;
 [PA]US6352143  (NIAURA WILLIAM S [US], et al) [PA] 8,12 * figures 1,2,5 *;
 [A]US6253888  (BELL STEPHEN H [CA], et al);
 [A]FR2660386  (OUSTALOUP ALAIN, et al)
by applicant   - A.T. MURPHY, H.H. RICHARDSON, Introduction to System Dynamics, EDDISON-WESLEY, page 111,