blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1411554

EP1411554 - FIELD-EFFECT TRANSISTOR CONSTITUTING CHANNEL BY CARBON NANO TUBES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  25.09.2009
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip25.09.2009Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 28.10.2009  [2009/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2004/17]For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / NIHEY, Fumiyuki
c/o NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
 [2004/17]
Representative(s)Wenzel & Kalkoff
Patentanwälte
Meiendorfer Strasse 89
22145 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/17]Patentanwälte Wenzel & Kalkoff
Grubesallee 26
22143 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date02741291.525.06.2002
[2004/17]
WO2002JP06355
Priority number, dateJP2001020418205.07.2001         Original published format: JP 2001204182
[2004/17]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO03005451
Date:16.01.2003
Language:EN
[2003/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1411554
Date:21.04.2004
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2004/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP16.01.2003
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.07.2009
ClassificationIPC:H01L51/10
[2009/32]
CPC:
B82Y10/00 (EP,US); H10K85/221 (EP,US); H10K10/464 (EP,US);
H10K85/211 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2004/17]H01L29/78
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2004/17]
TitleGerman:FELDEFFEKTTRANSISTORKONSTITUIERUNGSKANAL DURCH KOHLENSTOFF-NANORÖHREN[2004/17]
English:FIELD-EFFECT TRANSISTOR CONSTITUTING CHANNEL BY CARBON NANO TUBES[2004/17]
French:TRANSISTOR A EFFET DE CHAMP COMPRENANT UN CANAL CONSTITUE DE NANOTUBES DE CARBONE[2004/17]
Entry into regional phase15.01.2004Translation filed 
15.01.2004National basic fee paid 
15.01.2004Search fee paid 
15.01.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
15.01.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.06.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
15.01.2004Examination requested  [2004/17]
23.09.2009Application withdrawn by applicant  [2009/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
29.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
29.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
28.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
29.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
27.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5457343  (AJAYAN PULICKEL M [JP], et al);
International search[A]JPH0663396  (OSAKA GAS CO LTD);
 [Y]US5457343  (AJAYAN PULICKEL M [JP], et al);
 [A]WO9618059  (HYPERION CATALYSIS INT [US]);
 [X]JPH09260635  (HITACHI LTD);
 [Y]JP2000156423  (IBM);
 [XP]JP2002076324  (FUJI XEROX CO LTD);
 [XP]JP2002118248  (LG ELECTRONICS INC);
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.