Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1421000 RSS: dossier

Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 2044
08.12.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
06.12.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
06.12.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
05.12.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
05.12.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
01.12.2017 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 34
01.12.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
01.12.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
01.12.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
01.12.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
01.12.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
23.10.2017 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
23.10.2017 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
23.10.2017 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
23.10.2017 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
23.10.2017 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
23.10.2017 F3317 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Proprietor + Opponent) Appeal 5
06.10.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.10.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.10.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.10.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.10.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.10.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.10.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.10.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.09.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
28.09.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
28.09.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
28.09.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
28.09.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
25.09.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
25.09.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.09.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.09.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.09.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.09.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.09.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.09.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.09.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.09.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
19.09.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
19.09.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
13.09.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
13.09.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
13.09.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
13.09.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
13.09.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
13.09.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
13.09.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
13.09.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
13.09.2017 Claims Appeal 3
13.09.2017 Claims Appeal 3
13.09.2017 Claims Appeal 3
13.09.2017 Claims Appeal 4
13.09.2017 Claims Appeal 4
13.09.2017 Claims Appeal 3
13.09.2017 Claims Appeal 3
13.09.2017 Claims Appeal 3
13.09.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 21
12.09.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
07.09.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
07.09.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
07.09.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
07.09.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
06.09.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
05.09.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
04.09.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
01.09.2017 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
01.09.2017 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
01.09.2017 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
01.09.2017 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
01.09.2017 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
29.08.2017 F3014 Oral proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
09.06.2017 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
09.06.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.06.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.06.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.06.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.06.2017 Authorisation of representative Appeal 1
05.06.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
05.06.2017 Authorisation of representative Appeal 2
05.06.2017 Authorisation of representative Appeal 2
05.06.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
05.06.2017 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
02.06.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
01.06.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
29.05.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.05.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.05.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.05.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.05.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
24.05.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
24.05.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
23.05.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
23.05.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
19.05.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
15.05.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
15.05.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
12.05.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
12.05.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
11.05.2017 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
11.05.2017 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
11.05.2017 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
11.05.2017 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
11.05.2017 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
11.05.2017 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 21
08.05.2017 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
30.11.2016 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
30.03.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
25.03.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.03.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.03.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.03.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.03.2015 Reply to appeal Appeal 15
25.02.2015 Request for change of opponent's representative Search / examination 1
23.10.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.10.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.10.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.10.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.10.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
17.10.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 6
17.10.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
17.10.2014 Reply to appeal Appeal 23
10.06.2014 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
10.06.2014 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
10.06.2014 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
10.06.2014 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
10.06.2014 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
10.06.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.06.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.06.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.06.2014 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
28.05.2014 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 66
20.05.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
20.05.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 57
20.05.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
20.05.2014 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 9
27.03.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
27.03.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
27.03.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
27.03.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
27.03.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
27.03.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
27.03.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
27.03.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
27.03.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
27.03.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
21.03.2014 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
20.03.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
20.03.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
20.03.2014 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
20.03.2014 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
19.03.2014 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
19.03.2014 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
26.02.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
22.02.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
11.02.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.02.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.02.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
24.01.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.01.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.01.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.01.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.01.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.01.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
20.01.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
20.01.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
20.01.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
20.01.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
20.01.2014 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
20.01.2014 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
20.01.2014 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 27
20.01.2014 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 11
20.01.2014 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
20.01.2014 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
20.01.2014 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
20.01.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
20.01.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
20.01.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
20.01.2014 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
20.01.2014 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 5
20.01.2014 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 5
21.11.2013 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.10.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.10.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.10.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.10.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.10.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.10.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.10.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.10.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.10.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.10.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.10.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.10.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.10.2013 Claims Opposition 3
21.10.2013 Claims Opposition 3
21.10.2013 Claims Opposition 3
21.10.2013 Claims Opposition 3
21.10.2013 Claims Opposition 3
21.10.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
21.10.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 11
21.10.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
14.10.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 7
14.10.2013 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
14.10.2013 Non-scannable object Opposition 7
14.10.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
14.10.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
14.10.2013 Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure Opposition 11
19.09.2013 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.09.2013 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.09.2013 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.08.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
12.08.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
12.08.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
12.08.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
06.08.2013 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.03.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
19.03.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
18.03.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.03.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.03.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.03.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.03.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.03.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.03.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.03.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
06.03.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
06.03.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
06.03.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
06.03.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
06.03.2013 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 2
06.03.2013 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
06.03.2013 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
06.03.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.03.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.03.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.03.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.03.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.10.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.10.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.10.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.10.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.09.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 23
28.09.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
24.07.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 6
24.07.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 6
24.07.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 6
24.07.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 6
18.07.2012 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
18.07.2012 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
18.07.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
18.07.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
02.05.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.05.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.05.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.05.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.04.2012 Claims Opposition 2
20.04.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
20.04.2012 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 42
09.01.2012 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
09.01.2012 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
09.01.2012 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
09.01.2012 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
09.01.2012 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
14.12.2011 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 71
08.12.2011 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 37
07.12.2011 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 11
07.12.2011 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 16
02.12.2011 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
02.12.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
02.12.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
02.12.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
02.12.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
02.12.2011 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
02.12.2011 Non-scannable object Opposition 3
02.12.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
02.12.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
02.12.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 16
02.12.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 48
02.12.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 9
02.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
02.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
02.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
02.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
02.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
02.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
02.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
02.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
02.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
02.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 36
02.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 73
02.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
02.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
02.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 23
02.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
02.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
02.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 49
02.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 25
02.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
02.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
02.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
02.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
02.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
02.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
02.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
02.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
02.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
02.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
02.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 73
02.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
02.12.2011 Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure Opposition 8
01.12.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
01.12.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
01.12.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 1
01.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
01.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 23
01.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
01.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 30
01.12.2011 Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure Opposition 16
03.02.2011 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
10.01.2011 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
10.01.2011 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
10.01.2011 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
15.11.2010 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
12.11.2010 Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
12.11.2010 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
12.11.2010 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
12.11.2010 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
12.11.2010 Text intended for grant Search / examination 52
28.10.2010 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
26.10.2010 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 1
26.10.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 1
25.10.2010 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 1
13.10.2010 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 1
08.10.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
08.10.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
08.10.2010 Claims Search / examination 3
08.10.2010 Claims Search / examination 3
08.10.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 7
07.10.2010 Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them Search / examination 2
22.09.2010 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 1
22.09.2010 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 1
10.09.2010 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 2
01.07.2010 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
29.06.2010 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
28.06.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
28.06.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
17.06.2010 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
08.04.2010 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
19.02.2010 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
01.04.2009 Claims Search / examination 2
01.04.2009 Claims Search / examination 2
01.04.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
21.11.2008 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
21.11.2008 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
19.06.2008 Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations Search / examination 1
19.06.2008 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 1
09.06.2008 Observations by third parties Search / examination 5
09.06.2008 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 10
09.06.2008 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
09.06.2008 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
09.06.2008 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
09.06.2008 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 7
16.01.2008 Claims Search / examination 3
16.01.2008 Claims Search / examination 2
16.01.2008 Description Search / examination 1
16.01.2008 Description Search / examination 1
16.01.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
18.09.2007 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
18.09.2007 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
05.01.2007 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
16.11.2006 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
30.10.2006 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
30.10.2006 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 4
09.08.2006 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
09.08.2006 Partial European search report Search / examination 3
16.12.2004 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
12.11.2004 Acknowledgement of receipt of observations by third party Search / examination 1
12.11.2004 Communication to applicant regarding observations by third parties Search / examination 1
27.10.2004 Annex Search / examination 8
27.10.2004 Annex Search / examination 1
27.10.2004 Annex Search / examination 2
27.10.2004 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
21.07.2004 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
15.04.2004 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
09.02.2004 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
04.02.2004 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
19.01.2004 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
31.10.2003 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
02.05.2003 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
03.01.2003 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 67
27.12.2002 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
27.12.2002 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 54