blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1405188

EP1405188 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS OF INFORMATION BACKUP [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.02.2017
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip17.08.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG
published on 19.09.2018  [2018/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CA, Inc.
One Computer Associates Plaza
Islandia, NY 11749 / US
[2015/51]
Former [2004/15]For all designated states
Computer Associates Think, Inc.
One Computer Associates Plaza
Islandia, New York 11749 / US
Inventor(s)01 / VIVEK, Prakash, @Computer Associates
One Computer Associates Plaza
Islandia, NY 11749 / US
 [2016/16]
Former [2004/15]01 / VIVEK, Prakash, Computer Associates
One Computer Associates Plaza
Islandia, NY 11749 / US
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al
Maucher Jenkins
Seventh Floor Offices
Artillery House
11-19 Artillery Row
London SW1P 1RT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/16]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al
RGC Jenkins & Co.
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Former [2004/15]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al
R G C Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date02744824.003.07.2002
[2004/15]
WO2002US21235
Priority number, dateUS20010303450P06.07.2001         Original published format: US 303450 P
[2004/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO03005247
Date:16.01.2003
Language:EN
[2003/03]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1405188
Date:07.04.2004
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2004/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1405188
Date:20.04.2016
Language:EN
[2016/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.08.2003
ClassificationIPC:G06F11/14
[2004/15]
CPC:
G06F3/0601 (EP,US); G06F12/16 (KR); G06F11/1461 (EP,US);
G06F11/1464 (EP,US); G06F11/1456 (EP,US); G06F11/1458 (EP,US);
G06F11/1469 (EP,US); G06F11/2056 (EP,US); G06F2003/0697 (EP,US);
G06F2201/84 (EP,US); Y10S707/99938 (US); Y10S707/99953 (US);
Y10S707/99955 (US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2016/16]
Former [2004/15]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUR INFORMATIONSSICHERHEIT[2004/15]
English:SYSTEMS AND METHODS OF INFORMATION BACKUP[2004/15]
French:SYSTEMES ET PROCEDES DE SAUVEGARDE D'INFORMATIONS[2004/15]
Entry into regional phase27.01.2004National basic fee paid 
27.01.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
27.01.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.02.2003Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
29.12.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.01.2004Examination requested  [2004/15]
10.01.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.08.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
31.10.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.10.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.03.2016Fee for grant paid
03.03.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.03.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.01.2008
Opposition(s)23.01.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/13]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
31.10.2008Request for further processing filed
31.10.2008Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
12.11.2008Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
13.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
12.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
13.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
14.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
10.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
14.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
12.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
13.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 11
10.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 12
14.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 13
10.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 14
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT20.04.2016
BE20.04.2016
BG20.04.2016
CY20.04.2016
CZ20.04.2016
DK20.04.2016
EE20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
IT20.04.2016
MC20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
SK20.04.2016
TR20.04.2016
IE03.07.2016
LU03.07.2016
GB20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
FR01.08.2016
PT22.08.2016
[2018/38]
Former [2018/29]AT20.04.2016
BE20.04.2016
CY20.04.2016
CZ20.04.2016
DK20.04.2016
EE20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
IT20.04.2016
MC20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
SK20.04.2016
TR20.04.2016
IE03.07.2016
LU03.07.2016
GB20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
FR01.08.2016
PT22.08.2016
Former [2017/36]AT20.04.2016
BE20.04.2016
CZ20.04.2016
DK20.04.2016
EE20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
IT20.04.2016
MC20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
SK20.04.2016
IE03.07.2016
LU03.07.2016
GB20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
FR01.08.2016
PT22.08.2016
Former [2017/23]AT20.04.2016
BE20.04.2016
CZ20.04.2016
DK20.04.2016
EE20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
IT20.04.2016
MC20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
SK20.04.2016
GB20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
FR01.08.2016
PT22.08.2016
Former [2017/22]AT20.04.2016
BE20.04.2016
CZ20.04.2016
DK20.04.2016
EE20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
IT20.04.2016
MC20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
SK20.04.2016
GR21.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
FR01.08.2016
PT22.08.2016
Former [2017/10]AT20.04.2016
BE20.04.2016
CZ20.04.2016
DK20.04.2016
EE20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
IT20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
SK20.04.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
Former [2017/09]AT20.04.2016
BE20.04.2016
CZ20.04.2016
DK20.04.2016
EE20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
IT20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
Former [2017/07]AT20.04.2016
BE20.04.2016
DK20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
IT20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
Former [2017/03]AT20.04.2016
BE20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
IT20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
Former [2016/52]AT20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
Former [2016/51]AT20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
Former [2016/50]AT20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
Former [2016/49]FI20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
Cited inInternational search[A]US5943495  (MCLAIN JR JOHN V [US]) [A] 1-21 * abstract * * column 1, line 33 - column 2, line 7 ** figure 1 *;
 [Y]US6173293  (THEKKATH CHANDRAMOHAN A [US], et al) [Y] 1,7-9,15,16 * abstract * * column 5, line 57 - column 6, line 14 * * column 13, line 8 - line 50 * * figures 2,5,6 *;
 [Y]  - HEWLETT PACKARD, "Storage Area Networking: Storage vs. Data Sharing- Creating Appropriate SAN Solutions", INTERNET CITATION, (19991101), URL: http://www.hpindia.com/pdf_files/storagevsdata.pdf, (20030218), XP002231735 [Y] 1,7-9,15,16 * Storage Sharing Concept LAN-Free Backup *
 [A]  - HEWLETT PACKARD, "Storage Area Networking: Building a SAN Using Hewlett-Packard's SureStore E SAN Manager LUN Management", INTERNET CITATION, (19991101), URL: http://www.hpindia.com/pdf_files/bldgasan.pdf, (20030218), XP002231736 [A] 1-21 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.