Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1408850

EP1408850 - DEVICES FOR CAPTURING AND FIXING LEAFLETS IN VALVE REPAIR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2004/17]METHODS AND DEVICES FOR CAPTURING AND FIXING LEAFLETS IN VALVE REPAIR
[2009/16]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.07.2010
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 21.11.2012  [2012/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Evalve, Inc.
4045 Campbell Avenue
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
[2009/31]
Former [2004/17]For all designated states
Evalve, Inc.
2761 Fair Oaks
Redwood City, CA 94063 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GOLDFARB, Eric, A.
545 Peralta Avenue
San Francisco, CA 94110-5338 / US
02 / DELL, Kent, D.
1131 Grand
Redwood City, CA 94061 / US
03 / FAN, Sylvia, Wen-Chin
3868 21st Street, 2
San Francisco, CA 94114 / US
04 / MARTIN, Brian, B.
315 Alder Road
Boulder Creek, CA 95006 / US
05 / POWELL, Ferolyn, T.
55 Caselli Avenue
San Francisco, CA 94114 / US
06 / RASCHDORF, Alfred, H.
3421A 16th Street
San Francisco, CA 94114 / US
07 / THORNTON, Troy, L.
743 Carolina
San Francisco, CA 94107 / US
 [2004/17]
Representative(s)Kazi, Ilya , et al
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/17]Kazi, Ilya , et al
Mathys & Squire, 100 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8AL / GB
Application number, filing date02746781.027.06.2002
[2004/17]
WO2002US20768
Priority number, dateUS2001089446327.06.2001         Original published format: US 894463
[2004/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO03001893
Date:09.01.2003
Language:EN
[2003/02]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1408850
Date:21.04.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.01.2003
[2004/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1408850
Date:23.09.2009
Language:EN
[2009/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US31.07.2003
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.05.2008
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/08
[2004/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2004/17]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNGEN ZUM ERGREIFEN UND FESTLEGEN VON SEGELN BEI DER KLAPPENREPARATUR[2009/16]
English:DEVICES FOR CAPTURING AND FIXING LEAFLETS IN VALVE REPAIR[2009/16]
French:DISPOSITIFS DE CAPTURE ET DE FIXATION DE FEUILLETS EN PLASTIE VALVULAIRE[2009/16]
Former [2004/17]VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUM ERGREIFEN UND FESTLEGEN VON SEGELN BEI DER KLAPPENREPARATUR
Former [2004/17]METHODS AND DEVICES FOR CAPTURING AND FIXING LEAFLETS IN VALVE REPAIR
Former [2004/17]PROCEDES ET DISPOSITIFS DE CAPTURE ET DE FIXATION DE FEUILLETS EN PLASTIE VALVULAIRE
Entry into regional phase12.01.2004National basic fee paid 
12.01.2004Search fee paid 
12.01.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
12.01.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.01.2004Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.01.2004Examination requested  [2004/17]
26.08.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.01.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.03.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.07.2009Fee for grant paid
24.07.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.06.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
21.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
28.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
27.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
05.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT23.09.2009
BE23.09.2009
CY23.09.2009
DK23.09.2009
FI23.09.2009
NL23.09.2009
SE23.09.2009
TR23.09.2009
GR24.12.2009
ES03.01.2010
PT25.01.2010
[2012/47]
Former [2010/48]AT23.09.2009
BE23.09.2009
CY23.09.2009
DK23.09.2009
FI23.09.2009
NL23.09.2009
SE23.09.2009
GR24.12.2009
ES03.01.2010
PT25.01.2010
Former [2010/35]AT23.09.2009
BE23.09.2009
CY23.09.2009
DK23.09.2009
FI23.09.2009
NL23.09.2009
SE23.09.2009
ES03.01.2010
PT25.01.2010
Former [2010/32]AT23.09.2009
BE23.09.2009
CY23.09.2009
FI23.09.2009
NL23.09.2009
SE23.09.2009
ES03.01.2010
PT25.01.2010
Former [2010/30]AT23.09.2009
BE23.09.2009
CY23.09.2009
FI23.09.2009
SE23.09.2009
ES03.01.2010
PT25.01.2010
Former [2010/28]BE23.09.2009
CY23.09.2009
FI23.09.2009
SE23.09.2009
ES03.01.2010
PT25.01.2010
Former [2010/22]CY23.09.2009
FI23.09.2009
SE23.09.2009
ES03.01.2010
PT25.01.2010
Former [2010/19]CY23.09.2009
FI23.09.2009
SE23.09.2009
ES03.01.2010
Former [2010/16]CY23.09.2009
FI23.09.2009
SE23.09.2009
Former [2010/09]FI23.09.2009
SE23.09.2009
Former [2010/08]SE23.09.2009
Documents cited:Search[X]WO0003759  (ST JUDE MEDICAL [US]) [X] 1-27 * page 3, line 4 - line 12 * * page 15, line 9 - page 16, line 1 * * page 25, line 5 - line 18 * * figures 1,13A-13E,14A-14C *;
 [X]WO0128432  (EDWARDS LIFESCIENCES CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,4-17 * page 3, line 7 - line 20 * * figures 4a-4c,6a-6c,12a-12e,17a-17c *;
 [X]WO9832382  (HEARTEN MEDICAL INC [US]; LAUFER MICHAEL D [US]) [X] 1,4-11,14-19,22-27 * page 2, line 26 - page 3, line 12 * * figures 4,6-8 *
International search[X]US5928224  (LAUFER MICHAEL D [US]);
 [A]US5554185  (BLOCK PETER C [US], et al);
 [AP]US6312447  (GRIMES RANDALL Y [US])
by applicantUS5855614
 US5829447
 US5823956
 US5797960
 US5769812
 US5718725
 WO0003759