EP1404231 - Right angle clip applier [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/15] | RIGHT ANGLE CLIP APPLIER APPARATUS AND METHOD | ||
[2012/03] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2013 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.08.2013 [2013/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2012/52] |
Former [2012/24] | For all designated states Tyco Healthcare Group LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | ||
Former [2004/15] | For all designated states TYCO HEALTHCARE GROUP LP 150 Glover Avenue Norwalk, Connecticut 06856 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STELLON, Gene 368 Savage Street Southington, CT 06489 / US | 02 /
LEHMAN, Adam 26 Hillside View Road Northford, CT 06472 / US | 03 /
CABRERA, Ramiro 67 Newbridge Circle Cheshire, CT 06410 / US | 04 /
STEARNS, Ralph, A. 38 South Road Bozrah, CT 06334 / US | [2004/26] |
Former [2004/15] | 01 /
STELLON, Gene 368 Savage Street Southington, CT 06489 / US | ||
02 /
LEHMAN, Adam 183 South Orchard Street Wallingford, CT 06492 / US | |||
03 /
CABRERA, Ramiro 67 Newbridge Circle Cheshire, CT 06410 / US | |||
04 /
STEARNS, Ralph, A. 38 South Road Bozrah, CT 06334 / US | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/36] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/15] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02746930.3 | 08.07.2002 | [2004/15] | WO2002US21609 | Priority number, date | US20010303839P | 09.07.2001 Original published format: US 303839 P | [2004/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03005911 | Date: | 23.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1404231 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1404231 | Date: | 05.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/128 | [2004/15] | CPC: |
A61B17/1285 (EP,US);
A61B17/0684 (EP,US);
A61B17/122 (EP,US);
A61B2017/292 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2929 (EP,US);
A61B2090/0814 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/21] |
Former [2004/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT | Title | German: | Rechtwinkliger Klammerapplikator | [2012/03] | English: | Right angle clip applier | [2012/03] | French: | Appareil pour l'application d'agrafes à angle droit | [2012/03] |
Former [2004/15] | RECHTWINKLIGER KLAMMERAPPLIKATOR | ||
Former [2004/15] | RIGHT ANGLE CLIP APPLIER APPARATUS AND METHOD | ||
Former [2004/15] | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE POUR L'APPLICATION D'AGRAFES A ANGLE DROIT | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 13.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/15] | 26.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.10.2009 | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5282808 (KOVAC TIM [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]US5713911 (RACENET DAVID C [US], et al) [A] 1-17* abstract * | by applicant | US5282808 |