EP1370495 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A QUARTZ GLASS CRUCIBLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2007 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heraeus Quarzglas GmbH & Co. KG Quarzstrasse 8 63450 Hanau / DE | [2003/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KORUS, Gabriele Thomasiusstrasse 2b 04109 Leipzig / DE | 02 /
LAUDAHN, Hilmar Töpferwall 22 06749 Bitterfeld / DE | 03 /
ARNDT, Martin Fritz-Reuter-Strasse 11 06749 Bitterfeld / DE | 04 /
GERTIG, Udo Am Wingert 50 63687 Johannesberg / DE | [2003/51] | Representative(s) | Staudt, Armin Walter, et al Sandeldamm 24a 63450 Hanau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Staudt, Armin Walter, et al Patentanwalt Auf der Mauer 8 63674 Altenstadt / DE | ||
Former [2005/32] | Staudt, Armin, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwalt Auf der Mauer 8 63674 Altenstadt / DE | ||
Former [2004/35] | Staudt, Armin, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwalt Lange Strasse 10 63674 Altenstadt / DE | ||
Former [2003/51] | Staudt, Armin Edith-Stein-Strasse 22 63075 Offenbach am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 02748301.5 | 05.03.2002 | [2003/51] | WO2002EP02395 | Priority number, date | DE2001111405 | 08.03.2001 Original published format: DE 10111405 | DE2001139648 | 11.08.2001 Original published format: DE 10139648 | [2003/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02070414 | Date: | 12.09.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1370495 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1370495 | Date: | 15.11.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C03B19/09, C30B15/10, C03C10/00 | [2003/51] | CPC: |
C03B19/095 (EP);
C03C10/0009 (EP);
C30B15/10 (EP);
C30B35/002 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, IT [2006/45] |
Former [2003/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES QUARZGLASTIEGELS | [2003/51] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A QUARTZ GLASS CRUCIBLE | [2003/51] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN CREUSET EN VERRE DE QUARTZ | [2003/51] | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/51] | 09.12.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 15.11.2006 | FR | 15.11.2006 | GB | 15.11.2006 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/23] | FI | 15.11.2006 | |
GB | 15.11.2006 | ||
FR | 29.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | FI | 15.11.2006 | |
GB | 15.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 15.11.2006 | Cited in | International search | [PX]WO0216677 (HERAEUS QUARZGLAS ;FABIAN HEINZ (DE); LEIST JOHANN (DE); WERDECKER) [PX] 1-5,12-17 * claim - *; | [X]US5389582 (BLACKMER JOHN F ET AL) [X] 1-6,9-17 * column 4, line 33 - line 42 * * column 5, line 11 - line 50 *; | [X]EP0911429 (HERAEUS QUARZGLAS ;SHINETSU QUARTZ PROD (JP)) [X] 1-5,7,8,12-17 * claim - *; | [A]US4102666 (BAUMLER PETER ET AL) [A] 1-17 * column 7, line 4 - line 23 * |