Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1396138

EP1396138 - CHANGING MEDIA SESSIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.09.2013
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip27.09.2013No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 30.10.2013  [2013/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Genband US LLC
2801 Network Boulevard, Suite 300
Frisco, TX 7503 / US
[2013/18]
Former [2012/47]For all designated states
Nortel Networks Limited
2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel
St. Laurent, QC H4S 2A9 / CA
Former [2004/11]For all designated states
Nortel Networks Limited
2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel
St. Laurent, Quebec H4S 2A9 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / MARCH, Sean, W.
8804 Jennifer Court
Plano, TX 75025 / US
02 / SOLLEE, Patrick, N.
2708 Garden Springs
Richardson, TX 75082 / US
03 / MCKNIGHT, David, W.
7001 Woodsprings Dr.
Garland, TX 75044 / US
 [2004/11]
Representative(s)Bird, William Edward , et al
Bird Goën & Co
Wetenschapspark Arenberg
Gaston Geenslaan 9
3001 Heverlee / BE
[N/P]
Former [2012/47]Bird, William Edward , et al
Bird Goën & Co Klein Dalenstraat 42A
3020 Winksele / BE
Former [2009/15]Bird, William Edward , et al
Bird Goën & Co. Klein Dalenstraat 42A
3020 Winksele / BE
Former [2004/11]Loisel, Bertrand
Cabinet Plasseraud 65/67 rue de la Victoire
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Application number, filing date02751563.410.06.2002
[2004/11]
WO2002IB03188
Priority number, dateUS2001088160314.06.2001         Original published format: US 881603
[2004/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO02103977
Date:27.12.2002
Language:EN
[2002/52]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1396138
Date:10.03.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2002
[2004/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1396138
Date:21.11.2012
Language:EN
[2012/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.06.2003
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/06
[2004/11]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2012/47]
Former [2004/11]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:ÄNDERUNG VON MEDIASITZUNGEN[2004/11]
English:CHANGING MEDIA SESSIONS[2004/11]
French:CHANGEMENT DE SESSIONS MEDIA[2004/11]
Entry into regional phase29.12.2003National basic fee paid 
29.12.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
29.12.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.12.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
29.12.2003Examination requested  [2004/11]
19.04.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.10.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.07.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.10.2012Fee for grant paid
02.10.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.04.2010
Opposition(s)22.08.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
06.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
22.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
08.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
29.05.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
05.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
24.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
15.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
27.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 11
Cited inInternational search[E]EP1235406  (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [E] 1-27 * abstract * * page 2, column 1, line 46 - line 51 * * page 2, column 2, line 18 - page 3, column 3, line 11 * * page 4, column 5, line 1 - column 6, line 50 * * page 5, column 8, line 36 - page 6, column 9, line 20 *;
 [A]US5941988  (BHAGWAT PRAVIN [US], et al) [A] 1-27 * page 7, line 59 - page 9, line 41 * * claims 1,3,4 *
 [X]  - SPARKS R ET AL, "SIP Telephony Service Examples With Call Flows", IETF INTERNET DRAFT, (199910), XP002178926 [X] 1,3-5,13,15,16,20-23,27 * page 67, paragraph 2.8 *
by applicantEP1235406