Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1410262

EP1410262 - METHOD, APPARATUS AND SYSTEM FOR CAPTURING AND ANALYZING INTERACTION BASED CONTENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  26.06.2009
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip26.06.2009Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 29.07.2009  [2009/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nice Systems Ltd.
8 Hapnina Street
43107 Ra'anana / IL
[2004/17]
Inventor(s)01 / FREEDMAN, Ilan
Hadera Street 26/14
49726 Petach Tiqwa / IL
02 / MEIDAV, Yifat
Hafetz Haim Street 40
43339 Ra'anana / IL
03 / FALIK, Talia
Sheizaf Street 4B
44418 Kfar Sava / IL
04 / PEREG, Oren
41 Borochov St.
Ra'anana / IL
05 / WASERBLAT, Moshe
Cikcar akachi Hanavi Street 14/5
71700 Modein / IL
06 / AHARONI, Gili
Beyalic Avenue 28/1
47208 amat Hasharon / IL
07 / DOLEV, Yair
Teena Street 36
45858 Matan / IL
08 / BAR, Eytan
Harakafot Street 27
40500 Even Yehuda / IL
09 / ARUSSY, Lior
139 Hillside Ave.
Livingston, NJ 7039 / US
10 / SHERMISTER, Shai
Revka Gover Street 8
43728 Ra'anana / IL
 [2004/36]
Former [2004/17]01 / FREEDMAN, Ilan
Hadera Street 26/14
49726 Petach Tiqwa / IL
02 / MEIDAV, Yifat
Hafetz Haim Street 40
43339 Ra'anana / IL
03 / FALIK, Talia
Sheizaf Street 4B
44418 Kfar Sava / IL
04 / PEREG, Oren
Eliezer Yafe Strret 22
43434 Ra'anana / IL
05 / WASERBLAT, Moshe
Cikcar akachi Hanavi Street 14/5
71700 Modein / IL
06 / AHARONI, Gili
Beyalic Avenue 28/1
47208 amat Hasharon / IL
07 / DOLEV, Yair
Teena Street 36
45858 Matan / IL
08 / BAR, Eytan
Harakafot Street 27
40500 Even Yehuda / IL
09 / ARUSSY, Lior
Taconic Road 21
Livingston, NJ 7039 / US
10 / SHERMISTER, Shai
Revka Gover Street 8
43728 Ra'anana / IL
Representative(s)Robson, Aidan John
Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building
10 Whitechapel High Street
London E1 8QS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/17]Robson, Aidan John
Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date02751593.118.07.2002
[2004/17]
WO2002IL00593
Priority number, dateUS20010306142P19.07.2001         Original published format: US 306142 P
US20020350345P24.01.2002         Original published format: US 350345 P
[2004/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO03009175
Date:30.01.2003
Language:EN
[2003/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1410262
Date:21.04.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.01.2003
[2004/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US30.01.2003
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.03.2009
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/30, G06F17/60, G06F7/00
[2004/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2004/17]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM ZUR ERFASSUNG UND ANALYSE VON INHALT AUF WECHSELWIRKUNGSBASIS[2004/17]
English:METHOD, APPARATUS AND SYSTEM FOR CAPTURING AND ANALYZING INTERACTION BASED CONTENT[2004/17]
French:PROCEDE, APPAREIL ET SYSTEME POUR CAPTURER ET ANALYSER UN CONTENU BASE SUR DES INTERACTIONS[2004/17]
Entry into regional phase16.02.2004National basic fee paid 
16.02.2004Search fee paid 
16.02.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
16.02.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.01.2004Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.02.2004Examination requested  [2004/17]
18.06.2009Application withdrawn by applicant  [2009/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
14.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
28.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200403   M06   Fee paid on   19.10.2004
Documents cited:Search[L]  - The technical aspects identified in the present application (Art. 92 EPC) are considered part of common general knowledge. Due to their notoriety no documentary evidence is found to be required. For further details see the reference below., XP002456252 [L] 1-62
International search[XE]US2002087385  ;
 [AP]US2002059283  ;
 [AP]US2002010705  ;
 [AP]US6345305  ;
 [A]US6230197  ;
 [A]US6170011  ;
 [A]US6167395  ;
 [A]US6138139  ;
 [A]US6134530  ;
 [A]US6092197  ;
 [A]US6070142  ;
 [A]US6014647  ;
 [A]  - FREEDMAN I., "Closing the contact center quality loop with customer experience management", FILE 25, Database accession no. 73746151, XP002959479
    [ ] - CUSTOMER INTERACTION SOLUTIONS, (200103), vol. 19, no. 9
 [A]  - "NICE redefines customer interactions with launch of customer experience management", FILE 16, PR NEWSWIRE, (20000613), Database accession no. 62699272, XP002959480
 [A]  - RECOGNITION SYSTEMS AND HYPERION TO PROVIDE CLOSED LOOP CRM ANALYTIC APPLICATONS, FILE 16, PR NEWSWIRE, (19991117), Database accession no. 57618294, XP002959481