Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1415507

EP1415507 - A BTE/CIC AUDITORY DEVICE AND MODULAR CONNECTOR SYSTEM THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  23.03.2018
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.07.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DK, NL
published on 29.08.2018  [2018/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hear-wear Technologies, LLC
2323 South Sheridan
Tulsa, OK 74129 / US
[2004/19]
Inventor(s)01 / FEELEY, Jim
6904 E. 118th Street, South
Bixby, OK 74008 / US
02 / FEELEY, Mike
4624 E. 87 Pl.
Tulsa, OK 74137 / US
 [2004/19]
Representative(s)Jackson, Richard Eric , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/19]Jackson, Richard Eric , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date02752712.608.08.2002
[2004/19]
WO2002US24960
Priority number, dateUS2001092789110.08.2001         Original published format: US 927891
[2004/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO03015463
Date:20.02.2003
Language:EN
[2003/08]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1415507
Date:06.05.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.2003
[2004/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1415507
Date:22.12.2010
Language:EN
[2010/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.05.2003
ClassificationInternational:H04R25/00
[2004/19]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2004/19]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:HINTER-DEM-OHR / VOLLSTÄNDIG-IN-DEM-OHR HÖRGERÄT UND MODULARES VERBINDUNGSSYSTEM HIERFÜR[2004/19]
English:A BTE/CIC AUDITORY DEVICE AND MODULAR CONNECTOR SYSTEM THEREFOR[2004/19]
French:DISPOSITIF AUDITIF BTE/CIC ET SYSTEME DE CONNECTEUR MODULAIRE ASSOCIE[2004/19]
Entry into regional phase23.02.2004National basic fee paid 
23.02.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
23.02.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.03.2003Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
23.02.2004Examination requested  [2004/19]
31.08.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.01.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.01.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.07.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.02.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.06.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.08.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.11.2010Fee for grant paid
05.11.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  22.09.2011  05.10.2011  WITHDRAWN
KS Himpp
Ny Vestergaardsvej 25
3500 Vaerlose / DK
Opponent's representative
Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Anna-Louisa-Karsch-Strasse 2
10178 Berlin / DE
 [2018/09]
Former [2012/34]
Opponent(s)01  22.09.2011  05.10.2011  ADMISSIBLE
KS Himpp
Ny Vestergaardsvej 25
3500 Vaerlose / DK
Opponent's representative
Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner
Anna-Louisa-Karsch-Strasse 2
10178 Berlin / DE
Former [2011/44]
Opponent(s)01  22.09.2011   
KS Himpp
Ny Vestergaardsvej 25
3500 Vaerlose / DK
Opponent's representative
von Oppen, Joachim F.M.
Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Anna-Louisa-Karsch-Straße 2
10178 Berlin / DE
28.10.2011Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
04.05.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
06.05.2014Date of oral proceedings
18.06.2014Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
18.06.2014Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
07.03.2018Legal effect of revocation of patent [2018/17]
Appeal following opposition27.08.2014Appeal received No.  T1783/14
28.10.2014Statement of grounds filed
07.03.2018Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
12.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
14.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
14.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
14.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
12.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
17.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE22.12.2010
CH22.12.2010
EE22.12.2010
FI22.12.2010
LI22.12.2010
SE22.12.2010
SK22.12.2010
BG22.03.2011
PT22.04.2011
CY08.08.2014
CZ08.08.2014
IE08.08.2014
LU08.08.2014
TR08.08.2014
MC01.09.2014
GR04.03.2015
AT08.08.2017
DK31.08.2017
NL01.09.2017
[2018/34]
Former [2018/24]BE22.12.2010
CH22.12.2010
EE22.12.2010
FI22.12.2010
LI22.12.2010
SE22.12.2010
SK22.12.2010
BG22.03.2011
PT22.04.2011
CY08.08.2014
CZ08.08.2014
IE08.08.2014
LU08.08.2014
TR08.08.2014
MC01.09.2014
GR04.03.2015
AT08.08.2017
Former [2018/21]BE22.12.2010
CH22.12.2010
EE22.12.2010
FI22.12.2010
LI22.12.2010
SE22.12.2010
SK22.12.2010
BG22.03.2011
PT22.04.2011
CY08.08.2014
CZ08.08.2014
IE08.08.2014
LU08.08.2014
TR08.08.2014
MC01.09.2014
GR04.03.2015
Former [2017/46]BE22.12.2010
EE22.12.2010
FI22.12.2010
SE22.12.2010
SK22.12.2010
BG22.03.2011
PT22.04.2011
CY08.08.2014
CZ08.08.2014
IE08.08.2014
LU08.08.2014
TR08.08.2014
MC01.09.2014
GR04.03.2015
Former [2015/37]BE22.12.2010
EE22.12.2010
FI22.12.2010
SE22.12.2010
SK22.12.2010
BG22.03.2011
PT22.04.2011
CY08.08.2014
CZ08.08.2014
IE08.08.2014
LU08.08.2014
MC01.09.2014
GR04.03.2015
Former [2015/26]BE22.12.2010
EE22.12.2010
FI22.12.2010
SE22.12.2010
SK22.12.2010
BG22.03.2011
PT22.04.2011
CY08.08.2014
CZ08.08.2014
LU08.08.2014
MC01.09.2014
GR04.03.2015
Former [2015/24]BE22.12.2010
EE22.12.2010
FI22.12.2010
SE22.12.2010
SK22.12.2010
BG22.03.2011
PT22.04.2011
CZ08.08.2014
LU08.08.2014
MC01.09.2014
GR04.03.2015
Former [2015/23]BE22.12.2010
EE22.12.2010
FI22.12.2010
SE22.12.2010
SK22.12.2010
BG22.03.2011
PT22.04.2011
CZ08.08.2014
LU08.08.2014
MC01.09.2014
Former [2015/19]BE22.12.2010
EE22.12.2010
FI22.12.2010
SE22.12.2010
SK22.12.2010
BG22.03.2011
PT22.04.2011
LU08.08.2014
MC01.09.2014
Former [2015/18]BE22.12.2010
EE22.12.2010
FI22.12.2010
SE22.12.2010
SK22.12.2010
BG22.03.2011
PT22.04.2011
MC01.09.2014
Former [2011/37]BE22.12.2010
EE22.12.2010
FI22.12.2010
SE22.12.2010
SK22.12.2010
BG22.03.2011
PT22.04.2011
Former [2011/35]BE22.12.2010
EE22.12.2010
FI22.12.2010
SE22.12.2010
BG22.03.2011
PT22.04.2011
Former [2011/31]FI22.12.2010
SE22.12.2010
BG22.03.2011
Former [2011/24]FI22.12.2010
SE22.12.2010
Cited inInternational search[XY]EP0288822  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-6,8,9 * the whole document * [Y] 7;
 [Y]WO9907182  (DECIBEL INSTR INC [US]) [Y] 1-10 * page 7, line 27 - page 9, line 21; figures 3,4A,4B,5,20 *;
 [Y]DE3502178  (PHONAK AG [CH]) [Y] 1-10 * abstract * * page 12, line 9 - page 13, line 33; figures 6-8 *;
 [Y]US5701348  (SHENNIB ADNAN [US], et al) [Y] 8,10 * abstract * * column 12, line 35 - line 40; figure 30 * * column 12, line 35 - line 40; figure 30 *;
 [YA]US3890474  (GLICKSBERG RAYMOND C) [Y] 7 * column 5, line 3 - line 47; figures 1-3,5 * [A] 1,2,9
ExaminationDE29801567U
 US4727582
 JPS62151100