blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1371099

EP1371099 - DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING A PIEZOELECTRIC ACTUATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.02.2010
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip19.02.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 24.03.2010  [2010/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Continental Automotive GmbH
Vahrenwalder Strasse 9
30165 Hannover / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/21]For all designated states
Continental Automotive GmbH
Vahrenwalder Strasse 9
30165 Hannover / DE
Former [2003/51]For all designated states
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / CHEMISKY, Eric
65, rue de la 1ère Armée
F-67630 Lauterbourg / FR
02 / SCHROD, Walter
Nittenauer Strasse 8
93057 Regensburg / DE
 [2003/51]
Application number, filing date02753697.821.03.2002
[2003/51]
WO2002DE01029
Priority number, dateDE200111380221.03.2001         Original published format: DE 10113802
[2003/51]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO02078098
Date:03.10.2002
Language:DE
[2002/40]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1371099
Date:17.12.2003
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2003/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.05.2003
ClassificationIPC:H01L41/04, F02D41/20
[2003/51]
CPC:
F02D41/2096 (EP,US); H02N2/062 (EP,US); H10N30/802 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/51]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUM ANSTEUERN EINES PIEZOELEKTRISCHEN STELLGLIEDES[2003/51]
English:DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING A PIEZOELECTRIC ACTUATOR[2003/51]
French:DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE D'UN ORGANE DE REGLAGE PIEZOELECTRIQUE[2003/51]
Entry into regional phase26.08.2003National basic fee paid 
26.08.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
26.08.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.10.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
26.08.2003Examination requested  [2003/51]
25.05.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.10.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/12]
06.11.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2010/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
21.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
22.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
22.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
20.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
13.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]JPH05284600  ;
 [A]DE3538964  (SWF AUTO ELECTRIC GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 18 - column 4, line 35; figure 1 *;
 JPH05284600  [ ] (NAGATA KUNIHIRO) [ ] * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0016]; figure 1 *;
 [DA]DE19652801  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [DA] 1* column 1, line 3 - column 5, line 3; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]WO9827600  (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1 * page 1, line 6 - page 8, line 6; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]DE19808994  (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]) [A] 1 * page 4, line 26 - page 7, line 31; figure 1 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940207), vol. 018, no. 073, Database accession no. (E - 1503), & JP05284600 A 19931029 (NAGATA KUNIHIRO) [A] 1 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.