EP1417444 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR RAPID HEATING OF FLUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2011 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.03.2011 [2011/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MicroHeat Technologies Pty Ltd. 2 A'Beckett Street Prahran VIC 3181 / AU | [2007/32] |
Former [2004/20] | For all designated states Microheat Pty Ltd 2 A'Beckett Street Prahran, Victoria 3181 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISRAELSOHN, Cedric 7 Birbank Court Doncaster, Victoria 3108 / AU | 02 /
VAN AKEN, Robert, C. 2 A'Beckett Street Prahran, Victoria 3181 / AU | [2004/20] | Representative(s) | Faulkner, Thomas John, et al Cleveland 10 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/02] | Faulkner, Thomas John, et al fJ Cleveland, 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | ||
Former [2004/20] | Howson, Richard G.B. fJ Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 02753919.6 | 12.08.2002 | [2004/20] | WO2002AU01084 | Priority number, date | AU2001PR06973 | 13.08.2001 Original published format: AU PR697301 | AU2001PR08551 | 29.10.2001 Original published format: AU PR855101 | [2004/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03016791 | Date: | 27.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1417444 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1417444 | Date: | 14.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 27.02.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F24H1/10, F24H9/20, F24D17/00, F24D19/00, F24D19/10 | [2004/20] | CPC: |
F24H1/106 (EP,US);
F24H15/144 (EP,US);
F24H15/174 (EP,US);
F24H15/212 (EP,US);
F24H15/215 (EP,US);
F24H15/219 (EP,US);
F24H15/238 (EP,US);
F24H15/281 (EP,US);
F24H15/37 (EP,US);
F24H15/414 (EP,US);
F24H9/2028 (EP,US);
G05D23/1931 (EP,US);
H05B3/146 (EP,US);
H05B3/44 (EP,US);
H05B2203/005 (EP,US);
H05B2203/021 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR SCHNELLEN ERWÄRMUNG VON FLUID | [2004/20] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR RAPID HEATING OF FLUID | [2004/20] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE CHAUFFAGE RAPIDE D'UN FLUIDE | [2008/51] |
Former [2004/20] | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE CHAUFFAGE RAPIDE D'UN FLUIDE | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.2004 | Search fee paid | 12.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 12.02.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/20] | 21.01.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | Divisional application(s) | EP09011247.5 / EP2146157 | Opposition(s) | 17.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/12] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 06.11.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 06.11.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.03.2010 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | EE | 14.04.2010 | [2011/09] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB725568 (RAINBOWS INC) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]JPS57120046 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1* abstract * | International search | [X]DE3630972 ; | [X]US3864543 (MOHR GLENN R); | [X]US3867610 (QUAINTANCE LAYTHOL W); | [X]US4029937 (RUSSELL ROBERT G); | [X]US4093847 (WALKER JOHN A, et al); | [X]US5506391 (BURAYEZ AMAR K [US], et al); | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1987, no. 25, Database accession no. 1987-171280, XP003016335 & DE3630972 A 19870619 (SINGEREWITSCH B) |