Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1415378

EP1415378 - VOLTAGE LIMITING PROTECTION FOR HIGH FREQUENCY POWER DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.05.2012
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.11.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
12.11.2019Deletion: Date of cancellation oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cree, Inc.
4600 Silicon Drive
Durham, NC 27703 / US
[2011/21]
Former [2006/06]For all designated states
CREE MICROWAVE, LLC
160 Gibraltar Court
Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US
Former [2004/19]For all designated states
Cree Microwave, Inc.
160 Gibraltar Court
Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BREWER, Kenneth, P.
633 Ehrhorn Avenue, 4
Mountain View, CA 94041 / US
02 / BARTLOW, Howard, D.
1211 Torrey Lane
Nampa, ID 83686 / US
03 / DARMAWAN, Johan, A.
2516 Rose Way
Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US
 [2004/19]
Representative(s)Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Salisbury Square House
8 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/02]Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Former [2004/19]Cross, Rupert Edward Blount , et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date02756459.012.07.2002
[2004/19]
WO2002US22198
Priority number, dateUS2001090529413.07.2001         Original published format: US 905294
[2004/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO03007451
Date:23.01.2003
Language:EN
[2003/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1415378
Date:06.05.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.2003
[2004/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US23.01.2003
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.09.2008
ClassificationInternational:H02H9/00, H01L27/02
[2004/19]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2004/19]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:SPANNUNGSBEGRENZUNGSSCHUTZ FÜR EINE HOCHFREQUENZLEISTUNGSEINRICHTUNG[2004/19]
English:VOLTAGE LIMITING PROTECTION FOR HIGH FREQUENCY POWER DEVICE[2004/19]
French:PROTECTION DE LIMITATION DE TENSION POUR DISPOSITIF DE PUISSANCE HAUTE FREQUENCE[2004/19]
Entry into regional phase06.02.2004National basic fee paid 
06.02.2004Search fee paid 
06.02.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
06.02.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.02.2003Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
06.02.2004Examination requested  [2004/19]
01.10.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.01.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.11.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.05.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.04.2015Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.04.2015
21.04.2015Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
28.04.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination29.06.2015Appeal received No.  T1974/15
04.09.2015Statement of grounds filed
23.04.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.10.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
13.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
12.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
13.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
10.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
14.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
12.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
13.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 11
10.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 12
14.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 13
10.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 14
11.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 15
11.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 16
10.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 17
15.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 18
Documents cited:Search[X]US5532639  (ROTAY CRAIG J [US] ET AL) [X] 1-13 * abstract * * column 5, line 57 - column 6, line 38 * * figures 3,4 *;
 [A]EP0773586  (SILICONIX INC [US]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * column 1, line 29 - column 2, line 41 * * column 4, line 4 - line 38 * * figures 1,2,4,5 *;
 [A]JPH1167486  (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-13 * abstract *;
 [A]JPH06232332  (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-13 * abstract *
International search[X]US5617282  (RALL BERNHARD [DE], et al);
 [A]US4758873  (MONTICELLI DENNIS M [US])
by applicantUS5532639
 EP0773586