blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1411784

EP1411784 - CIGARETTE FILTER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.08.2012
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip14.06.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FI
published on 17.07.2013  [2013/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Brown & Williamson Holdings, Inc.
103 Foulk Road, Suite 117
Wilmington, DE 19803 / US
[2011/46]
Former [2004/18]For all designated states
Brown & Williamson Tobacco Corporation
1500 Brown & Williamson Tower
Louisville Kentucky 40202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / FIGLAR, James, N.
215 Plantation Drive
Macon, GA 31216 / US
02 / TUCKER, Brian, E.
118 Durham Place
Macon, GA 31210 / US
03 / ST. CHARLES, F., Kelley
112 Raven Avenue
Perry, GA 31069 / US
 [2004/18]
Representative(s)Rögner, Jürgen
Schwabe Sandmair Marx
Patentanwälte
Stuntzstrasse 16
81677 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/41]Rögner, Jürgen
Schwabe Sandmair Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstrasse 16
81677 München / DE
Former [2004/18]Rögner, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Schwabe Sandmair Marx, Stuntzstrasse 16
81677 München / DE
Application number, filing date02756831.030.07.2002
[2004/18]
WO2002US24240
Priority number, dateUS20010309388P01.08.2001         Original published format: US 309388 P
US20010309435P01.08.2001         Original published format: US 309435 P
US2001001184130.10.2001         Original published format: US 11841
[2004/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO03015544
Date:27.02.2003
Language:EN
[2003/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1411784
Date:28.04.2004
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2004/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1411784
Date:12.10.2011
Language:EN
[2011/41]
Type: B8 Corrected title page of specification 
No.:EP1411784
Date:07.03.2012
[2012/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.02.2003
ClassificationIPC:A24D3/12, A24D3/16
[2004/18]
CPC data not yet available
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2004/18]
TitleGerman:ZIGARETTENFILTER[2004/18]
English:CIGARETTE FILTER[2004/18]
French:FILTRE DE CIGARETTE[2004/18]
Entry into regional phase05.02.2004National basic fee paid 
05.02.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
05.02.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.02.2003Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
05.02.2004Examination requested  [2004/18]
13.06.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.10.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.03.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.07.2011Fee for grant paid
25.07.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.06.2007
Opposition(s)13.07.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
20.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
16.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
14.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
18.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
20.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
27.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
25.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT12.10.2011
BE12.10.2011
CY12.10.2011
CZ12.10.2011
DK12.10.2011
EE12.10.2011
FI12.10.2011
NL12.10.2011
SE12.10.2011
SK12.10.2011
BG12.01.2012
GR13.01.2012
PT13.02.2012
[2013/29]
Former [2013/07]AT12.10.2011
BE12.10.2011
CY12.10.2011
CZ12.10.2011
DK12.10.2011
EE12.10.2011
NL12.10.2011
SE12.10.2011
SK12.10.2011
BG12.01.2012
GR13.01.2012
PT13.02.2012
Former [2012/36]BE12.10.2011
CY12.10.2011
CZ12.10.2011
DK12.10.2011
EE12.10.2011
NL12.10.2011
SE12.10.2011
SK12.10.2011
BG12.01.2012
GR13.01.2012
PT13.02.2012
Former [2012/35]BE12.10.2011
CY12.10.2011
CZ12.10.2011
DK12.10.2011
EE12.10.2011
NL12.10.2011
SE12.10.2011
BG12.01.2012
GR13.01.2012
PT13.02.2012
Former [2012/34]BE12.10.2011
CY12.10.2011
CZ12.10.2011
NL12.10.2011
SE12.10.2011
GR13.01.2012
PT13.02.2012
Former [2012/28]BE12.10.2011
CY12.10.2011
NL12.10.2011
SE12.10.2011
GR13.01.2012
PT13.02.2012
Former [2012/24]BE12.10.2011
NL12.10.2011
SE12.10.2011
GR13.01.2012
PT13.02.2012
Former [2012/23]BE12.10.2011
NL12.10.2011
GR13.01.2012
PT13.02.2012
Former [2012/21]BE12.10.2011
Cited inInternational search[XD]US2815760  (THEO SCHREUS HANS, et al) [XD] 1-4,6,7,9,18,19,21,24,28-31 * example 2 *;
 [A]GB878457  (AREND JACOB VAN BUUREN);
 [X]BE647803  (FLAMAND) [X] 1-4,6,7,9,11-15,18,19,21,24,28-30 * the whole document *;
 [XA]US3280823  (ABRAHAM BAVLEY, et al) [X] 1-4,7,11,14,16,18,26,29 * column 8, line 52 - line 75; example 1 * [A] 5,12;
 [A]US3716500  (LITZINGER E) [A] 1-6,11,17 * column 3, line 36 - line 47; example IV *;
 [A]US4033361  (HORSEWELL HENRY GEORGE, et al) [A] 1-31 * example 10; claim - *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.