blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1425351

EP1425351 - HYPERPLATY CLAYS AND THEIR USE IN PAPER COATING AND FILLING, METHODS FOR MAKING SAME, AND PAPER PRODUCTS HAVING IMPROVED BRIGHTNESS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.03.2017
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip17.08.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG
published on 19.09.2018  [2018/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Imerys Pigments, Inc.
100 Mansell Court East, Suite 300
Roswell, GA 30076 / US
[2016/19]
Former [2004/24]For all designated states
Imerys Pigments, Inc.
100 Mansell Court East, Suite 300
Roswell, GA 30076 / US
Inventor(s)01 / JONES, Philip, J., E.
1045 Creek Ridge Pointe
Alpharetta, GA 30005 / US
02 / PRUETT, Robert J.
113 Cambridge Drive N.
Milledgeville, GA 31061 / US
03 / GARSKA, Michael J.
271 South Anderson Drive
Sandersville, GA 31082 / US
04 / BILIMORIA, Bomi M
113 Carriage Lakes Court
Macon, GA 31210 / US
05 / YUAN, Jun
119 Springfield Lane
Warner Robins, GA 31088 / US
06 / CUMMINGS, David O.
3204 Hamburg Road
Warthen, GA 31904 / US
07 / WESLEY, Robin
John Keay House
St.Austell Cornwall PL25 4DJ / GB
 [2004/24]
Representative(s)Brown, David Leslie
Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP
Redcliff Quay
120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/19]Brown, David Leslie
Haseltine Lake LLP
Redcliff Quay
120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
Former [2004/24]Brown, David Leslie
Haseltine Lake, Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UD / GB
Application number, filing date02757609.906.09.2002
[2004/24]
WO2002US28305
Priority number, dateUS20010318207P07.09.2001         Original published format: US 318207 P
[2004/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO03022933
Date:20.03.2003
Language:EN
[2003/12]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1425351
Date:09.06.2004
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2004/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1425351
Date:11.05.2016
Language:EN
[2016/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.08.2003
ClassificationIPC:C09C1/42, C09C1/00, D21H19/40, C08K3/34
[2004/24]
CPC:
D21H17/68 (EP,US); C09C1/0018 (EP,US); C09C1/42 (EP,US);
D21H19/40 (EP,US); C01P2004/54 (EP,US); C01P2004/61 (EP,US);
C01P2004/62 (EP,US); C01P2006/60 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2016/19]
Former [2004/24]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:PLÄTTCHENFÖRMIGER TON UND SEINE VERWENDUNG IN PAPIERBESCHICHTUNG UND -FÜLLUNG, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN HIERFÜR, UND PAPIERPRODUKTE MIT VERBESSERTER HELLIGKEIT[2004/24]
English:HYPERPLATY CLAYS AND THEIR USE IN PAPER COATING AND FILLING, METHODS FOR MAKING SAME, AND PAPER PRODUCTS HAVING IMPROVED BRIGHTNESS[2004/24]
French:ARGILES HYPERLAMELAIRES ET LEUR UTILISATION DANS LE REVETEMENT ET LE CHARGEMENT DE PAPIER, PROCEDES DE FABRICATION DE CELLES-CI, ET PRODUITS DE PAPIER A BLANCHEUR AMELIOREE[2004/24]
Entry into regional phase31.03.2004National basic fee paid 
31.03.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
31.03.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.03.2003Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
31.03.2004Examination requested  [2004/24]
20.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.10.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.05.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.01.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
10.03.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.12.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.06.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.11.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.06.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.02.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.08.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.04.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.10.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.01.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.03.2016Fee for grant paid
22.03.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.03.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP10181338.4  / EP2280045
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.09.2004
Opposition(s)14.02.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/16]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
03.03.2008Request for further processing filed
03.03.2008Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
14.03.2008Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
18.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
16.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
17.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
20.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
23.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
27.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
26.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
25.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 11
27.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 12
29.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 13
28.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 14
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT11.05.2016
BG11.05.2016
CY11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
MC11.05.2016
SK11.05.2016
TR11.05.2016
GR12.08.2016
IE06.09.2016
LU06.09.2016
PT12.09.2016
CH30.09.2016
LI30.09.2016
[2018/38]
Former [2018/29]AT11.05.2016
CY11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
MC11.05.2016
SK11.05.2016
TR11.05.2016
GR12.08.2016
IE06.09.2016
LU06.09.2016
PT12.09.2016
CH30.09.2016
LI30.09.2016
Former [2017/41]AT11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
MC11.05.2016
SK11.05.2016
GR12.08.2016
IE06.09.2016
LU06.09.2016
PT12.09.2016
CH30.09.2016
LI30.09.2016
Former [2017/31]AT11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
MC11.05.2016
SK11.05.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2017/11]AT11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
SK11.05.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2017/10]CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
SK11.05.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2017/09]CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2017/07]DK11.05.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2016/51]GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Cited inInternational search[PX]WO0216509  (IMERYS MINERALS LTD [GB], et al) [PX] 1-25 * page 1, line 3 - line 8 * * page 2, line 30 - page 3, line 10 * * page 4, line 16 - line 23 * * examples 1,2 *;
 [X]EP0524635  (MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS LTD [JP]) [X] 1-25 * page 4, line 10 - line 35 * * page 6, line 31 - line 43 * * claims 1-5 *;
 [X]US4889886  (WADA MITSUO [JP], et al) [X] 1-25 * column 6, line 3 - line 27 * * column 9, line 33 - line 40; claim - *;
 [X]US5925454  (BEKELE SOLOMON [US]) [X] 1-25 * column 2, line 29 - line 39 * * column 3, line 33 - line 37 *;
 [A]WO9951815  (ECC INT LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-25 * page 9, line 1 - page 10, line 14 * * page 15, line 17 - line 24 * * page 16, line 5 - line 18 * * page 20, line 22 - line 27 * * example 3 *;
 [A]WO0059841  (IMERYS PIGMENTS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-25 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 8, paragraph 3 - page 9, paragraph 1 * * page 13, paragraph 3 * * page 24, paragraph 3 - page 25, paragraph 3 * * page 28, paragraph 3 * * page 34, paragraph 1 *
by applicantUS5128606
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.