Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1425430

EP1425430 - AI ALLOY FOR LITHOGRAPHIC SHEET [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.05.2017
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.07.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Novelis Inc.
70 York Street Suite 1510
Toronto, Ontario M5J 1S9 / CA
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]For all designated states
Novelis, Inc.
70 York Street Suite 1510
Toronto, Ontario M5J 1S9 / CA
Former [2006/15]For all designated states
Novelis, Inc.
70 York Street Suite 1510
Toronto, Ontario M5J 1S9 / CA
Former [2004/24]For all designated states
ALCAN INTERNATIONAL LIMITED
1188 Sherbrooke Street West
Montreal, P.Q., H3A 3G1 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / WARD, John Andrew
9 Beaufort Avenue, New Cubbington
Leamington Spa, Warwickshire CV32 7TA / GB
 [2004/24]
Representative(s)Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB
Postfach 860 820
81635 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/34]Dey, Michael
Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Richard-Strauss-Strasse 80
81679 München / DE
Former [2013/07]Wilkinson, Stephen John
Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 St. Augustine's Place
Bristol BS1 4UD / GB
Former [2004/24]Knowles, James Atherton
Stevens Hewlett & Perkins 1 St Augustine's Place
Bristol BS1 4UD / GB
Application number, filing date02758588.411.09.2002
[2004/24]
WO2002GB04129
Priority number, dateGB2001002192712.09.2001         Original published format: GB 0121927
[2004/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO03023079
Date:20.03.2003
Language:EN
[2003/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1425430
Date:09.06.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.03.2003
[2004/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1425430
Date:13.08.2008
Language:EN
[2008/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.03.2003
ClassificationInternational:C22C21/00, C22C21/10, B41N1/08
[2004/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2004/24]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:AL-LEGIERUNG FÜR LITHOGRAPHISCHE PLATTE[2004/24]
English:AI ALLOY FOR LITHOGRAPHIC SHEET[2004/24]
French:ALLIAGE D'ALUMINIUM POUR FEUILLE LITHOGRAPHIQUE[2004/24]
Entry into regional phase08.03.2004National basic fee paid 
08.03.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
08.03.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.04.2003Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
08.03.2004Examination requested  [2004/24]
05.01.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.06.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.04.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.05.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.04.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.05.2008Fee for grant paid
29.05.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  13.05.2009  19.01.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Hydro Aluminium Deutschland GmbH
Aluminiumstrasse 1
41515 Grevenbroich / DE
Opponent's representative
Cohausz & Florack
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Postfach 10 18 30
40009 Düsseldorf / DE
 [2017/02]
Former [2016/40]
Opponent(s)01  13.05.2009  19.01.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Hydro Aluminium Deutschland GmbH
Ettore-Bugatti-Strasse 6-14
51149 Koeln / DE
Opponent's representative
Cohausz & Florack
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Postfach 10 18 30
40009 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2009/26]
Opponent(s)01  13.05.2009   
Hydro Aluminium Deutschland GmbH
Ettore-Bugatti-Strasse 6-14
51149 Koeln / DE
Opponent's representative
Ziebell, Arnd
Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bleichstrasse 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
24.06.2009Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
06.01.2010Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
06.12.2016Date of oral proceedings
24.05.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
24.05.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition27.06.2017Appeal received No.  T1490/17
26.09.2017Statement of grounds filed
21.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
21.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
27.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
26.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT13.08.2008
BE13.08.2008
CY13.08.2008
CZ13.08.2008
DK13.08.2008
EE13.08.2008
FI13.08.2008
SK13.08.2008
TR13.08.2008
IE11.09.2008
LU11.09.2008
CH30.09.2008
LI30.09.2008
MC30.09.2008
FR13.10.2008
BG13.11.2008
SE13.11.2008
GR14.11.2008
PT13.01.2009
[2015/21]
Former [2010/48]AT13.08.2008
BE13.08.2008
CY13.08.2008
CZ13.08.2008
DK13.08.2008
EE13.08.2008
FI13.08.2008
SK13.08.2008
TR13.08.2008
IE11.09.2008
LU11.09.2008
CH30.09.2008
LI30.09.2008
MC30.09.2008
BG13.11.2008
SE13.11.2008
GR14.11.2008
PT13.01.2009
Former [2010/37]AT13.08.2008
BE13.08.2008
CY13.08.2008
CZ13.08.2008
DK13.08.2008
EE13.08.2008
FI13.08.2008
SK13.08.2008
TR13.08.2008
IE11.09.2008
LU11.09.2008
CH30.09.2008
LI30.09.2008
MC30.09.2008
BG13.11.2008
SE13.11.2008
PT13.01.2009
Former [2010/34]AT13.08.2008
BE13.08.2008
CY13.08.2008
CZ13.08.2008
DK13.08.2008
EE13.08.2008
FI13.08.2008
SK13.08.2008
IE11.09.2008
LU11.09.2008
CH30.09.2008
LI30.09.2008
MC30.09.2008
BG13.11.2008
SE13.11.2008
PT13.01.2009
Former [2010/32]AT13.08.2008
BE13.08.2008
CZ13.08.2008
DK13.08.2008
EE13.08.2008
FI13.08.2008
SK13.08.2008
IE11.09.2008
LU11.09.2008
CH30.09.2008
LI30.09.2008
MC30.09.2008
BG13.11.2008
SE13.11.2008
PT13.01.2009
Former [2010/09]AT13.08.2008
BE13.08.2008
CZ13.08.2008
DK13.08.2008
EE13.08.2008
FI13.08.2008
SK13.08.2008
IE11.09.2008
CH30.09.2008
LI30.09.2008
MC30.09.2008
BG13.11.2008
SE13.11.2008
PT13.01.2009
Former [2009/49]AT13.08.2008
BE13.08.2008
CZ13.08.2008
DK13.08.2008
EE13.08.2008
FI13.08.2008
SK13.08.2008
IE11.09.2008
CH30.09.2008
LI30.09.2008
MC30.09.2008
BG13.11.2008
PT13.01.2009
Former [2009/36]AT13.08.2008
BE13.08.2008
CZ13.08.2008
DK13.08.2008
EE13.08.2008
FI13.08.2008
SK13.08.2008
IE11.09.2008
MC30.09.2008
BG13.11.2008
PT13.01.2009
Former [2009/34]AT13.08.2008
BE13.08.2008
CZ13.08.2008
DK13.08.2008
FI13.08.2008
SK13.08.2008
IE11.09.2008
MC30.09.2008
BG13.11.2008
PT13.01.2009
Former [2009/25]AT13.08.2008
BE13.08.2008
CZ13.08.2008
DK13.08.2008
FI13.08.2008
SK13.08.2008
MC30.09.2008
BG13.11.2008
PT13.01.2009
Former [2009/24]AT13.08.2008
BE13.08.2008
CZ13.08.2008
DK13.08.2008
FI13.08.2008
SK13.08.2008
MC30.09.2008
BG13.11.2008
Former [2009/23]AT13.08.2008
BE13.08.2008
DK13.08.2008
FI13.08.2008
MC30.09.2008
BG13.11.2008
Former [2009/20]AT13.08.2008
BE13.08.2008
DK13.08.2008
FI13.08.2008
MC30.09.2008
Former [2009/19]AT13.08.2008
BE13.08.2008
DK13.08.2008
FI13.08.2008
Former [2009/15]AT13.08.2008
FI13.08.2008
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0096347  (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD ;SUMITOMO LIGHT METAL IND (JP)) [X] 1-3,8-14,16-29 * page 5, line 17 - page 6, line 11 *;
 [X]JPH09316582  ;
 [X]JPH08311592  ;
 [A]EP0853132  (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND) [A] 1 * claim 1; table 1 *;
 [A]JPH08292593  ;
 [A]US4822715  (SHOJI RYO ET AL) [A] 1,4,5 * claim 1 *;
 [A]EP0887430  (SKY ALUMINIUM ;FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD (JP))
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980331), vol. 1998, no. 04, & JP09316582 A 19971209 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [X] 1-3,8-14,16-29 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970331), vol. 1997, no. 03, & JP08311592 A 19961126 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [X] 1-3,8-14,16-29 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970331), vol. 1997, no. 03, & JP08292593 A 19961105 (KONICA CORP) [A] 1 * abstract *