Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1335440

EP1335440 - POWER SUPPLY DEVICE AND OPERATION METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.04.2013
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip26.04.2013No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 29.05.2013  [2013/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-0001 / JP
[2012/25]
Former [2003/33]For all designated states
Sony Corporation
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-0001 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / TANAKA, Koichi, c/o SONY CORPORATION
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-0001 / JP
 [2012/25]
Former [2003/33]01 / TANAKA, Koichi, c/o SONY CORPORATION
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-0001 / JP
Representative(s)Körber, Martin Hans
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 33 06 09
80066 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/25]Körber, Martin Hans
Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 06 09
80066 München / DE
Former [2003/33]Körber, Martin, Dipl.-Phys.
Mitscherlich & Partner Patentanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date02758800.307.08.2002
[2003/33]
WO2002JP08084
Priority number, dateJP2001026522703.09.2001         Original published format: JP 2001265227
JP2002017273713.06.2002         Original published format: JP 2002172737
[2003/33]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO03021703
Date:13.03.2003
Language:EN
[2003/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1335440
Date:13.08.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.2003
[2003/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1335440
Date:20.06.2012
Language:EN
[2012/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP13.03.2003
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:H01M8/04, H01M8/02, H01M8/00
[2003/33]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/20]
Former [2003/33]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT 
TitleGerman:STROMVERSORGUNGSEINRICHTUNG UND BETRIEBSVERFAHREN DAFÜR[2003/33]
English:POWER SUPPLY DEVICE AND OPERATION METHOD THEREFOR[2003/33]
French:DISPOSITIF D'ALIMENTATION EN ENERGIE ET PROCEDE DE FONCTIONNEMENT ASSOCIE[2003/33]
Entry into regional phase05.05.2003Translation filed 
05.05.2003National basic fee paid 
05.05.2003Search fee paid 
05.05.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
05.05.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.05.2003Examination requested  [2003/33]
28.05.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.09.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.01.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.04.2012Fee for grant paid
30.04.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.05.2009
Opposition(s)21.03.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
12.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
14.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
14.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
12.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
25.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
24.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[XP]US2002094463  (LUKEN RICHARD ERIC [US], et al) [XP] 1-11 * paragraphs [0010] , [0022] *;
 [A]US5242764  (DHAR HARI P [US]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *
International search[Y]JPH06274233  (SANYO ELECTRIC CO);
 [Y]JPH11339820  (TOKYO GAS CO LTD);
 [Y]EP0702376  (ABE YOSHIHIRO [JP], et al);
 [Y]EP0731519  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al);
 [Y]JPH1069817  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD, et al);
 [Y]JPH11203936  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD, et al);
 [Y]JP2000357524  (TOSHIBA CORP);
 [Y]JPH09251857  (AGENCY IND SCIENCE TECHN, et al);
 [Y]WO0106519  (SONY CORP [JP])