Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1421469

EP1421469 - PORTABLE MULTI-DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.07.2012
Database last updated on 26.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.07.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 29.08.2012  [2012/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kim, Si-Han
338-1 Daessangyong-Ri, Choweol-Myun, Kwangju-Kun
Kyunggi-Do 464-862 / KR
[N/P]
Former [2004/22]For all designated states
Kim, Si, Han
338-1 Daessangyong-Ri, Choweol-Myun, Kwangju-Kun
Kyunggi-Do 464-862 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / KIM, Si, Han
338-1, Daessangyong-Ri, Choweol-Myun, Kwangju-Kun
464-862 Kyunggi-Do / KR
02 / KIM, Hyun, Hee
338-1, Daessangyong-Ri, Choweol-Myun, Kwangju-Kun
464-862 Kyunggi-Do / KR
03 / KIM, Jang Ho, 101-2005, Jukong Apartment
Wonchon 1 Complex, 1230 Maetan-Dong, Paldal-Ku
Suwon-City, 442-370 Kyunggi-Do / KR
 [2004/22]
Representative(s)Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Joachimsthaler Straße 10-12
10719 Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/22]Pfenning, Meinig & Partner
Joachimstaler Strasse 10-12
10719 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date02758934.024.08.2002
[2004/22]
WO2002KR01596
Priority number, dateKR2001005150625.08.2001         Original published format: KR 2001051506
KR2001005446205.09.2001         Original published format: KR 2001054462
KR2001005611212.09.2001         Original published format: KR 2001056112
KR2001006498822.10.2001         Original published format: KR 2001064988
[2004/22]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO03019349
Date:06.03.2003
Language:EN
[2003/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1421469
Date:26.05.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2003
[2004/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR06.03.2003
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:G06F1/16
[2009/05]
Former International [2004/22]G06F3/14
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2004/22]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:TRAGBARE MEHRFACHDISPLAYEINRICHTUNG[2004/22]
English:PORTABLE MULTI-DISPLAY DEVICE[2004/22]
French:DISPOSITIF PORTABLE MULTI-AFFICHAGE[2004/22]
Entry into regional phase06.03.2003Translation filed 
23.01.2004National basic fee paid 
23.01.2004Search fee paid 
23.01.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
23.01.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.01.2004Examination requested  [2004/22]
01.03.2012Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/35]
10.04.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2012/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
31.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
29.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
30.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
29.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
26.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
31.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201110   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US6262785  (KIM SI-HAN [KR]) [X] 1-3,5-8,19,20,24-28,31,33,36-38 * column 1, line 6 - line 52 * * column 2, line 60 - column 9, line 15; figures 1-9,11-23 * [Y] 4,21-23,32,34;
 [XY]KR20010055072  ;
 [XY]GB2337891  (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 41 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 10 * * page 3, line 2 - page 4, line 19 * * page 5, line 5 - page 9, line 21; figures 1-3B,5-7B * [Y] 21-23;
 [YA]EP0678987  (NEC CORP [JP]) [Y] 4,22,23 * column 1, line 3 - line 7 * * column 3, line 23 - column 5, line 16 * * column 6, line 9 - line 48; figures 1A-3,5A-6 * [A] 41
 [XY]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2002, no. 05, Database accession no. 2002-039079, XP002508846 & KR20010055072 A 20010702 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD) [X] 1-3,5,7,19,20,24-28,31,40 * abstract * [Y] 32,34
International search[A]KR19990078832  ;
 [A]KR900006988  ;
 [A]KR19980069653  ;
 [AP]KR20020059552  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR])