blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1436103

EP1436103 - METHOD FOR RECONDITIONING ROLLERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  01.05.2009
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip01.05.2009Revocation of patentpublished on 03.06.2009  [2009/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Aluminium Norf GmbH
Koblenzer Strasse 120
41468 Neuss / DE
[2004/29]
Inventor(s)01 / ESCHNER, Peter
Erftstrasse 13
40670 Meerbusch-Strümp / DE
 [2004/29]
Representative(s)Schüll, Gottfried Hubert
Cohausz & Florack
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstrasse 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/29]Schüll, Gottfried, Dipl.-Phys.
COHAUSZ & FLORACK Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bleichstrasse 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date02760208.529.06.2002
[2004/29]
WO2002EP07214
Priority number, dateDE200115271819.10.2001         Original published format: DE 10152718
EP2001012517723.10.2001         Original published format: EP 01125177
[2004/29]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO03035292
Date:01.05.2003
Language:DE
[2003/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1436103
Date:14.07.2004
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2004/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1436103
Date:23.02.2005
Language:DE
[2005/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.05.2003
ClassificationIPC:B21B28/04
[2004/29]
CPC:
B21B28/04 (EP,KR,US); B21B28/02 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2004/29]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR AUFARBEITUNG VON WALZEN[2004/29]
English:METHOD FOR RECONDITIONING ROLLERS[2004/29]
French:PROCEDE DE REMISE EN ETAT DE CYLINDRES[2004/29]
Entry into regional phase12.03.2004National basic fee paid 
12.03.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
12.03.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.04.2003Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
12.03.2004Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.03.2004Examination requested  [2004/29]
10.09.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.11.2004Fee for grant paid
25.11.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  18.11.2005  29.11.2005  ADMISSIBLE
ALCAN FRANCE S.A.S.
217 Cours Lafayette
69451 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
 [2009/19]
Former [2007/22]
Opponent(s)01  18.11.2005  29.11.2005  ADMISSIBLE
ALCAN FRANCE S.A.S.
217 Cours Lafayette
69451 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
Opponent's representative
Santarelli, Marc, et al, et al
PECHINEY 217 Cours Lafayette
69451 Lyon cedex 06 / FR
Former [2007/03]
Opponent(s)     
deleted
Former [2006/02]
Opponent(s)01  18.11.2005   
PECHINEY
7,Place du Chancelier Adenauer
75218 Paris Cedex 16 / FR
02.01.2006Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
26.06.2006Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
12.11.2007Date of oral proceedings
29.11.2007Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
29.11.2007Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
30.03.2009Legal effect of revocation of patent [2009/23]
Appeal following opposition29.01.2008Appeal received No.  T0205/08
08.04.2008Statement of grounds filed
30.03.2009Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
30.03.2009Date of oral proceedings
02.04.2009Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI23.02.2005
IE23.02.2005
NL23.02.2005
TR23.02.2005
DK23.05.2005
CY29.06.2005
LU29.06.2005
BE30.06.2005
MC30.06.2005
PT17.08.2005
[2007/26]
Former [2007/20]FI23.02.2005
IE23.02.2005
NL23.02.2005
TR23.02.2005
DK23.05.2005
CY29.06.2005
BE30.06.2005
LU30.06.2005
MC30.06.2005
PT17.08.2005
Former [2007/11]FI23.02.2005
IE23.02.2005
NL23.02.2005
TR23.02.2005
DK23.05.2005
BE30.06.2005
LU30.06.2005
MC30.06.2005
PT17.08.2005
Former [2006/52]FI23.02.2005
IE23.02.2005
NL23.02.2005
TR23.02.2005
DK23.05.2005
BE30.06.2005
MC30.06.2005
PT17.08.2005
Former [2006/28]FI23.02.2005
IE23.02.2005
NL23.02.2005
DK23.05.2005
BE30.06.2005
MC30.06.2005
PT17.08.2005
Former [2006/25]FI23.02.2005
IE23.02.2005
NL23.02.2005
DK23.05.2005
BE30.06.2005
PT17.08.2005
Former [2006/14]FI23.02.2005
IE23.02.2005
NL23.02.2005
DK23.05.2005
PT17.08.2005
Former [2006/13]FI23.02.2005
IE23.02.2005
DK23.05.2005
Former [2006/12]FI23.02.2005
DK23.05.2005
Former [2005/46]FI23.02.2005
Cited inInternational search[Y]JPH06106213  ;
 [A]US5460023  (GINZBURG VLADIMIR B [US]) [A] 1-3,5-7 * column 1, line 13 - line 26 ** column 3, line 18 - column 5, line 11; figure - *;
 [Y]DE19848174  (BWG BERGWERK WALZWERK [DE], et al) [Y] 1-7 * column 1, line 61 - column 2, line 8; figure -; claims 1-4,7-9 *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940718), vol. 018, no. 380, Database accession no. (M - 1639), & JP06106213 A 19940419 (KAWASAKI STEEL CORP) [Y] 1-7 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.