Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1423163

EP1423163 - SYSTEM FOR DETECTING MYOCARDIAL ISCHEMIA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2004/23]SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DETECTING MYOCARDIAL ISCHEMIA
[2011/49]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.03.2013
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip30.05.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 02.07.2014  [2014/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Medtronic, Inc.
710 Medtronic Parkway
Minneapolis, MN 55432-5604 / US
[2012/17]
Former [2004/34]For all designated states
Medtronic, Inc.
710 Medtronic Parkway
Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432-5604 / US
Former [2004/23]For all designated states
Medtronic, INC.
LC 340 , 710 Medtronic Parkway
Minneapolis, MN 55432 / US
Inventor(s)01 / NELSON, Shannon, D.
7200 256th Avenue NE
Stacy, MN 55079 / US
02 / STADLER, Robert, W.
339 Oakwood Drive
Shoreview, MN 55126 / US
03 / SHELDON, Todd, J.
38 East Pleasant Lake Road
North Oaks, MN 55127 / US
04 / STYLOS, Lee
809 West Drive
Stillwater, MN 55082 / US
 [2004/23]
Representative(s)Hughes, Andrea Michelle
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/17]Hughes, Andrea Michelle
Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
Former [2004/23]Hughes, Andrea Michelle
Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Application number, filing date02761541.830.08.2002
[2004/23]
WO2002US27776
Priority number, dateUS2001094517930.08.2001         Original published format: US 945179
US20010337252P03.12.2001         Original published format: US 337252 P
[2004/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO03020367
Date:13.03.2003
Language:EN
[2003/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1423163
Date:02.06.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.2003
[2004/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1423163
Date:25.04.2012
Language:EN
[2012/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.03.2003
ClassificationInternational:A61N1/365, A61N1/368, A61B5/04, A61B5/11
[2004/23]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2004/23]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR DETEKTION MYOKARDIALER ISCHÄMIE[2011/49]
English:SYSTEM FOR DETECTING MYOCARDIAL ISCHEMIA[2011/49]
French:SYSTEME DE DETECTION D'UNE ISCHEMIE MYOCARDIQUE[2011/49]
Former [2004/23]VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR DETEKTION MYOKARDIALER ISCHÄMIE
Former [2004/23]SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DETECTING MYOCARDIAL ISCHEMIA
Former [2004/23]SYSTEME ET METHODE DE DETECTION D'UNE ISCHEMIE MYOCARDIQUE
Entry into regional phase26.03.2004National basic fee paid 
26.03.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
26.03.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.03.2003Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
26.03.2004Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.03.2004Examination requested  [2004/23]
16.02.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.07.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.09.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.01.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.12.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.03.2012Fee for grant paid
13.03.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.09.2009
Opposition(s)28.01.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
08.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
07.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
03.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
08.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
07.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
06.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
08.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT25.04.2012
BE25.04.2012
CY25.04.2012
CZ25.04.2012
DK25.04.2012
EE25.04.2012
FI25.04.2012
IT25.04.2012
NL25.04.2012
SE25.04.2012
SK25.04.2012
TR25.04.2012
BG25.07.2012
GR26.07.2012
ES05.08.2012
PT27.08.2012
GB30.08.2012
IE30.08.2012
LU30.08.2012
CH31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
[2014/27]
Former [2014/21]AT25.04.2012
BE25.04.2012
CY25.04.2012
CZ25.04.2012
DK25.04.2012
EE25.04.2012
FI25.04.2012
IT25.04.2012
NL25.04.2012
SE25.04.2012
SK25.04.2012
TR25.04.2012
BG25.07.2012
GR26.07.2012
ES05.08.2012
PT27.08.2012
GB30.08.2012
IE30.08.2012
CH31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
Former [2013/34]AT25.04.2012
BE25.04.2012
CY25.04.2012
CZ25.04.2012
DK25.04.2012
EE25.04.2012
FI25.04.2012
IT25.04.2012
NL25.04.2012
SE25.04.2012
SK25.04.2012
BG25.07.2012
GR26.07.2012
ES05.08.2012
PT27.08.2012
GB30.08.2012
IE30.08.2012
CH31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
Former [2013/33]AT25.04.2012
BE25.04.2012
CY25.04.2012
CZ25.04.2012
DK25.04.2012
EE25.04.2012
FI25.04.2012
IT25.04.2012
NL25.04.2012
SE25.04.2012
SK25.04.2012
GR26.07.2012
ES05.08.2012
PT27.08.2012
IE30.08.2012
CH31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
Former [2013/22]AT25.04.2012
BE25.04.2012
CY25.04.2012
CZ25.04.2012
DK25.04.2012
EE25.04.2012
FI25.04.2012
IT25.04.2012
NL25.04.2012
SE25.04.2012
SK25.04.2012
GR26.07.2012
ES05.08.2012
PT27.08.2012
CH31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
Former [2013/20]AT25.04.2012
BE25.04.2012
CY25.04.2012
CZ25.04.2012
DK25.04.2012
EE25.04.2012
FI25.04.2012
IT25.04.2012
NL25.04.2012
SE25.04.2012
SK25.04.2012
GR26.07.2012
PT27.08.2012
CH31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
Former [2013/16]AT25.04.2012
BE25.04.2012
CY25.04.2012
CZ25.04.2012
DK25.04.2012
EE25.04.2012
FI25.04.2012
IT25.04.2012
NL25.04.2012
SE25.04.2012
SK25.04.2012
GR26.07.2012
PT27.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
Former [2013/11]AT25.04.2012
BE25.04.2012
CY25.04.2012
CZ25.04.2012
DK25.04.2012
EE25.04.2012
FI25.04.2012
IT25.04.2012
NL25.04.2012
SE25.04.2012
SK25.04.2012
GR26.07.2012
PT27.08.2012
Former [2013/10]AT25.04.2012
BE25.04.2012
CY25.04.2012
CZ25.04.2012
DK25.04.2012
EE25.04.2012
FI25.04.2012
NL25.04.2012
SE25.04.2012
SK25.04.2012
GR26.07.2012
PT27.08.2012
Former [2013/09]AT25.04.2012
BE25.04.2012
CY25.04.2012
DK25.04.2012
EE25.04.2012
FI25.04.2012
NL25.04.2012
SE25.04.2012
GR26.07.2012
PT27.08.2012
Former [2013/08]AT25.04.2012
BE25.04.2012
CY25.04.2012
DK25.04.2012
FI25.04.2012
NL25.04.2012
SE25.04.2012
GR26.07.2012
PT27.08.2012
Former [2013/07]AT25.04.2012
BE25.04.2012
CY25.04.2012
FI25.04.2012
SE25.04.2012
GR26.07.2012
PT27.08.2012
Former [2013/04]BE25.04.2012
CY25.04.2012
FI25.04.2012
SE25.04.2012
GR26.07.2012
PT27.08.2012
Former [2013/01]CY25.04.2012
FI25.04.2012
SE25.04.2012
GR26.07.2012
PT27.08.2012
Former [2012/50]CY25.04.2012
FI25.04.2012
SE25.04.2012
GR26.07.2012
Former [2012/49]CY25.04.2012
FI25.04.2012
SE25.04.2012
Former [2012/48]FI25.04.2012
SE25.04.2012
Cited inInternational search[XDA]US6128526  (STADLER ROBERT [US], et al) [XD] 28-49,54,61-65 * abstract * * column 4, line 23 - column 7, line 15 * * column 28, line 47 - column 29, line 15 * [A] 50-53,55;
 [XA]WO9724981  (BIOSENSE ISRAEL LTD [IL], et al) [X] 28,29,50-53,55,61,62,64 * abstract * * page 13, line 2 - line 29 * * page 15, lines 8-18 * * page 30, line 6 - line 10 * * page 32, line 13 - page 33, line 4 * * page 33, line 28 - page 34, line 2 * [A] 30-49,54,63,65;
 [A]WO9926693  (PACESETTER AB [SE], et al) [A] 28-55,61-65 * page 1, line 38 - page 2, line 10 * * page 3, line 19 - page 6, line 6 *;
 [A]US6171256  (JOO TAE H [US], et al) [A] 28-55,61-65 * column 3, line 28 - column 4, line 10 * * column 11, line 44 - line 58 *
by applicantUS6016443
 US6021350
 US6128526
 US6010477
 US6077277