Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1418894

EP1418894 - TRANSDERMAL THERAPEUTIC SYSTEM WITH FENTANYL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2004/21]TRANSDERMAL THERAPEUTIC SYSTEM WITH FENTANYL OR RELATED SUBSTANCES
[2006/36]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  16.08.2013
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2013Revocation of patentpublished on 18.09.2013  [2013/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LTS LOHMANN Therapie-Systeme AG
Lohmannstrasse 2
56626 Andernach / DE
[2007/04]
Former [2004/21]For all designated states
LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG
Lohmannstrasse 2
56626 Andernach / DE
Inventor(s)01 / MÜLLER, Walter
Hindenburgwall 12
56626 Andernach / DE
02 / HILLE, Thomas
Am Moogsberg 2 A
56567 Neuwied / DE
 [2004/21]
Representative(s)Isenbruck, Günter
Patentanwälte
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB
Eastsite One
Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4
68163 Mannheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2006/34]Isenbruck, Günter
Isenbruck, Bösl, Hörschler, Wichmann, Huhn Patentanwälte Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12
68165 Mannheim / DE
Former [2004/21]Schmidt, Werner
LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG Patentabteilung Postfach 15 25
56605 Andernach / DE
Application number, filing date02762336.210.07.2002
[2004/21]
WO2002EP07664
Priority number, dateDE2001104165024.08.2001         Original published format: DE 10141650
[2004/21]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO03018075
Date:06.03.2003
Language:DE
[2003/10]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1418894
Date:19.05.2004
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2003
[2004/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1418894
Date:24.01.2007
Language:DE
[2007/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.11.2003
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/70, A61K31/4468
[2004/21]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2004/21]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:TRANSDERMALES THERAPEUTISCHES SYSTEM MIT FENTANYL[2006/36]
English:TRANSDERMAL THERAPEUTIC SYSTEM WITH FENTANYL[2006/36]
French:SYSTEME THERAPEUTIQUE TRANSDERMIQUE CONTENANT DU FENTANYLE[2006/36]
Former [2004/21]TRANSDERMALES THERAPEUTISCHES SYSTEM MIT FENTANYL BZW. VERWANDTEN SUBSTANZEN
Former [2004/21]TRANSDERMAL THERAPEUTIC SYSTEM WITH FENTANYL OR RELATED SUBSTANCES
Former [2004/21]SYSTEME THERAPEUTIQUE TRANSDERMIQUE CONTENANT DU FENTANYLE ET DES SUBSTANCES APPARENTEES
Entry into regional phase06.03.2004National basic fee paid 
06.03.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
06.03.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.02.2003Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
06.03.2004Examination requested  [2004/21]
23.12.2004Observations by third parties
23.02.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.09.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.01.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.05.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.08.2006Date of oral proceedings
16.10.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.10.2006Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
11.12.2006Fee for grant paid
11.12.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP07001087.1  / EP1825849
EP07001088.9  / EP1782799
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  20.03.2007  27.03.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Ratiopharm GmbH
89070 Ulm / DE
Opponent's representative
Kalhammer, Georg, et al
Lederer & Keller
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
 02  16.10.2007  29.10.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Actavis Group hf
Dalshraun 1
220 Hafnarfjodur / IS
Opponent's representative
Alt, Michael, et al
Bird & Bird LLP
Maximiliansplatz 22
80333 München / DE
 03  19.10.2007  29.10.2007  ADMISSIBLE
STADA Arzneimittel AG
Stadastrasse 2-18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Hamm, Volker, et al
Maiwald Patentanwalts- und
Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 04  23.10.2007  05.11.2007  ADMISSIBLE
PLIVA HRVATSKA d.o.o.
Ulica grada Vukovara 49
10000 Zagreb / HR
Opponent's representative
Bor, Fiona Rachel, et al
Teva Europe Patent Department
First Floor
167 Fleet Street
London
EC4A 2EA / GB
 05  24.10.2007  05.11.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Elend, Almut Susanne
Venner Shipley LLP
Byron House
Cambridge Business Park
Cowley Road
Cambridge CB4 0WZ / GB
Opponent's representative
Elend, Almut Susanne, et al
Venner Shipley LLP
Byron House
Cambridge Business Park
Cowley Road
Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB4 0WZ / GB
 06  24.10.2007  05.11.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Acino AG
Carl-Feichtner-Ring 1
83714 Miesbach / DE
Opponent's representative
Forstmeyer, Dietmar, et al
BOETERS & LIECK
Oberanger 32
80331 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2010/27]
Opponent(s)01  20.03.2007  27.03.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Ratiopharm GmbH
89070 Ulm / DE
Opponent's representative
Kalhammer, Georg, et al
Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16
80538 München / DE
 02  16.10.2007  29.10.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Actavis Group hf
Dalshraun 1
220 Hafnarfjodur / IS
Opponent's representative
Alt, Michael, et al
Bird & Bird Pacellistrasse 14
80333 München / DE
 03  19.10.2007  29.10.2007  ADMISSIBLE
STADA Arzneimittel AG
Stadastrasse 2-18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Hamm, Volker, et al
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 04  23.10.2007  05.11.2007  ADMISSIBLE
PLIVA HRVATSKA d.o.o.
Ulica grada Vukovara 49
10000 Zagreb / HR
Opponent's representative
Bor, Fiona Rachel, et al
Teva Europe Patent Department First Floor 167 Fleet Street London
EC4A 2EA / GB
 05  24.10.2007  05.11.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Elend, Almut Susanne
Venner Shipley LLP Byron House Cambridge Business Park Cowley Road
Cambridge CB4 0WZ / GB
Opponent's representative
Elend, Almut Susanne, et al
Venner Shipley LLP Byron House Cambridge Business Park Cowley Road
Cambridge CB4 0WZ / GB
 06  24.10.2007  05.11.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Acino AG
Carl-Feichtner-Ring 1
83714 Miesbach / DE
Opponent's representative
Forstmeyer, Dietmar, et al
BOETERS & LIECK Oberanger 32
80331 München / DE
Former [2009/29]
Opponent(s)01  20.03.2007  27.03.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Ratiopharm GmbH
89070 Ulm / DE
Opponent's representative
Kalhammer, Georg, et al
Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16
80538 München / DE
 02  16.10.2007  29.10.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Actavis Group hf
Dalshraun 1
220 Hafnarfjodur / IS
Opponent's representative
Alt, Michael, et al
Bird & Bird Pacellistrasse 14
80333 München / DE
 03  19.10.2007  29.10.2007  ADMISSIBLE
STADA Arzneimittel AG
Stadastrasse 2-18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Hamm, Volker, et al
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 04  23.10.2007  05.11.2007  ADMISSIBLE
PLIVA HRVATSKA d.o.o.
Ulica grada Vukovara 49
10000 Zagreb / HR
Opponent's representative
Bor, Fiona Rachel, et al
Teva Europe Patent Department First Floor 167 Fleet Street London
EC4A 2EA / GB
 05  24.10.2007  05.11.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Elend, Almut Susanne
Venner Shipley LLP Byron House Cambridge Business Park Cowley Road
Cambridge CB4 0WZ / GB
Opponent's representative
Elend, Almut Susanne, et al
Venner Shipley LLP Byron House Cambridge Business Park Cowley Road
Cambridge CB4 0WZ / GB
 06  24.10.2007  05.11.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Novosis AG
Carl-Feichtner-Ring 1
83714 Miesbach / DE
Opponent's representative
Forstmeyer, Dietmar, et al
BOETERS & LIECK Oberanger 32
80331 München / DE
Former [2008/35]
Opponent(s)01  20.03.2007  27.03.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Ratiopharm GmbH
89070 Ulm / DE
Opponent's representative
Kalhammer, Georg, et al
Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16
80538 München / DE
 02  16.10.2007  29.10.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Actavis Group hf
Dalshraun 1
220 Hafnarfjodur / IS
Opponent's representative
Alt, Michael, et al
Bird & Bird Pacellistrasse 14
80333 München / DE
 03  19.10.2007  29.10.2007  ADMISSIBLE
STADA Arzneimittel AG
Stadastrasse 2-18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Hamm, Volker, et al
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 04  23.10.2007  05.11.2007  ADMISSIBLE
PLIVA HRVATSKA d.o.o.
Ulica grada Vukovara 49
10000 Zagreb / HR
Opponent's representative
Pramberger, Karin, et al
Pliva London Limited Vision House Bedford Road
GB-Petersfield, Hampshire GU32 3QB / GB
 05  24.10.2007  05.11.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Elend, Almut Susanne
Venner Shipley LLP Byron House Cambridge Business Park Cowley Road
Cambridge CB4 0WZ / GB
Opponent's representative
Elend, Almut Susanne, et al
Venner Shipley LLP Byron House Cambridge Business Park Cowley Road
Cambridge CB4 0WZ / GB
 06  24.10.2007  05.11.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Novosis AG
Carl-Feichtner-Ring 1
83714 Miesbach / DE
Opponent's representative
Forstmeyer, Dietmar, et al
BOETERS & LIECK Oberanger 32
80331 München / DE
Former [2007/48]
Opponent(s)01  20.03.2007  27.03.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Ratiopharm GmbH
89070 Ulm / DE
Opponent's representative
Kalhammer, Georg, et al
Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16
80538 München / DE
 02  16.10.2007   
Actavis Group hf
Dalshraun 1
220 Hafnarfjodur / IS
Opponent's representative
Alt, Michael, et al
Bird & Bird Pacellistrasse 14
80333 München / DE
 03  19.10.2007   
STADA Arzneimittel AG
Stadastrasse 2-18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Hamm, Volker, et al
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 04  23.10.2007   
PLIVA HRVATSKA d.o.o.
Ulica grada Vukovara 49
10000 Zagreb / HR
Opponent's representative
Pramberger, Karin, et al
Pliva London Limited Vision House Bedford Road
GB-Petersfield, Hampshire GU32 3QB / GB
 05  24.10.2007   
Elend, Almut Susanne
Venner Shipley LLP Byron House Cambridge Business Park Cowley Road
Cambridge CB4 0WZ / GB
Opponent's representative
Elend, Almut Susanne, et al
Venner Shipley LLP Byron House Cambridge Business Park Cowley Road
Cambridge CB4 0WZ / GB
 06  24.10.2007   
Novosis AG
Carl-Feichtner-Ring 1
83714 Miesbach / DE
Opponent's representative
Forstmeyer, Dietmar, et al
BOETERS & LIECK Oberanger 32
80331 München / DE
Former [2007/47]
Opponent(s)01  20.03.2007  27.03.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Ratiopharm GmbH
89070 Ulm / DE
Opponent's representative
Kalhammer, Georg, et al
Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16
80538 München / DE
 02  16.10.2007   
Actavis Group hf
Dalshraun 1
220 Hafnarfjodur / IS
Opponent's representative
Alt, Michael, et al
Bird & Bird Pacellistrasse 14
80333 München / DE
Former [2007/17]
Opponent(s)01  20.03.2007   
Ratiopharm GmbH
89070 Ulm / DE
Opponent's representative
Kalhammer, Georg, et al
Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16
80538 München / DE
29.11.2007Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
09.05.2008Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
16.06.2009Date of oral proceedings
10.07.2009Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
10.07.2009Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
04.03.2011Legal effect of revocation of patent [2013/38]
Appeal following opposition16.09.2009Appeal received No.  T1857/09
20.11.2009Statement of grounds filed
04.03.2011Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
04.03.2011Date of oral proceedings
29.03.2011Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
14.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
13.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XPY]WO0224157  (NAT STARCH CHEM INVEST [US]) [XP] 1,2,7 * claims 1,12,13 * * page 4, line 19 - page 5, line 3 * * page 5, line 17 - line 24 * * page 6, line 3 - line 6 * * page 7, line 8 - line 11 * * page 14, line 13 - line 19 * * page 16, line 18 - line 26 * [Y] 1-9;
 [Y]US6210705  (MANTELLE JUAN [US], et al) [Y] 1-9 * claim 11 *;
 [Y]JPH02255611
 [Y]  - ROY S D ET AL, "CONTROLLED TRANSDERMAL DELIVERY OF FENTANYL: CHARACTERIZATIONS OF PRESSURE-SENSITIVE ADHESIVES FOR MATRIX PATCH DESIGN", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, AMERICAN PHARMACEUTICAL ASSOCIATION. WASHINGTON, US, (19960501), vol. 85, no. 5, ISSN 0022-3549, pages 491 - 495, XP000583527 [Y] 1-9 * abstract * * page 493, column 1, line 4 - line 5 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/js950415w
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910107), vol. 015, no. 001, Database accession no. (C - 0793), & JP02255611 A 19901016 (NITTO DENKO CORP) [Y] 1-9 * abstract *
otherWO02074286