Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1418894 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1418894



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 3290
14.01.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
09.08.2013 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 2
10.07.2012 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
10.05.2011 F3033.1 Forwarding decision correcting errors to the parties Appeal 10
29.04.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.04.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.04.2011 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
21.04.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.04.2011 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
19.04.2011 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
18.04.2011 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
18.04.2011 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
18.04.2011 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
18.04.2011 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
18.04.2011 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
18.04.2011 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
16.04.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.04.2011 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 28
29.03.2011 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 16
02.03.2011 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
25.02.2011 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 2
10.02.2011 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 7
18.01.2011 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 5
11.01.2011 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
04.12.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
19.11.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
18.11.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.11.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
17.11.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
17.11.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
16.11.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
16.11.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
15.11.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
15.11.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
15.11.2010 Fax filed during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
12.11.2010 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 7
08.11.2010 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
08.11.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
04.11.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 6
04.11.2010 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
04.11.2010 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 3
03.11.2010 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 9
28.10.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
28.10.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
19.10.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
18.10.2010 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
15.10.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
15.10.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
14.10.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
14.10.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
14.10.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
14.10.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
14.10.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
14.10.2010 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 2
13.10.2010 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
12.10.2010 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 14
06.10.2010 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
05.10.2010 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
16.08.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 6
30.07.2010 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
29.06.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 6
07.06.2010 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 24
07.06.2010 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
07.06.2010 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
07.06.2010 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
07.06.2010 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 24
04.06.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 6
28.05.2010 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 18
27.05.2010 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 18
15.04.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 6
13.04.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
13.04.2010 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 12
12.04.2010 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 7
12.04.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 6
12.04.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 6
12.04.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 6
07.04.2010 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 13
01.04.2010 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 38
01.04.2010 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 38
01.04.2010 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
31.03.2010 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 7
31.03.2010 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 13
31.03.2010 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 38
31.03.2010 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 16
31.03.2010 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
30.03.2010 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 13
29.03.2010 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Appeal 4
29.03.2010 Request for change of name -opponent Appeal 1
26.03.2010 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
25.03.2010 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
09.12.2009 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
27.11.2009 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 6
20.11.2009 Claims Appeal 2
20.11.2009 Claims Appeal 2
20.11.2009 Claims Appeal 3
20.11.2009 Claims Appeal 2
20.11.2009 Claims Appeal 2
20.11.2009 Claims Appeal 2
20.11.2009 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
20.11.2009 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 16
14.10.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
13.10.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.09.2009 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 7
17.09.2009 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
16.09.2009 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
02.09.2009 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.08.2009 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
11.08.2009 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.07.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
16.07.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.07.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
15.07.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
15.07.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
15.07.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.07.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.07.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
14.07.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
14.07.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.07.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.07.2009 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
10.07.2009 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 30
10.07.2009 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 2
10.07.2009 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 12
01.07.2009 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
23.06.2009 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
18.06.2009 Authorisation of representative Opposition 2
18.06.2009 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
16.06.2009 Claims Opposition 2
16.06.2009 Claims Opposition 2
16.06.2009 Claims Opposition 2
16.06.2009 Claims Opposition 2
16.06.2009 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.06.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.06.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.06.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.06.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.06.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.06.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.06.2009 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Opposition 1
12.06.2009 Communication of amended entries Opposition 1
28.05.2009 Authorisation of representative Opposition 2
28.05.2009 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
26.05.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.05.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.05.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.05.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.05.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.05.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.05.2009 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
18.05.2009 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
14.05.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.05.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.05.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.05.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.05.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.05.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.05.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.05.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.05.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.05.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.05.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.05.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.05.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.05.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.05.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.05.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.05.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.05.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.05.2009 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.05.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.05.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.05.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.05.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.05.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.05.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.05.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.05.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.05.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.05.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.05.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.05.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.05.2009 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.05.2009 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.05.2009 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.05.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.05.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.05.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.05.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.05.2009 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.05.2009 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.05.2009 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.04.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.04.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.04.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.04.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.04.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.04.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.04.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.04.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.04.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.04.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.04.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.04.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.04.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.04.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.04.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.04.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.04.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.04.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.04.2009 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 5
16.04.2009 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 4
16.04.2009 Claims Opposition 2
16.04.2009 Claims Opposition 2
16.04.2009 Claims Opposition 2
16.04.2009 Claims Opposition 2
16.04.2009 Claims Opposition 2
16.04.2009 Claims Opposition 2
16.04.2009 Claims Opposition 2
16.04.2009 Claims Opposition 2
16.04.2009 Claims Opposition 2
16.04.2009 Claims Opposition 2
16.04.2009 Claims Opposition 2
16.04.2009 Claims Opposition 2
16.04.2009 Claims Opposition 2
16.04.2009 Claims Opposition 2
16.04.2009 Claims Opposition 2
16.04.2009 Claims Opposition 2
16.04.2009 Claims Opposition 2
16.04.2009 Claims Opposition 2
16.04.2009 Claims Opposition 2
16.04.2009 Claims Opposition 2
16.04.2009 Claims Opposition 2
16.04.2009 Claims Opposition 2
16.04.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
16.04.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 31
16.04.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
16.04.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
16.04.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
16.04.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
16.04.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
16.04.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
16.04.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
16.04.2009 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 20
16.04.2009 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
15.04.2009 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 4
15.04.2009 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
15.04.2009 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
15.04.2009 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 4
15.04.2009 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
15.04.2009 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 6
15.04.2009 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
15.04.2009 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 34
15.04.2009 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 4
15.04.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
15.04.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 31
15.04.2009 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 17
17.12.2008 Document concerning representation Opposition 2
03.11.2008 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
31.10.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.10.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.10.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.10.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.10.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.10.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.10.2008 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
25.10.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.10.2008 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
24.10.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.10.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.10.2008 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
23.10.2008 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.10.2008 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
22.10.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.10.2008 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
21.10.2008 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
21.10.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.10.2008 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.10.2008 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
17.10.2008 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.10.2008 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.10.2008 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.10.2008 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.10.2008 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.10.2008 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.10.2008 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.10.2008 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
14.10.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.10.2008 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.10.2008 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.10.2008 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.10.2008 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.10.2008 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.10.2008 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.10.2008 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.10.2008 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
13.10.2008 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
13.10.2008 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
13.10.2008 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
11.10.2008 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
11.10.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.10.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.10.2008 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
10.10.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.10.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.10.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.10.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.10.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.10.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.10.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.10.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.10.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.10.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.10.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.10.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.10.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.10.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.10.2008 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
08.10.2008 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Opposition 2
07.10.2008 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
07.10.2008 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
07.10.2008 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
07.10.2008 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Opposition 2
07.10.2008 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.10.2008 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.10.2008 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.10.2008 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.10.2008 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.10.2008 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.10.2008 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.10.2008 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
06.10.2008 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
06.10.2008 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Opposition 2
06.10.2008 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Opposition 2
02.10.2008 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.10.2008 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.10.2008 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.10.2008 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.10.2008 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.10.2008 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.10.2008 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
29.09.2008 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
26.09.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.09.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.09.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.09.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.09.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.09.2008 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
22.09.2008 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Opposition 4
18.09.2008 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.09.2008 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.09.2008 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.09.2008 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.09.2008 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.09.2008 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.09.2008 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.09.2008 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 1
17.09.2008 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 3
27.08.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.08.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.08.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.08.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.08.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.08.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.08.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.08.2008 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
21.08.2008 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
20.08.2008 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
20.08.2008 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
20.08.2008 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Opposition 2
18.08.2008 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
18.08.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.08.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.08.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.08.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.08.2008 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
14.08.2008 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
14.08.2008 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
14.08.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.08.2008 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
12.08.2008 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 20
12.08.2008 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
12.08.2008 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.08.2008 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.08.2008 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.08.2008 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.08.2008 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.08.2008 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.08.2008 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.08.2008 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
03.07.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.07.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.07.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.07.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.07.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.07.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.06.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.06.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.06.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.06.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.06.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.06.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.06.2008 Request for acceleration of the opposition procedure Opposition 8
24.06.2008 Request for acceleration of the opposition procedure Opposition 8
21.05.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.05.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.05.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.05.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.05.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.05.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.05.2008 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
09.05.2008 Citation for the examination procedure Opposition 4
09.05.2008 Citation for the examination procedure Opposition 4
09.05.2008 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 5
09.05.2008 Claims Opposition 3
09.05.2008 Claims Opposition 2
09.05.2008 Claims Opposition 2
09.05.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
09.05.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
09.05.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
09.05.2008 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 32
17.04.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.04.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.04.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.04.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.04.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.04.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.04.2008 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
09.04.2008 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
29.11.2007 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
29.11.2007 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
29.11.2007 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
29.11.2007 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
29.11.2007 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
29.11.2007 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
29.11.2007 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
19.11.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.11.2007 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 21
13.11.2007 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 7
13.11.2007 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) Opposition 1
08.11.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.11.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.11.2007 Brief communication with time limit Opposition 1
31.10.2007 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 4
31.10.2007 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
31.10.2007 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 3
31.10.2007 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
31.10.2007 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
31.10.2007 Notice of opposition Opposition 60
31.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 33
31.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 56
31.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 51
31.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 27
31.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
31.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
31.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 61
31.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 49
30.10.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.10.2007 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
30.10.2007 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
26.10.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.10.2007 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
25.10.2007 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
24.10.2007 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
24.10.2007 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 4
24.10.2007 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 9
24.10.2007 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 8
24.10.2007 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 10
24.10.2007 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 9
24.10.2007 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
24.10.2007 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 3
24.10.2007 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
24.10.2007 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 9
24.10.2007 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 11
24.10.2007 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 3
24.10.2007 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
24.10.2007 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
24.10.2007 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 7
24.10.2007 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
24.10.2007 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
24.10.2007 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
24.10.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
24.10.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
24.10.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
24.10.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
24.10.2007 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
24.10.2007 Notice of opposition Opposition 60
24.10.2007 Notice of opposition Opposition 29
24.10.2007 Notice of opposition Opposition 9
24.10.2007 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
24.10.2007 Notice of opposition Opposition 1
24.10.2007 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
24.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 52
24.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
24.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 34
24.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 51
24.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
24.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
24.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 33
24.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
24.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
24.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
24.10.2007 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
23.10.2007 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
23.10.2007 Notice of opposition Opposition 1
23.10.2007 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
23.10.2007 Notice of opposition Opposition 9
23.10.2007 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
22.10.2007 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
22.10.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
22.10.2007 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
22.10.2007 Notice of opposition Opposition 10
22.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
19.10.2007 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
19.10.2007 Notice of opposition Opposition 10
19.10.2007 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
16.10.2007 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
16.10.2007 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
16.10.2007 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 11
16.10.2007 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 9
16.10.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
16.10.2007 Notice of opposition Opposition 23
16.10.2007 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
16.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
16.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 35
16.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
16.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 56
16.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
16.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 25
16.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 23
16.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
16.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
16.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 33
16.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 56
16.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
16.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
27.03.2007 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
20.03.2007 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
20.03.2007 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 9
20.03.2007 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
20.03.2007 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 5
20.03.2007 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 11
20.03.2007 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
20.03.2007 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 17
20.03.2007 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
20.03.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
20.03.2007 Notice of opposition Opposition 17
20.03.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
20.03.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
20.03.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 31
20.03.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
20.03.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
20.03.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 33
20.03.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
20.03.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 52
20.03.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
20.03.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
02.01.2007 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
11.12.2006 English translation of the claims Search / examination 3
11.12.2006 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
11.12.2006 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
16.10.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
16.10.2006 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
16.10.2006 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
16.10.2006 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
16.10.2006 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
16.10.2006 Text intended for grant Search / examination 14
24.08.2006 Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order Search / examination 1
12.08.2006 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 1
04.08.2006 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
02.08.2006 Claims Search / examination 3
02.08.2006 Claims Search / examination 2
02.08.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 3
31.07.2006 Claims Search / examination 3
31.07.2006 Claims Search / examination 2
31.07.2006 Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the EP procedure Search / examination 3
21.07.2006 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Search / examination 2
21.07.2006 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
15.07.2006 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
15.07.2006 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
13.07.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
13.07.2006 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
12.07.2006 Request for change of representative Search / examination 1
12.07.2006 Request for change of representative Search / examination 1
10.07.2006 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
10.07.2006 Request for change of representative Search / examination 1
24.05.2006 Claims Search / examination 3
24.05.2006 Description Search / examination 2
24.05.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
16.01.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
16.01.2006 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
07.09.2005 Claims Search / examination 4
07.09.2005 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
07.09.2005 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 85
07.09.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
05.09.2005 Claims Search / examination 4
05.09.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
12.07.2005 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
06.07.2005 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
04.07.2005 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.02.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
23.02.2005 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
17.01.2005 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
10.01.2005 Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations Search / examination 1
10.01.2005 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 1
30.12.2004 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
30.12.2004 Observations by third parties Search / examination 6
30.12.2004 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 56
23.12.2004 Observations by third parties Search / examination 8
04.08.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 6
10.06.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 15
09.06.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 15
21.04.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 15
07.04.2004 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
01.04.2004 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
30.03.2004 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
30.03.2004 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
06.03.2004 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
09.01.2004 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
05.01.2004 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
05.01.2004 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 6
10.12.2003 Annex to International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
10.12.2003 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
10.12.2003 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
10.12.2003 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
10.12.2003 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
10.12.2003 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
10.12.2003 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
10.12.2003 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
10.12.2003 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
26.11.2003 Reminder for payment period (examination fee/designation fees) Search / examination 1
25.11.2003 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
20.11.2003 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 6
20.11.2003 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 1
06.11.2003 Request for extension of time limit PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
03.11.2003 Request for extension of time limit PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
06.08.2003 Written opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
06.08.2003 Written opinion - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
06.08.2003 Written opinion - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
15.05.2003 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
15.05.2003 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
08.05.2003 Request for extension of time limit PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
10.03.2003 Written opinion - Automated PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
06.03.2003 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 14
21.02.2003 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
21.02.2003 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
11.02.2003 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
04.09.2002 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
04.09.2002 Claims International Searching Authority 2
04.09.2002 Description International Searching Authority 11
10.07.2002 General authorisation Search / examination 1