blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1428359

EP1428359 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING TWO-WAY COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK TRANSMISSIONS OVER INTERNET PROTOCOL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.01.2010
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip22.01.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 24.02.2010  [2010/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mobile Tornado International Ltd.
Thomas Street
Dublin 8 / IE
[2006/10]
Former [2004/25]For all designated states
Tersync Ltd.
6 Galgalei Haplada Street
Herzlia 46722 / IL
Inventor(s)01 / FISHLER, Eyal
9 Dov Gruner Street
69498 Tel Aviv / IL
 [2004/25]
Representative(s)Rapp, Bertram, et al
Charrier Rapp & Liebau
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Fuggerstrasse 20
86150 Augsburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/25]Rapp, Bertram, Dr., et al
Charrier Rapp & Liebau Patentanwälte Postfach 31 02 60
86063 Augsburg / DE
Application number, filing date02762740.522.08.2002
[2004/25]
WO2002IL00700
Priority number, dateWO2001IL0084606.09.2001         Original published format: PCT/IL01/00846
[2004/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO03021372
Date:13.03.2003
Language:EN
[2003/11]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1428359
Date:16.06.2004
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2004/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US25.09.2003
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.05.2009
ClassificationIPC:H04W76/02, H04L12/58
[2009/25]
CPC:
H04L1/1671 (EP,US); H04W92/02 (KR); H04L61/4552 (EP,US);
H04L9/40 (US); H04W76/12 (EP,US); H04W80/04 (KR);
H04W28/18 (EP,US); H04W80/00 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2004/25]H04L12/56
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2004/25]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG ZWEISEITIGER KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZÜBERTRAGUNGEN ÜBER DAS INTERNET-PROTOKOLL[2004/25]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING TWO-WAY COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK TRANSMISSIONS OVER INTERNET PROTOCOL[2004/25]
French:SYSTEME ET PROCEDE POUR METTRE EN OEUVRE LES TRANSMISSIONS EN RESEAU DE COMMUNICATIONS DUPLEX UTILISANT LE PROTOCOLE INTERNET[2004/25]
Entry into regional phase06.04.2004National basic fee paid 
06.04.2004Search fee paid 
06.04.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
06.04.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.04.2003Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
06.04.2004Examination requested  [2004/25]
11.11.2005Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.08.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/08]
02.10.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2010/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
25.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
24.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
28.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
25.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
25.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]EP1071295  (PHONE COM INC [US]) [X] 1-36 * abstract * * paragraphs [0040] - [0043] * * paragraphs [0048] - [0052] * * paragraphs [0094] - [0099] * * figure 1A *;
 [A]EP1104964  (SONY INT EUROPE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-36 * abstract * * column 1, line 1 - column 3, line 29 * * column 9, line 16 - column 11, line 14 *;
 [A]WO0156308  (INVERTIX CORP [US]) [A] 1-36 * the whole document *;
 [A]  - IETF - NETWORK WORKING GROUP: M. DAY, J. ROENBERG, H. SUGANO, "Request for Comments (RFC) 2778: A model for Presence and Instant Messaging", THE INTERNET SOCIETY - IETF, (200002), pages 1 - 17, URL: http://www.ietf.org/rfc/rfc2778.txt, (20020606), XP002201444 [A] 1-36 * the whole document *
International search[A]US6115754  (LANDGREN PATRICIA A [US]);
 [A]US6275575  (WU PHILIP L [US])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.