Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1441841

EP1441841 - METHOD FOR CLEANING A HIGH SOLIDS MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2004/32]HIGH SOLIDS MODULE
[2007/04]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.06.2008
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip18.02.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 23.03.2011  [2011/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Siemens Water Technologies Corp.
181 Thorn Hill Road
Warrendale, PA 15086 / US
[2007/10]
Former [2004/32]For all designated states
US Filter Wastewater Group, Inc.
181 Thorn Hill Road
Warrendale, PA 15086 / US
Inventor(s)01 / JOHNSON, Thomas, Warren
125 Grose Vale Road
Grose Vale, NSW 2753 / AU
02 / BECK, Thomas, William
121 Keda Circuit
North Richmond, NSW 2756 / AU
 [2004/32]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/32]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date02764383.217.09.2002
[2004/32]
WO2002AU01272
Priority number, dateAU2001PR0774218.09.2001         Original published format: AU PR774201
[2004/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO03024575
Date:27.03.2003
Language:EN
[2003/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1441841
Date:04.08.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.2003
[2004/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1441841
Date:01.08.2007
Language:EN
[2007/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU27.03.2003
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.08.2005
ClassificationInternational:B01D65/02
[2004/32]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2004/32]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM REINIGEN EINES MODULS MIT HOHEM FESTSTOFFGEHALT[2007/04]
English:METHOD FOR CLEANING A HIGH SOLIDS MODULE[2007/04]
French:METHODE DE NETTOYAGE D'UN MODULE A CONCENTRATION ELEVEE DE SOLIDES[2007/04]
Former [2004/32]MODUL MIT HOHEM FESTSTOFFGEHALT
Former [2004/32]HIGH SOLIDS MODULE
Former [2004/32]MODULE A CONCENTRATION ELEVEE DE SOLIDES
Entry into regional phase16.04.2004National basic fee paid 
16.04.2004Search fee paid 
16.04.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
16.04.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.04.2003Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU
16.04.2004Examination requested  [2004/32]
15.02.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.06.2007Fee for grant paid
08.06.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.05.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
14.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
18.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT01.08.2007
CH01.08.2007
CY01.08.2007
CZ01.08.2007
DK01.08.2007
EE01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
LI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
SK01.08.2007
TR01.08.2007
LU17.09.2007
IT30.09.2007
MC30.09.2007
BG01.11.2007
SE01.11.2007
GR02.11.2007
ES12.11.2007
PT02.01.2008
[2011/12]
Former [2009/42]AT01.08.2007
CH01.08.2007
CY01.08.2007
CZ01.08.2007
DK01.08.2007
EE01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
LI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
SK01.08.2007
TR01.08.2007
LU17.09.2007
MC30.09.2007
BG01.11.2007
SE01.11.2007
GR02.11.2007
ES12.11.2007
PT02.01.2008
Former [2009/38]AT01.08.2007
CH01.08.2007
CY01.08.2007
CZ01.08.2007
DK01.08.2007
EE01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
LI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
SK01.08.2007
LU17.09.2007
MC30.09.2007
BG01.11.2007
SE01.11.2007
GR02.11.2007
ES12.11.2007
PT02.01.2008
Former [2009/34]AT01.08.2007
CH01.08.2007
CY01.08.2007
CZ01.08.2007
DK01.08.2007
EE01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
LI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
SK01.08.2007
MC30.09.2007
BG01.11.2007
SE01.11.2007
GR02.11.2007
ES12.11.2007
PT02.01.2008
Former [2009/10]AT01.08.2007
CH01.08.2007
CZ01.08.2007
DK01.08.2007
EE01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
LI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
SK01.08.2007
MC30.09.2007
BG01.11.2007
SE01.11.2007
GR02.11.2007
ES12.11.2007
PT02.01.2008
Former [2008/28]AT01.08.2007
CH01.08.2007
CZ01.08.2007
DK01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
LI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
SK01.08.2007
MC30.09.2007
BG01.11.2007
SE01.11.2007
GR02.11.2007
ES12.11.2007
PT02.01.2008
Former [2008/25]AT01.08.2007
CH01.08.2007
CZ01.08.2007
DK01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
LI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
SK01.08.2007
MC30.09.2007
BG01.11.2007
GR02.11.2007
ES12.11.2007
PT02.01.2008
Former [2008/22]AT01.08.2007
CH01.08.2007
DK01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
LI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
MC30.09.2007
BG01.11.2007
GR02.11.2007
ES12.11.2007
Former [2008/13]AT01.08.2007
CH01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
LI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
BG01.11.2007
ES12.11.2007
Former [2008/10]FI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
BG01.11.2007
ES12.11.2007
Former [2008/09]NL01.08.2007
BG01.11.2007
ES12.11.2007
Former [2008/08]ES12.11.2007
Documents cited:Search[A]WO0030742  (ZENON ENVIRONMENTAL INC [CA], et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract *;
 [A]JPH0768139
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950731), vol. 1995, no. 06, & JP07068139 A 19950314 (NIPPON MEMTEC KK) [A] 1 * column A *
International search[A]WO0136075  (ZENON ENVIRONMENTAL INC [CA], et al);
 [A]WO9607470  (MEMTEC LTD [AU], et al);
 [A]WO9822204  (MEMTEC AMERICA CORP [US], et al)
ExaminationEP1180391