blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1430310

EP1430310 - STABLE RADIOCHROMIC DOSIMETRY FILM AND PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.03.2015
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip27.03.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 29.04.2015  [2015/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ISP INVESTMENTS INC.
300 Delaware Avenue, Suite 303 Wilmington
Delaware 19801 / US
[N/P]
Former [2004/26]For all designated states
ISP INVESTMENTS INC.
300 Delaware Avenue, Suite 303
Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SHIH, Hsiao-Yi
10 Windemere Court
Whippany, NJ 07981 / US
02 / LEWIS, David
54 Benedict Road
Monroe, CT 06468 / US
03 / ANYUMBA, Janette
93B Traphagen Road
Wayne, NJ 07470 / US
 [2004/26]
Representative(s)Harrison, Susan Joan, et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/26]Harrison, Susan Joan, et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP York House, 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date02766129.728.08.2002
[2004/26]
WO2002US27271
Priority number, dateUS20010315865P28.08.2001         Original published format: US 315865 P
[2004/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO03021276
Date:13.03.2003
Language:EN
[2003/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1430310
Date:23.06.2004
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2004/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US13.03.2003
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.08.2014
ClassificationIPC:G01N37/00
[2004/26]
CPC:
G01T1/06 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2004/26]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:STABILER RADIOCHROMER DOSIMETRIE-FILM UND VERFAHREN[2004/26]
English:STABLE RADIOCHROMIC DOSIMETRY FILM AND PROCESS[2004/26]
French:FILM DOSIMETRIQUE RADIOCHROMIQUE STABLE ET PROCEDE[2004/26]
Entry into regional phase22.03.2004National basic fee paid 
22.03.2004Search fee paid 
22.03.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
22.03.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.03.2003Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
22.03.2004Examination requested  [2004/26]
04.11.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/18]
09.12.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2015/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
29.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
03.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
26.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
31.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
23.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
28.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
17.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
08.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 11
27.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 12
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201413   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]US4314021  (O'BRIEN DAVID F, et al) [Y] 7-9 * column 7, line 64 - line 66 ** column 8, line 29 - line 38 *;
 [Y]US4734355  (LEWIS DAVID F [US], et al) [Y] 10-12,16 * column 1, line 37 - line 48 * * column 3, line 15 - line 35 *;
 [XY]US5420000  (PATEL GORDHANBHAI N [US], et al) [X] 1-9,13-15,17,18 * figure 1 * * table 3 * * column 10, line 4 - line 13 * * column 11, line 21 - column 12, line 39 * * column 13, line 3 - line 16 * * column 16, line 59 - column 17, line 24 * * column 18, line 15 - line 16 * * column 18, line 36 - line 49 * * column 19, line 64 - column 20, line 5 * * column 31, line 26 - line 38 * [Y] 7-12,16
International search[X]US5672465  (PATEL GORDHANBHAI N [US], et al);
 [X]US5420000  (PATEL GORDHANBHAI N [US], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.