Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1392744

EP1392744 - EMULSIFIER FREE AQUEOUS EMULSION POLYMERIZATION PROCESS FOR MAKING FLUOROPOLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.05.2009
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.09.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 02.11.2011  [2011/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
3M Innovative Properties Company
3M Center
P.O.Box 33427
St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/28]For all designated states
3M Innovative Properties Company
3M Center, P.O. Box 33427
St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
Former [2004/10]For all designated states
3M Innovative Properties Company
3M Center, P.O. Box 33427
St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KASPAR, Harald
Ablestrasse 21
84508 Hirten / DE
02 / HINTZER, Klaus
Lindenstrasse 16a
84556 Kastl / DE
03 / DEWITTE, Greta
Kloestraat 16
B-9120 Melsele / BE
04 / SCHWERTFEGER, Werner
Oberer Grasweg 16c
84503 Altoetting / DE
 [2004/10]
Representative(s)Kurz, Arnd , et al
3M ESPE AG
3M Office of Intellectual Property Counsel
ESPE Platz
82229 Seefeld / DE
[N/P]
Former [2006/52]Kurz, Arnd , et al
3M ESPE AG 3M Office of Intellectual Property Counsel ESPE Platz
82229 Seefeld / DE
Former [2004/10]Voortmans, Gilbert J.L.
3M Europe S.A., Hermeslaan 7
1831 Diegem / BE
Application number, filing date02766881.330.04.2002
[2004/10]
WO2002US13691
Priority number, dateUS20010288172P02.05.2001         Original published format: US 288172 P
[2004/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO02088207
Date:07.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1392744
Date:03.03.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.11.2002
[2004/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1392744
Date:09.07.2008
Language:EN
[2008/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.11.2002
ClassificationInternational:C08F214/18, C08F2/22, C08F214/22, C08F214/28
[2004/10]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2004/10]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:EMULGATORFREIES WÄSSRIGES EMULSIONSPOLYMERISATIONSVERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON FLUORPOLYMEREN[2004/10]
English:EMULSIFIER FREE AQUEOUS EMULSION POLYMERIZATION PROCESS FOR MAKING FLUOROPOLYMERS[2004/10]
French:PROCEDE DE POLYMERISATION PAR EMULSION AQUEUSE EXEMPTE D'EMULSIFIANT PERMETTANT DE PRODUIRE DES FLUOROPOLYMERES[2004/10]
Entry into regional phase06.11.2003National basic fee paid 
06.11.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
06.11.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.10.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
06.11.2003Examination requested  [2004/10]
31.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.10.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.08.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.12.2005Fee for grant paid
12.12.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.04.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
20.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
26.04.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
27.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT09.07.2008
BE09.07.2008
CY09.07.2008
DK09.07.2008
FI09.07.2008
TR09.07.2008
SE09.10.2008
GR10.10.2008
ES20.10.2008
PT09.12.2008
[2011/43]
Former [2010/48]AT09.07.2008
BE09.07.2008
DK09.07.2008
FI09.07.2008
SE09.10.2008
GR10.10.2008
ES20.10.2008
PT09.12.2008
Former [2010/09]AT09.07.2008
BE09.07.2008
DK09.07.2008
FI09.07.2008
SE09.10.2008
ES20.10.2008
PT09.12.2008
Former [2009/19]AT09.07.2008
BE09.07.2008
DK09.07.2008
FI09.07.2008
ES20.10.2008
PT09.12.2008
Former [2009/15]AT09.07.2008
FI09.07.2008
ES20.10.2008
PT09.12.2008
Former [2009/12]FI09.07.2008
ES20.10.2008
PT09.12.2008
Former [2009/09]ES20.10.2008
PT09.12.2008
Cited inInternational search[X]US3839305  (MOORE A) [X] 1,2,4-10,16 * column 4, line 12 - column 4, line 47; example 1 *;
 [A]US5260393  (ARCELLA VINCENZO [IT], et al) [A] 1,2,4-10 * column 3, line 44 - column 3, line 51; example 1 *;
 [A]US3069401  (GALLAGHER GEORGE A) [A] 1-16 * column 2, line 11 - column 2, line 15 *;
 [A]WO0047641  (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 * page 7, line 49 - page 7, line 58 *;
 EP1193275  [ ] (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]);
 [A]US3632847  (HARTWIMMER ROBERT) [A] 12-15 * examples 2,5 *