EP1416791 - AN ANIMAL MODEL EXHIBITING CANCER, PULMONARY EMPHYSEMA AND CARDIOMYOPATHY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: LI | published on 24.06.2015 [2015/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FrankGen Biotechnologie AG Wilhelm-Bonn-Strasse 8f 61476 Kronberg/Taunus / DE | [2004/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MELCHNER, Harald von Wilhelm-Bonn-Strasse 8F 61476 Kronbert/Taunus / DE | 02 /
THOREY, Irmgard Noderstrasse 3 81245 München / DE | 03 /
WEMPE, Frank Müllerweg 67 63165 Mühlheim am Main / DE | 04 /
STERNER-KOCK, Anja, Institut für Veterinärspatholo Robert-von-Ostertag-Str. 15 14163 Berlin / DE | 05 /
KESKI-OJA, Jorma Osuuskunnantie 45 FIN-00660 Helsinki / FI | [2004/37] |
Former [2004/20] | 01 /
MELCHNER, Harald von Wilhelm-Bonn-Strasse 8F 61476 Kronbert/Taunus / DE | ||
02 /
THOREY, Irmgard, S. Winterthurer Strasse 344 CH-8057 Zürich / CH | |||
03 /
WEMPE, Frank Müllerweg 67 63165 Mühlheim am Main / DE | |||
04 /
STERNER-KOCK, Anja An den Tannen 21 64546 Mörfelden-Walldorf / DE | |||
05 /
KESKI-OJA, Jorma Osuuskunnantie 45 FIN-00660 Helsinki / FI | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | Helbing, Jörg, et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler Selting Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2005/42] | Helbing, Jörg, et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler Selting Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2004/20] | Grund, Martin, Dr., et al Dr. Volker Vossius Patent- & Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Geibelstrasse 6 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02767366.4 | 12.08.2002 | [2004/20] | WO2002EP09011 | Priority number, date | US20010312164P | 14.08.2001 Original published format: US 312164 P | [2004/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03015505 | Date: | 27.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1416791 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1416791 | Date: | 24.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A01K67/027, C07K14/475, C07K14/495 | [2005/50] | CPC: |
A01K67/0275 (EP,US);
C07K14/78 (EP,US);
C12N15/8509 (EP,US);
A01K2217/05 (EP,US);
A01K2217/075 (EP,US);
A01K2227/105 (EP,US);
A01K2267/03 (EP,US);
A01K2267/0331 (EP,US);
A01K2267/0375 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/20] | A01K67/027 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TIERMODELL MIT KREBS, LUNGENEMPHYSEM UND KARDIOMYOPATHIE | [2004/20] | English: | AN ANIMAL MODEL EXHIBITING CANCER, PULMONARY EMPHYSEMA AND CARDIOMYOPATHY | [2004/20] | French: | MODELE ANIMAL PRESENTANT UN CANCER, UN EMPHYSEME PULMONAIRE ET UNE CARDIOMYOPATHIE | [2004/20] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/20] | 14.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.05.2006 | BE | 24.05.2006 | CY | 24.05.2006 | CZ | 24.05.2006 | EE | 24.05.2006 | FI | 24.05.2006 | NL | 24.05.2006 | SK | 24.05.2006 | TR | 24.05.2006 | LU | 12.08.2006 | IE | 14.08.2006 | BG | 24.08.2006 | DK | 24.08.2006 | GR | 25.08.2006 | MC | 31.08.2006 | ES | 04.09.2006 | PT | 24.10.2006 | [2015/26] |
Former [2009/03] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
BE | 24.05.2006 | ||
CY | 24.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 24.05.2006 | ||
EE | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
LI | 24.05.2006 | ||
NL | 24.05.2006 | ||
SK | 24.05.2006 | ||
TR | 24.05.2006 | ||
LU | 12.08.2006 | ||
IE | 14.08.2006 | ||
BG | 24.08.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
GR | 25.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/37] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
BE | 24.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 24.05.2006 | ||
EE | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
LI | 24.05.2006 | ||
NL | 24.05.2006 | ||
SK | 24.05.2006 | ||
TR | 24.05.2006 | ||
LU | 12.08.2006 | ||
IE | 14.08.2006 | ||
BG | 24.08.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
GR | 25.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/31] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
BE | 24.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 24.05.2006 | ||
EE | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
LI | 24.05.2006 | ||
NL | 24.05.2006 | ||
SK | 24.05.2006 | ||
IE | 14.08.2006 | ||
BG | 24.08.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
GR | 25.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
BE | 24.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 24.05.2006 | ||
EE | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
LI | 24.05.2006 | ||
NL | 24.05.2006 | ||
SK | 24.05.2006 | ||
IE | 14.08.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
GR | 25.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
BE | 24.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
LI | 24.05.2006 | ||
NL | 24.05.2006 | ||
SK | 24.05.2006 | ||
IE | 14.08.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
GR | 25.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
BE | 24.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
LI | 24.05.2006 | ||
NL | 24.05.2006 | ||
SK | 24.05.2006 | ||
IE | 14.08.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/42] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
BE | 24.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
IT | 24.05.2006 | ||
LI | 24.05.2006 | ||
NL | 24.05.2006 | ||
SK | 24.05.2006 | ||
IE | 14.08.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/39] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
BE | 24.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
IT | 24.05.2006 | ||
LI | 24.05.2006 | ||
NL | 24.05.2006 | ||
SK | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
BE | 24.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
LI | 24.05.2006 | ||
NL | 24.05.2006 | ||
SK | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
BE | 24.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
LI | 24.05.2006 | ||
SK | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
CH | 24.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
LI | 24.05.2006 | ||
SK | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
CH | 24.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
LI | 24.05.2006 | ||
SK | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
CH | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
LI | 24.05.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | ES | 04.09.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1092768 (ARTEMIS PHARMACEUTICALS GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-24* the whole document *; | [PX] - VON MELCHNER HARALD ET AL, "Disruption of the gene encoding the latent transforming growth factor beta binding protein 4 (LTBP4) causes severe pulmonary emphysema, cardiomyopathy and colorectal cancer.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH ANNUAL, 93rd Annual Meeting of the American Association for Cancer Research;San Francisco, California, USA; April 06-10, 2002, March, 2002, (200203), vol. 43, ISSN 0197-016X, page 342, XP001153301 [PX] 1-24 * abstract * | [Y] - SAHARINEN JUHA ET AL, "Identification and characterization of a new latent transforming growth factor-beta-binding protein, LTBP-4.", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (19980717), vol. 273, no. 29, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 18459 - 18469, XP002246446 [Y] 1-24 * figures 1,3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.273.29.18459 | [Y] - SHIPLEY J MICHAEL ET AL, "Developmental expression of latent transforming growth factor beta binding protein 2 and its requirement early in mouse development.", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOLOGY, (200007), vol. 20, no. 13, ISSN 0270-7306, pages 4879 - 4887, XP002246447 [Y] 1-24 * page 4880 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/MCB.20.13.4879-4887.2000 | [A] - OEKLUE R ET AL, "THE LATENT TRANSFORMING GROWTH FACTOR BETA BINDING PROTEIN (LTBP) FAMILY", BIOCHEMICAL JOURNAL, THE BIOCHEMICAL SOCIETY, LONDON, GB, (20001015), vol. 352, no. 3, ISSN 0264-6021, pages 601 - 610, XP009010129 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1042/0264-6021:3520601 | [T] - STERNER-KOCK ANJA ET AL, "Disruption of the gene encoding the latent transforming growth factor-beta binding protein 4 (LTBP-4) causes abnormal lung development, cardiomyopathy, and colorectal cancer.", GENES & DEVELOPMENT, September 1, 2002, (20020901), vol. 16, no. 17, ISSN 0890-9369, pages 2264 - 2273, XP002246448 [T] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/gad.229102 |