Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1437982

EP1437982 - ELECTRIC TOOTHBRUSH WITH AT LEAST ONE BRUSH HEAD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.09.2011
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 26.06.2013  [2013/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Orawave, LLC
800 North Crooks Road
Clawson, Michigan 48017 / US
[2004/35]
Former [2004/30]For all designated states
Prineppi, Frank Joseph
PMB 341, 1323 SE 17th Street
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33316 / US
For:GB 
Halstead, Richard Ralph
18 Drayton Close, Swindon Village
Cheltenham GL50 9QB / GB
Inventor(s)01 / PRINEPPI, Frank Joseph
PMB 341, 1323 SE 17th Street
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33316 / US
 [2004/30]
Representative(s)Jenkins, Peter David , et al
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/13]Jenkins, Peter David , et al
Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
Former [2004/30]Winckels, Johannes Hubertus F. , et al
Vereenigde Nieuwe Parklaan 97
2587 BN Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date02767679.001.10.2002
[2004/30]
WO2002GB04438
Priority number, dateUS2001096963204.10.2001         Original published format: US 969632
[2004/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO03028581
Date:10.04.2003
Language:EN
[2003/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1437982
Date:21.07.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.2003
[2004/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1437982
Date:03.11.2010
Language:EN
[2010/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:A61C17/34
[2004/30]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2004/30]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:ELEKTRISCHE ZAHNBÜRSTE MIT MINDESTENS EINEM BÜRSTENKOPF[2004/30]
English:ELECTRIC TOOTHBRUSH WITH AT LEAST ONE BRUSH HEAD[2004/30]
French:BROSSE A DENTS ELECTRIQUE DOTEE D'AU MOINS UNE TETE DE BROSSE[2004/30]
Entry into regional phase29.04.2004National basic fee paid 
29.04.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
29.04.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.04.2004Examination requested  [2004/30]
13.06.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.12.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.05.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.11.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.12.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.04.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.05.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.09.2010Fee for grant paid
10.09.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP10183001.6  / EP2295006
Opposition(s)04.08.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
07.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
05.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
15.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
07.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
07.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
23.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT03.11.2010
CY03.11.2010
CZ03.11.2010
DK03.11.2010
EE03.11.2010
FI03.11.2010
SE03.11.2010
SK03.11.2010
BG03.02.2011
GR04.02.2011
PT03.03.2011
[2013/26]
Former [2011/38]AT03.11.2010
CZ03.11.2010
DK03.11.2010
EE03.11.2010
FI03.11.2010
SE03.11.2010
SK03.11.2010
BG03.02.2011
GR04.02.2011
PT03.03.2011
Former [2011/31]AT03.11.2010
FI03.11.2010
SE03.11.2010
BG03.02.2011
GR04.02.2011
PT03.03.2011
Former [2011/24]FI03.11.2010
SE03.11.2010
PT03.03.2011
Cited inInternational search[XD]US5353460  (BAUMAN GARY C [US]) [XD] 1-6 * column 3, line 53 - column 4, line 12 * * figures 3,5 *;
 [A]GB2359739  (HO KA NAM [HK]) [A] 1,6 * figures 1,7-9 *;
 [A]US5842245  (PAI CHUNG-JEN [TW]) [A] 1,6 * figures 3,4 *;
 [A]US5625916  (MCDOUGALL GREG [HK]) [A] 1,6 * figures 2,3 *;
 [A]EP1059049  (DBD SRL [IT]) [A] 1,4,6 * figure - *;
 [X]US6178579  (BLAUSTEIN LAWRENCE A [US], et al) [X] 7,8 * column 6, line 7 - line 31 * * column 7, line 46 - line 53 * * figure 8; claim 4 *
ExaminationEP0537465
 WO02087464
by applicantUS5226206
 US5353460